Watts v. Iowa Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Jerome E. Watts El
Defendant: Iowa Department of Corrections
Interested Party: H. Loraine Wallace
Case Number: 4:2022cv00212
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 8/24/2022. Copy of order mailed by chambers to pro se plaintiff. (h)
August 5, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Jerome Watts (btg)
August 5, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerome E. Watts El. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account) (btg)
July 26, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (kjw)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Order dismissing complaint. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 7/25/2022. (h)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from Jerome Watts (btg)
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00058. Original file
June 28, 2022 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kjw)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Case Transfer re #1 Complaint filed by Jerome E Watts: Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Iowa. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/27/2022. (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
June 23, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Iowa Department of Corrections by Plaintiff Jerome E Watts. Dismissal Deadline 10/4/2022. (Document not signed/No Page 13 included in the envelope) (nef mailed to plaintiff) (des)
June 23, 2022 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Iowa Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome E. Watts El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: H. Loraine Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?