Regenexx, LLC v. Rejuv Medical, PA et al
Plaintiff: Regenexx, LLC
Defendant: Rejuv Medical, PA, Dr. Joel Baumgartner, Dr. Michael Meighen and Dr. Heidi Robertson
Case Number: 4:2022cv00386
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 12/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (btg)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (btg)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (btg)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Sealed Document re #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Regenexx, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Regenexx Registration)(Dee, Michael)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff may file an unredacted complaint under seal. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/15/2022. (amp)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Unredacted Complaint (Dkt. 1) by Regenexx, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 11/29/2022. (Dee, Michael)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-4981169., filed by Regenexx, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/13/2023. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Regenexx Registration)(Dee, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regenexx, LLC v. Rejuv Medical, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regenexx, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Dee
Represented By: James W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rejuv Medical, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joel Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael Meighen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Heidi Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?