Steenhard v. State of Minnesota
Petitioner: James Dean Steenhard
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Case Number: 4:2023cv00510
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James Deam Steenhard which included #2 Order. Removed Iowa Prison Number and mailed #1 and #2 . (btg)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James Deam Steenhard which included #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Confirmed still at Steele County and mailed again. (btg)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Amend. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 2254 Form, #2 IFP Form) (r) Paper copy of order and forms mailed this date to James Dean Steenhard #6344096 STEELE COUNTY DETENTION CENTER 2500 ALEXANDER ST., SW OWATONNA, MN 55060
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Dean Steenhard. (nla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steenhard v. State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Dean Steenhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?