Williamson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Demarcus Williamson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00378
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 12/12/2022. (mm)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. On or before 1/16/2023, Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/29/2022. (amp)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (West, Angel)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (West, Angel)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demarcus Williamson. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (btg)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demarcus Williamson. (btg)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, filed by Demarcus Williamson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/5/2023. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/5/2023. (btg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarcus Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?