Thomas et al v. Leyline Publishing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Thomas and The Tabletop Adventure, LLC
Defendant: Leyline Publishing LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Geek Therapeutics, Leyline Education PLLC, Dr. Anthony Bean, Alicia Figliuolo, Leyline Publishing LLC doing business as Geek Therapeutics and Anthony Bean
Case Number: 4:2024cv00079
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: William P Kelly
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Bower on behalf of Anthony Bean, Leyline Education PLLC (Bower, David)
April 23, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Harty on behalf of Anthony Bean, Leyline Education PLLC (Harty, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2024 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT 19 April 2024 by The Tabletop Adventure, LLC, Shawn Thomas. (Nuzum, Matthew)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs' #8 Motion seeks expedited relief in the form of a temporary restraining order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65. Plaintiffs served Defendants in March 2024, but Defendants have yet to answer or even appear in the case. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a status report on or before April 19, 2024, explaining whether Plaintiffs are still seeking expedited relief and, if so, whether Plaintiffs anticipate Defendants appearing in the case. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 4/10/2024. (lcw)
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Thomas, The Tabletop Adventure, LLC. (Nuzum, Matthew)
March 29, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Thomas, The Tabletop Adventure, LLC. Anthony Bean served on 3/12/2024, answer due 4/2/2024; Leyline Education PLLC served on 3/12/2024, answer due 4/2/2024; Leyline Publishing LLC served on 3/12/2024, answer due 4/2/2024. (Nuzum, Matthew)
March 29, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Thomas, The Tabletop Adventure, LLC. Alicia Figliuolo served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Nuzum, Matthew)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Tabletop Adventure, LLC, Shawn Thomas. Responses due by 3/15/2024. (Nuzum, Matthew)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by The Tabletop Adventure, LLC, Shawn Thomas. (Nuzum, Matthew)
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 Errata of Signature Block re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Shawn Thomas, The Tabletop Adventure, LLC. (Nuzum, Matthew)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 *** Filed in Error *** Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by The Tabletop Adventure, LLC, Shawn Thomas. (Nuzum, Matthew) Modified on 3/1/2024 (nla).
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 *** Filed in Error *** Errata of Signature Block re #1 Complaint, filed by Shawn Thomas, The Tabletop Adventure, LLC. (Nuzum, Matthew) Modified on 3/1/2024 (nla).
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar with copy of complaint. (kjw)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (nla)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5386682., filed by Shawn Thomas, The Tabletop Adventure, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/28/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Geek Therapist Locator, #2 Exhibit The Dungions & Dragons' OGL, #3 Exhibit Get Ready for Realms of Kymoria, #4 Exhibit Email purportedly from Shawn promoting RoK, #5 Exhibit Agreement signed Mar 7 2022, #6 Exhibit Trademark Service Mark Application by Leyline, #7 Exhibit List of copyright registrations, #8 Exhibit Backerkit Infringements Annotated, #9 Exhibit RoK Website Infringements Annotated)(Nuzum, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Leyline Publishing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Thomas
Represented By: Matthew Nuzum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Tabletop Adventure, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Nuzum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leyline Publishing LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Geek Therapeutics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leyline Education PLLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Harty
Represented By: David T. Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Anthony Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Figliuolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leyline Publishing LLC doing business as Geek Therapeutics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bean
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Harty
Represented By: David T. Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?