Tyson v Waterman et al
Plaintiff: James Charles Tyson, Sr.
Defendant: Thomas Waterman and Darrel Mullins
Case Number: 4:2022cv00392
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of Darrel Mullins, Thomas Waterman against James Charles Tyson, Sr. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 11/29/2022. (btg)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Dismissing Case and Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/28/2022. Copy of order mailed by chambers to plaintiff. (h)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Charles Tyson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account) (btg)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Charles Tyson, Sr. (btg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v Waterman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Charles Tyson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?