ACME Maintenance Corporation v. Service Star Trucks MFG., LLC et al
Plaintiff: ACME Maintenance Corporation
Defendant: Service Star Trucks MFG., LLC and Gracie Industries, LLC a limited liability company doing business as Bolt Custom Trucks and Manufacturing
Case Number: 4:2021cv00363
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 1/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 1/17/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/3/2022. (jsa)
January 3, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Kresowik, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Gracie Industries, LLC.(Haindfield, Matthew)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACME Maintenance Corporation. Service Star Trucks MFG., LLC served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Kresowik, Daniel)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACME Maintenance Corporation for service on Service Star Trucks Mfg. (Kresowik, Daniel)
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court may remove Ms. Luetje as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2021. (jsa)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by ACME Maintenance Corporation. (Kresowik, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (don)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Kresowik on behalf of ACME Maintenance Corporation (Kresowik, Daniel)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court will rule on #6 First Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Laura R. Luetje and William C. Strong as soon as new counsel has entered an appearance for ACME. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/8/2021. (jsa)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Laura R. Luetje and William C. Strong by ACME Maintenance Corporation.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/21/2021. (Luetje, Laura)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT Supplemental Jurisdiction Statement by Gracie Industries, LLC. (Haindfield, Matthew)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Gracie Industries, LLC. (Haindfield, Matthew)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Defendant Bolt to submit to the Court within 14 days of this Order a supplemental 1446(a) statement sufficient for the Court to determine whether complete diversity of citizenship is satisfied in this case. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 11/22/2021. (nlh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 12/9/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 12/9/2021. (kjw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gracie Industries, LLC d/b/a Bolt Manufacturing from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL151664. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4659515., filed by Gracie Industries, LLC d/b/a Bolt Manufacturing. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bolt Contract, #2 Original Notice, #3 Petition at Law, #4 Gracie Industries Acceptance of Service)(Haindfield, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACME Maintenance Corporation v. Service Star Trucks MFG., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACME Maintenance Corporation
Represented By: Laura R Luetje
Represented By: William C. Strong
Represented By: Daniel P. Kresowik
Represented By: Laura R. Luetje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Star Trucks MFG., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gracie Industries, LLC a limited liability company doing business as Bolt Custom Trucks and Manufacturing
Represented By: Matthew J Haindfield
Represented By: Matthew J. Haindfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?