Perkins v. City of Des Moines et al
Plaintiff: Monica Perkins
Defendant: City of Des Moines, Dana Wingert, John/Jane Doe, Rodell Nydam, Scott Newman and Jason Tart
Case Number: 4:2021cv00248
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 dp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Perkins. Jason Tart served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Stewart, Christopher)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM COUNTS 4 AND 5 OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by City of Des Moines, Dana Wingert. Responses due by 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(DeSmet, Luke)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Finding as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. In light of #8 Amended Complaint, the Court finds the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss moot. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 10/8/2021. (hfh)
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (kjw)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Des Moines, Scott Newman, Rodell Nydam, Jason Tart, Dana Wingert., filed by Monica Perkins. (kjw)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Monica Perkins. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and file the First Amended Answer attached to the motion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/29/2021. (jsa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Monica Perkins.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(Witosky, Adam)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Monica Perkins; (Stewart, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESISTANCE TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY MONICA PERKINS. Plaintiff may have to and including 10/4/2021 to file a Resistance to #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/15/2021. (jsa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Motion to Dismiss by Monica Perkins.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 9/29/2021. (Witosky, Adam)
September 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM COUNTS 2, 4, AND 5 by City of Des Moines, Dana Wingert. Responses due by 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(DeSmet, Luke)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Des Moines from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL150925. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4579916., filed by City of Des Moines. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings)(DeSmet, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. City of Des Moines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Perkins
Represented By: Christopher Stewart
Represented By: Adam Clifford Witosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Des Moines
Represented By: Luke DeSmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Wingert
Represented By: Luke DeSmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodell Nydam
Represented By: Luke DeSmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Newman
Represented By: Luke DeSmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Tart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?