Ross v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jonas Ross, III
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2022cv00395
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Lahammer on behalf of Jonas Ross, III (Lahammer, Michael)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonas Ross III. which included #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) (btg)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew Robinson. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/19/2022. (mne)
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5006436 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Jonas Ross, III. (Robinson, Matthew)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Leigh Glasgow on behalf of United States of America (Glasgow, Andrea)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Alan Stone on behalf of United States of America (Stone, Matthew)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Jonas Ross, III. (btg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonas Ross, III
Represented By: Michael K. Lahammer
Represented By: Matthew M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Glasgow
Represented By: Matthew Alan Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?