McKinney v. Meredith Corporation
Plaintiff: Sharon McKinney
Defendant: Meredith Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00360
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Conference will be held January 19, 2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. to address Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases #13 . To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/6/2022. (jeb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip L. Fraietta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/6/2022. (btg)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4698364 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Sharon McKinney. (Fraietta, Philip)
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 Unresisted MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Sharon McKinney.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 1/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goplerud, J.)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W. Kendell on behalf of Sharon McKinney (Kendell, Gary)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Barton Goplerud on behalf of Sharon McKinney (Goplerud, J.)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Charles on behalf of Meredith Corporation (Charles, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Meredith Corporation. (Charles, David)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTY: Your case has been opened in the SDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/16/2022. (kjw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01615. Original file
November 18, 2021 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. (don)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of Iowa, Central Division signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/17/2021. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Transfer of Venue by Sharon McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 11:30 AM in Yosemite (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Clarification Order, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Meredith Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lawrence Timothy Fisher* *Bursor and Fisher, PA* *1990 N. California Blvd., Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Lundstrom, T)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meredith Corporation by Sharon McKinney. Attorney Fisher, Lawrence Timothy added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9913303) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Meredith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon McKinney
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Gary W. Kendell
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Corporation
Represented By: Joseph D. Mornin
Represented By: David L. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?