Anderson v. American Tire Distributors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Benjamin Anderson
Defendant: American Tire Distributors, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00123
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
2 Judge: William P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Final Pretrial Order Form) (jeb)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 6/16/2023. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/17/2023. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/17/2023. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/17/2023. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/17/2023. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/17/2023. Discovery Deadline 1/17/2024. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/20/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2024 1:00 p.m. in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Jury Trial set to begin 7/29/2024 9:00 a.m. for estimated 5 days in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (jeb)
May 22, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 5/22/2023. Attorney Andrew LeGrant appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Spencer Willems & Margaret Hanson appeared for defendants. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 12 minutes. (jeb)
May 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr as referral judge no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Reference. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 5/19/2023. (h)
May 17, 2023 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (LeGrant, Andrew)
May 16, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by American Tire Distributors, Inc.. (Hanson, Margaret)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline for Corporate Disclosures Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1. Defendant has until May 16, 2023 to file its corporate disclosure statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/10/2023. (jeb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Corp Disclosures Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 by American Tire Distributors, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/23/2023. (Willems, Spencer)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Scheduling Conference is reset for May 22, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. and will be conducted by telephone. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by May 17, 2023. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/9/2023. (jeb)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The scheduling conference will be reset under separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/9/2023. (jeb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of Scheduling Conference by Benjamin Anderson.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/23/2023. (LeGrant, Andrew)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: An in-person Scheduling Conference will be held May 19, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by May 16, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/8/2023. (jeb)
May 5, 2023 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by American Tire Distributors, Inc..(Willems, Spencer)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/9/2023. (btg)
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Hanson on behalf of American Tire Distributors, Inc. (Hanson, Margaret)
April 18, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Tire Distributors, Inc. from Polk County, case number LACL155223. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-5118275., filed by American Tire Distributors, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C)(Willems, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. American Tire Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Anderson
Represented By: Andrew L. LeGrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Tire Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?