Simmers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Melody D. Simmers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2021cv00306
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (kjw)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of cost or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 11/5/2021. (mlm)
October 19, 2021 Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt added. Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melody D. Simmers. (Kappelman, Wes)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Melody D. Simmers. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/10/2022.(Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody D. Simmers
Represented By: Wes Lance Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?