Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Avery Technical Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Avery Technical Resources, Inc. and Kayla Lesher-Crim
Case Number: 4:2021cv00238
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Pursuant to Local Rule 83(d)(6), attorneys Kasi Schuelke and Jay Sever are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/23/2021. (jeb)
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Scottsdale Insurance Company.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/7/2021. (Schuelke, Kasi)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 Errata re #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Avery Technical Resources, Inc.. (Williams, Thomas)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Avery Technical Resources, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Avery Technical Resources, Inc. has until October 15, 2021 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/22/2021. (jeb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by L Craig Nierman on behalf of Avery Technical Resources, Inc. (Nierman, L)
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Avery Technical Resources, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Williams, Thomas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Earl Williams on behalf of Avery Technical Resources, Inc. (Williams, Thomas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Avery Technical Resources, Inc. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Carmoney, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Carmoney, Michael)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Russell Sever on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (Sever, Jay)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kasi Gray Schuelke on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (Schuelke, Kasi)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (bp)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kasi Schuelke; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay Sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 8/17/2021. (kjw)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4572901 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Sever, Jay)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4572891 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Schuelke, Kasi)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avery Technical Resources, Inc., Kayla Lesher-Crim Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4572530., filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/15/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carmoney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Avery Technical Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Kasi Gray Schuelke
Represented By: Michael A Carmoney
Represented By: Allison J. Frederick
Represented By: Jay Russell Sever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Technical Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Earl Williams
Represented By: L Craig Nierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Lesher-Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?