Freise v. Electrical Power Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Meghan Freise
Defendant: Electrical Power Products, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00376
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Clerk to terminate the appearances of attorneys Reck, Knowles, and Sukalski. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/27/2022. (amp)
December 22, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Electrical Power Products, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/5/2023. (Reck, Michael)
December 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Joensen on behalf of Electrical Power Products, Inc. (Joensen, Thomas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Electrical Power Products, Inc.. (Reck, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable FPTO, #2 Supplement JERS) (amp)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10:00 AM on 4/12/2023 ; 6/17/2023 ; and 8/11/2023 before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Parties shall file a status report in accordance with the Order at least 2 business days prior to the status conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/12/2022. (amp)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting as revised #7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 1/6/2023. Motions to Add Parties due by 2/3/2023. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/3/2023. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/3/2023. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/3/2023. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 6/2/2023. Discovery Deadline 8/1/2023. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/1/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2024 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 2/20/2024 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated length: 10 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/12/2022. (amp) (Main Document 10 replaced and docket entry modified to correct typo in FPTC year on 12/14/2022) (k).
December 12, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2022. Attorney Stoltze appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Knowles appeared for Defendant. Status of the case discussed. Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 8 minutes. (amp)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: A review of the docket reveals that Defendant Electrical Power Products, Inc., has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement as required by Local Rule 7.1. Local Rule 7.1 requires that a disclosure statement be filed on the form available on the Court's website. Defendant Electrical Power Products, Inc., shall have until December 16, 2022, to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/6/2022. (kmc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Attachments: #1 JOINT ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY AGREEMENT)(Stoltze, John)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariah L. Sukalski on behalf of Electrical Power Products, Inc. (Sukalski, Mariah)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2022 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 12/5/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/16/2022. (amp)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Electrical Power Products, Inc..(Reck, Michael)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey J. Knowles on behalf of Electrical Power Products, Inc. (Knowles, Kelsey)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (btg)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Electrical Power Products, Inc. from Polk County, Iowa, case number LACL153883. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-4975313., filed by Electrical Power Products, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filings from Black Hawk County, #2 Rule 81.1 Certificate)(Reck, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freise v. Electrical Power Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Freise
Represented By: John Quentin Stoltze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrical Power Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Reck
Represented By: Kelsey J. Knowles
Represented By: Thomas J. Joensen
Represented By: Mariah L. Sukalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?