In Re: Attorney Admission
In Re: Attorney Admissions
Case Number: 4:2022at00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 18 GOV'T cm/ecf registration forms: Justin Mulaire. (kjw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2022: #1 Hannah Henkel, #2 Kelly Bunch) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2022: #3 Timothy J. Stockwell) (btg).
February 4, 2022 Filing 16 PHV CM/ECF registration forms: Jonah A. Grossbardt (Attachments: #1 Jessica Walsh, #2 Arun Ravindran)(kjw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2022: #3 Caitlin Ellis, #4 William Liles) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2022: #5 Andrew Dunlap) (kjw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2022: #6 Frank Salisbury Hedin) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2022: #7 Ryan T. Bricker) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2022: #8 Brandee J. Kowalzyk) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2022: #9 Joseph F. Willms) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2022: #10 Aaron Whyhausen) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2022: #11 Robert R. Duncan) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2022: #12 Michael W. Ovca) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2022: #13 Leila A. Amineddoleh) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2022: #14 Jeffrey Thomas Norberg) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #15 Nicole A. Eichberger) (btg).
February 4, 2022 Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Judge John A. Jarvey no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SDIA ORDER of Admission as to: Matthew Dean Quandt, Alexa Kathleen Perez,Jonathan Louis Holscher,Logan Jay Eliasen,Zana Bajric,Emily McNee,Taylor A. Carroll,Andrew Robert Wilkinson,Mark Seda,Chelsey Mary Knapp, andDavid Vern Newkirk.. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificates) (btg)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 PHV CM/ECF registration forms: Christian Dennie (btg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2022: #1 Philip L. Fraietta) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #2 Mark D. Covin) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #3 Mark R. Bradford) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #4 Tal Aaron Bakke) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #5 Peter J. Schwingler) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2022: #6 Grant D. Goerke) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2022: #7 Jeremy D. Sosna) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2022: #8 Eric W. Tiritilli) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #9 Carl S. Burkhalter) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #10 Caleb J. Schillinger) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #11 Morris H. Hyman) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2022: #12 Jennifer A. Schorgl) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2022: #13 Jeffrey M. Saltman) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2022: #14 Daniel J. Marcus) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2022: #15 Lauren Dolecki Kober) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2022: #16 Isabel S. Johnson) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2022: #17 Frank W. Kowalkowski) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2022: #18 Brandon Lee Bigelow) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2022: #19 Lisa Kirby Haines) (btg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2022: #20 Steven K. Cannon) (btg). Modified on 2/7/2022 (kjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Attorney Admission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Attorney Admissions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?