Beach v. Meredith Corporation
Plaintiff: Julie Beach
Defendant: Meredith Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00376
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01497. Original file
December 2, 2021 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. (don)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Parties' #3 Stipulated MOTION to Transfer Venue. The Court does hereby Order that this Action be transferred from the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa, Central Division, where four similar cases are pending before the Honorable Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 Stipulated MOTION to Transfer Venue, filed by Plaintiff Julie Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/16/2021, (Stephens, Kim)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Meredith Corporation. (RE)
November 8, 2021 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Meredith Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Julie Beach. (Receipt#: AWAWDC-7323106) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stephens, Kim) Modified on 11/5/2021. Receipt# added. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beach v. Meredith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Beach
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?