Morales v. State of Iowa
Petitioner: Jose Enrique Morales
Respondent: State of Iowa
Interested Party: Aaron Rogers
Case Number: 4:2022cv00394
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting [6, 7] Petitioners Unresisted Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Amended and Substituted Petition. By no later than March 3, 2023, counsel for Petitioner shall file an amended and substituted petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 or file a notice stating no petition may be filed without violating Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on January 13, 2023. (mm)
January 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron James Rogers on behalf of State of Iowa (Rogers, Aaron)
January 13, 2023 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition by Jose Enrique Morales. Responses due by 1/27/2023. (Dimitrova, Raya)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition by Jose Enrique Morales. Responses due by 1/27/2023. (Dimitrova, Raya)
December 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Raya Dimitrova on behalf of Jose Enrique Morales (Dimitrova, Raya)
December 13, 2022 ***CJA Attorney Appointment accepted by Attorney Raya Dimitrova for Jose Enrique Morales. (mrc)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to find counsel to represent Morales. Counsel shall file an amended and substituted petition on or before January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on December 12, 2022. (mm)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jose Enrique Morales. Responses due by 12/12/2022. (btg)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose Enrique Morales. (btg)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Enrique Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (btg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Enrique Morales
Represented By: Raya Dimitrova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Iowa
Represented By: Aaron James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Aaron Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?