Trashani v. Barry et al
Plaintiff: Ahmet Trashani
Defendant: US Xpress, Inc. and Mamadou Barry
Case Number: 4:2021cv00323
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order, #2 Supplement JERS Instructions) (jsa)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Telephonic Status Conferences are set for 2/24/2022 at 09:30 AM; 4/25/2022 at 11:00 AM; 6/22/2022 at 10:30 AM; and 8/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/29/2021. (jsa)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/22/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 2/22/2022. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/22/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/22/2022. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/22/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 7/22/2022. Discovery Deadline 8/31/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 10/24/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length 7 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/29/2021. (jsa)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/29/2021. Attorney Timothy S. Semelroth appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Cameron C. Finke appeared for both Defendants. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 19 minutes (jsa)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. (Semelroth, Timothy)
November 15, 2021 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams as referral judge and Chief Judge John A. Jarvey no longer assigned to case. (bp)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER re #7 Joint Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all further proceedings and enter judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and the consent of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 11/12/2021. (mem)
November 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ahmet Trashani Joint Consent to US Magistrate Judge (Semelroth, Timothy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by US Xpress, Inc.. (Finke, Cameron)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 11/29/2021 at 9:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 11/22/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/28/2021. (jsa)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by US Xpress, Inc..(Finke, Cameron)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Mamadou Barry.(Finke, Cameron)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/10/2021. (kjw)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by US Xpress, Inc. from Jasper County District Court, case number LACV122504. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4632404., filed by US Xpress, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/18/2022.(Finke, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trashani v. Barry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmet Trashani
Represented By: Joshua Lloyd Christensen
Represented By: Timothy S. Semelroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron C. Finke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamadou Barry
Represented By: Cameron C. Finke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?