Jones v. McNamee
Plaintiff: Robert Jones, Jr.
Defendant: Richard McNamee
Case Number: 4:2022cv00213
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Jones, Jr. Updated address to IMCC. (kjw)
August 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Jones, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account) (btg)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard McNamee., filed by Robert Jones, Jr. (btg)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Jones, Jr. Updated address to Johnson County Jail and mailed Order #3 with attachments to new address. (kjw)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Filing Fee and Order to Amend Complaint. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 7/26/2022. Copy of order mailed by chambers to pro se plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 AO 240, #2 Form C) (h)
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 Letter from Robert Jones (btg)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard McNamee, filed by Robert Jones, Jr. (btg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. McNamee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McNamee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?