Coug & Company, Inc. v. Cougar Paws, Inc.
Plaintiff: Coug & Company, Inc.
Defendant: Cougar Paws, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00271
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY Brief in Reply re #15 MOTION, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery re #14 Response to Motion, filed by Coug & Company, Inc..(Etchells, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery re #14 Response to Motion, filed by Cougar Paws, Inc.. Replies due by 11/4/2021.(Maguire, Erinn)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 Errata Signature Page re #16 Reply to Response, filed by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (Maguire, Erinn)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY Memorandum in Support of re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration)(Maguire, Erinn)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery re #14 Response to Motion, by Coug & Company, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/28/2021. (Warner-Blankenship, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Coug & Company, Inc.. Replies due by 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and Exhibits 1 through 7)(Warner-Blankenship, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Erinn Maguire; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Brennen; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ariana DeJan-Lenoir. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/1/2021. (btg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 Errata re #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (Maguire, Erinn)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 Errata re #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (DeJan-Lenoir, Ariana)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 Errata re #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (Brennen, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4612938 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (DeJan-Lenoir, Ariana)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4612923 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (Brennen, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4612917 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Cougar Paws, Inc.. (Maguire, Erinn)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer by Cougar Paws, Inc.. Responses due by 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Reynolds, Kevin)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Errata re #1 Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint, filed by Coug & Company, Inc., #2 Errata. (Etchells, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) See Attached Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kjw)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 ***Filed Incorrectly*** Errata re #1 Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint, filed by Coug & Company, Inc.. (Etchells, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/14/2021 (kjw).
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT Coug & Company, Inc. against Cougar Paws, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4595438., filed by Coug & Company, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/8/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 10)(Etchells, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coug & Company, Inc. v. Cougar Paws, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coug & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Astrid Etchells
Represented By: Matthew Alan Warner-Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cougar Paws, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Reynolds
Represented By: Ariana K. DeJan-Lenoir
Represented By: Erinn M. Maguire
Represented By: Robert S. Brennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?