Williams v. Sprint/United Management Company
Plaintiff: Elois Brooks Cotton, Carol S. Povolish, Ricky A. Jordan, Cynthia S. Ellis, Bruce Logsdon, Carolyn Mahn, Gerry M. Osterberg, Harold G. Baumhardt, Abigail Louise Davis, Karen F. Rook, Michael A. Affolder, Stephen Petty, Jesse R. Diaz, Christopher O. Dougherty, James Michael Harper, Michael Battin, Billy Shiplet, Oneeda W. Gerald, Judy J. Watson, Robert Oakes, Beulah Elaine Shields, Joan K. Burton, Theresa Leona Goodson, Virender Kumar, Stanley N. Jones, James L. Siders, DiAnna Thomas Etheridge, Mitchel Robert Carlson, Rick Rawlings, Rodney Abel, Carol Lee Truitt, Lydon Capra McCallon, Richard A. Izzo, Larry L. O'Neil, Jerald D. Epstein, James P. Carroll, Jacqueline Lisby, Eva Carter, Margaret R. Capone, James R. Bollinger, Gary Lee Houston, Allen H. Dandeneau, Curtis M. Tostie, Anthony F. Seelza, Jillian James, Jeanette Norwood, Luis Angel Roman, Larry E. Bell, Robert Earl Brown, Sandra Hernandez, Willie Mack Palmer, Ronald S. Beaton, Brenda H. Coverdale, James McCance, Kenneth P. Cromley, Inder Kainth, Therese Ann Hearl, Jon Zeiger, Marilynn Y. Smallwood, David S. MacNamara, Rebecca G. Ferrell, Hoyt Eldean Neal, Jr., Michael R. Mears, Justine E. Bowen Koch, Bonnie Lee Kennon, Shandy McCollough, Steven M. Bohlander, Debra Ann Ferguson, Brenda Jean Tanner, Ernest Boyd Erlbeck, Jr., Ronald L. Davis, Julio J. Di Palma, Martha J. Alley, Robert Delano Lerch, Joyce E. Swarn, Herbert Campbell, Michael Schlobohm, Marlene Waltmon Ponce, Carol A. Kirk, Lillian June Johnson, Julius Williams, Paula M. Barree, Debra E. Cohen, Linda Ford, Victor Preddie, Ed Troop, Jerome F. Kacheroski, Karen Anita Byrd, Glenn T. Gillihan, Charles L. Garrison, Alan Otto, Steve Rubin, Kenneth Roy Newell, Ralph J. Kwapiszeski, Robert D. McManus, Karen L. Carpenter, Rita Miller, Diane R. Krizek and Christina Y. Lane
Case Number: 2:2003cv02200
Filed: April 23, 2003
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: David J Waxse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4710 ORDER Accepting Report of Final Termination of Qqualified Settlement Fund and Dismissing Cause With prejudice. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/15/09. (mm)
October 12, 2009 Filing 4709 REPORT TO THE COURT AND COUNSEL REGARDING FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS FROM THE SETTLEMENT FUND AND MOTION AND SUGGESTIONS FOR THE COURT'S FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yates, John) (Modified on 10/23/2009. (mg))
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4708 ORDER TERMINATING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND DISBURSING REMAINING FUNDS granting #4706 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (e-mail to Finance). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/24/2009. (ses)
August 18, 2009 Filing 4707 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4706 Joint MOTION to Terminate the Qualified Settlement Fund and Disburse Remaining Funds by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Patton)(Yates, John)
August 18, 2009 Filing 4706 Joint MOTION to Terminate the Qualified Settlement Fund and Disburse Remaining Funds by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
July 2, 2009 Filing 4705 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: AFFIRMING decision of the District Court. (Appeal No. 08-3196) (Attachment: #1 Transmittal letter)(kao)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4704 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4701 Motion to correct the trascript of the final approval hearing. It is granted to the extent that line 15 on page 8 of the transcript erroneously contains the word should (an error that has been corrected in the amended certified transcript) and is otherwise denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/19/2008. (ses)
December 19, 2008 Filing 4703 TRANSCRIPT of Corrected & Recertified Transcript of Proceedings held 9/10/07 before Judge Lungstrum. Court Reporter B. Ryder, Telephone number 913-551-5645. Transcript purchased by: John Yates. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2009. (br)
December 12, 2008 Filing 4702 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4701 MOTION to Correct the Transcript of the Final Approval Hearing. (Yates, John)
December 2, 2008 Filing 4701 MOTION to Correct the Transcript of the Final Approval Hearing by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit)(mg)
December 2, 2008 Filing 4700 SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #4692 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 08-3196) (kao)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4699 ORDER of 10CCA to Supplement Record as to #4692 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (Order received from 10CCA on 12/2) () (kao)
November 10, 2008 Filing 4698 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Hearing held 9/10/2007 before Judge Lungstrum. Court Reporter B. Ryder, Telephone number 913-551-5645. Transcript purchased by: Bert Braud. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2009. (br)
July 31, 2008 Filing 4697 SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA via email consisting of one volume re #4692 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 08-3196) (kao)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4696 ORDER of 10CCA as to #4692 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. The previously ordered abatement in this appeal is lifted. The record filed in appeal 08-3103 is transferred to this appeal. Ms. Harvey-Burgin and attorneys for parties must complete and file an entry of appearance form. The district court shall supplement the record on appeal with the filings that were made after 6/2/08. (Appeal No. 08-3196) (kao)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4695 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING #4668 Ms. Harvey-Burgin's MOTION for extension of time to file an appeal.. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/25/2008.(ses)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4694 ORDER of 10CCA as to #4692 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. Proceedings abated awaiting a disposition of the case on remand. See order for further details. (Appeal No. 08-3196) (kao)
July 21, 2008 Filing 4693 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #4692 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Preliminary Record)(kao)
July 21, 2008 APPEAL FEE STATUS: Filing fee waived re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #4692 . (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
July 21, 2008 Filing 4692 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4663 Order by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (kao)
June 30, 2008 Filing 4691 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: VACATING the District Court order and REMANDING to the District Court for further proceedings re #4675 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 08-3103) (Attachment: #1 Transmittal Letter)(kao)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4690 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting opt-in plaintiff Ruby Harvey-Burgin's #4681 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. It is further ordered that, Ms. Harvey-Burgin shall be permitted to negotiate her settlement check within 90 days of the final termination of her case and defendant shall be required to honor the check within that time period. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/24/08. (mg)
June 2, 2008 Filing 4689 RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA (Volume One) re #4675 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 08-3103) (kao)
May 7, 2008 Filing 4688 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned regarding #4683 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperisaddressed to Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (mg)
April 28, 2008 NOTICE: Doc. 4683 sent to opt-in plaintiff Ruby Harvey-Burgin by regular United States mail and by certified mail, return receipt requested, on 4/28/08. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mh)
April 28, 2008 Filing 4687 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4681 MOTION to Stay Case by Opt-in Plaintiff Ruby Harvey-Burgin. (Yates, John)
April 28, 2008 Filing 4686 LETTER from 10CCA to appellant re opening brief. (Appeal No. 08-3103) (kao)
April 28, 2008 Filing 4685 LETTER to 10CCA: Forwarding additional documents to 10CCA. (Appeal No. 08-3103) (kao)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4683 ORDER granting #4676 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the District Court shall forward Plaintiff Harvey-Burgins motion to appoint counsel for the purpose of appeal (doc. 4677) to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals for ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/28/08. (mh)
April 25, 2008 Filing 4682 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 4/24/2008 and assigned Appeal No. 08-3103 re #4675 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (kao)
April 21, 2008 Filing 4681 (PRO SE) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (Fax Filed.)(mg)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4680 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Waxse re #4676 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the Courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/11/2008.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
April 11, 2008 Filing 4679 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #4675 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record Part 1, #2 Preliminary Record Part 2)(kao)
April 4, 2008 Filing 4678 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) AFFIDAVIT regarding #4677 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin.(mg)
April 4, 2008 Filing 4677 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin.(mg) (Forwarded to 10CCA for ruling; see 4684 .)
April 4, 2008 Filing 4676 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the Courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin.(mg)
April 4, 2008 Filing 4675 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. Filing fee $455.00; not paid. (mg)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4674 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4668 Ms. Harvey-Burgin's Motion for Extension of Time to File an appeal. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 3/7/2008. (ses)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4673 ORDER granting #4672 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Claudio E. Molteni terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/6/08. (mh)
March 5, 2008 Filing 4672 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Shirley Williams, Shirley Williams(Molteni, Claudio)
February 29, 2008 Filing 4671 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin regarding #4668 MOTION for extension of time to file an appeal regarding error in the final settlement agreement. (mg)
February 12, 2008 Filing 4670 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4668 MOTION for extension of time to file an appeal regarding error in the final settlement agreement. (Braud, Bert)
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4669 ORDER re #4668 MOTION for extension of time filed by Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin - The Plaintiffs shall have until 2/14/2008 to file a response to Ms. Harvey-Burgin's motion and she in turn shall have until 2/29/2008 to file a reply thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/30/2008.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
January 28, 2008 Filing 4668 MOTION for extension of time to file an appeal regarding error in the final settlement agreement by Plaintiff Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (Upon direction of the Court, voluminous exhibits in support of this motion are filed conventionally and maintained in the Clerk's Office.)(mg)
December 17, 2007 RETURN E-mail received addressed to Thomas McCarthy: Contacted and he is no longer with this firm. Not resent, noticing turned off. (This is a text only entry.) (daw)
December 10, 2007 Filing 4667 REPORT OF THE PARTIES on Status of the Settlement by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4666 ORDER granting #4665 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Brian D. DeFrain is withdrawn as counsel of record for all plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/3/07. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mh)
September 18, 2007 Filing 4665 MOTION to Withdraw Brian D. DeFrain as attorney for all plaintiffs by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (DeFrain, Brian)
September 11, 2007 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #4663 Order of Final Approval of Settlement. (mg)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4664 ORDER - Based upon the final order approving settlement, the Court overrules as moot the #4652 Motion by John Poehlman to be included as plaintiff to case. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/11/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4663 ORDER OF FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/11/2007.(ses)
September 10, 2007 Filing 4662 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2007 re #4658 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement filed by Shirley Williams, #4659 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Shirley Williams. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit list) (ses)
September 7, 2007 Filing 4661 NOTICE of Objection to the Settlement Agreement (redacted) by Ruby J. Harvey-Burgin. (Obection received by Express Mail on 09/07/07.) (mg)
September 5, 2007 Filing 4660 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark V. Bodine on behalf of Phil Bodine. (Bodine, Mark)
August 28, 2007 Filing 4659 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 3-A#5 Exhibit 3-B#6 Exhibit 3-C#7 Exhibit 3-D#8 Exhibit 3-E) (Hubbard, Dirk)
August 20, 2007 Filing 4658 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3) (Hubbard, Dirk)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4657 ORDER - The motion hearing previously scheduled for 8/24/2007 as to #4652 MOTION to Be Included as a Plaintiff to the Case filed by John H. Poehlman, is continued to 9/10/2007 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/17/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 14, 2007 Filing 4656 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2007 re #4652 MOTION to Be Included as a Plaintiff to the Case filed by John H. Poehlman. The court orders that the #4652 MOTION to Be Included as a Plaintiff to the Case shall be taken under advisement and a Motion Hearing is set for 8/24/2007 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4655 ORDER re #4652 MOTION to Be Included as a Plaintiff to the Case filed by John H. Poehlman - Response deadline 8/10/2007 and the Motion is set for Hearing on 8/14/2007 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/7/2007.(ses)
August 7, 2007 Filing 4654 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4652 MOTION to Be Included as a Plaintiff to the Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(Braud, Bert)
August 1, 2007 Filing 4653 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4652 MOTION to Be Included as a Plaintiff to the Case by Interested Party John H. Poehlman. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A; #(2) Exhibit B; and #(3) Exhibit C)(mg)
August 1, 2007 Filing 4652 MOTION to Be Included as a Plaintiff to the Case by Interested Party John H. Poehlman. (mg)
July 25, 2007 Filing 4651 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Telephone Conference held on 7/25/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 24, 2007 Filing 4650 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 7/25/2007 at 03:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall contact the conference operator prior to 3:00 PM on 7/25/2007. The conference operator can be reached by dialing 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID number is 10999015.(ses)
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4649 ORDER - re correspondence from Stephen Homan. Telephone Conference set for 7/25/2007 at 03:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/24/2007. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ses)
July 23, 2007 Filing 4648 NOTICE of Objection by Shirley Williams of Phil Bodine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Objection, Phil Bodine)(DeFrain, Brian)
July 17, 2007 Filing 4647 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Telephone Conference held on 7/17/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 16, 2007 Filing 4646 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2007 at 12:30 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall call the conference operator prior to 12:30 p.m on 7/17/2007. The conference operator can be reached by dialing 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID number is 10113019.(ses)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4645 ORDERED that the Special Masters March 13, 2007, April 13, 2007, and May 15, 2007 Invoices for professional services rendered and costs advanced for the months of February, March, and April 2007 in the total amount of $7,471.48 is approved as reasonable and appropriate.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the total amount of $7,471.48 for the Special Masters March 13, 2007, April 13, 2007, and May 15, 2007 Invoices be apportioned as follows: $3,735.74 to be paid by Plaintiffs and $3,735.74 to be paid by Defendant. The parties shall tender payment to the Special Master by July 23, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 7/3/2007.(jm)
July 2, 2007 Filing 4644 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Final Approval hearing set for 9/10/2007 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. (ses)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4643 ORDER - In light of the proposed settlement pending before this Court, all deadlines are hereby vacated and the following Motions are terminated but may be refiled if the settlement is not finalized: #4597 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Portions of the Court's March 19, 2007 Order (Doc #4591) filed by Shirley Williams, #4352 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order (Court Doc. 4326) Granting, In Part, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Eighth and Ninth Requests for Production filed by Sprint/United Management Company, #4364 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents filed by Shirley Williams, #4402 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Sprint/United Management Company, #4603 MOTION to Reconsider Portions of 03/19/07 #4591 Memorandum and Order and for Clarification Regarding Adverse Impact Analyses filed by Sprint/United Management Company, #4472 MOTION to Compel Production of "Due Diligence" Documents Previously Withheld by Defendant as Privileged filed by Shirley Williams, #4535 SEALED MOTION filed by Shirley Williams, #4471 MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents filed by Shirley Williams. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 6/8/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) (Duplicate text removed on 6/11/2007. (mg))
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4641 AMENDED ORDER OF PRELIMINARY CONFIRMATION OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 5/30/2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Settlement Agreement #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice #3 Exhibit 3A - General Release #4 Exhibit 3B - Individual Opt-In Release Document)(ses)
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4640 ORDER re #4639 Order of preliminary confirmation of proposed settlement. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 5/30/2007.(ses)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4639 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY CONFIRMATION OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT granting #4631 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 5/25/2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Settlement Agreement#2 Exhibit 2 - Notice#3 Exhibit 3A - General Release#4 Exhibit 3B - individual opt-in release document) (ses)
May 25, 2007 Filing 4638 Amended STIPULATION of Proposed Settlement and Proposed Order of Preliminary Confirmation of Proposed Settlement by Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Joint Proposed Order)(Yates, John)
May 25, 2007 Filing 4637 CONSENT to the Amendment of the Master Full and Final Settlement Agreement of All Claims and Related Pleadings by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Master Agreement#2 Exhibit 2 - Notice#3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Stipulation#4 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Order) (Yates, John) (Document title modified on 5/29/2007 to reflect this is NOT a motion. (mg))
May 24, 2007 Filing 4642 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Telephone Conference held on 5/24/2007. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 24, 2007 Filing 4636 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 5/24/2007 at 03:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call are directed to contact the conference operator prior to 3:00 p.m. The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID number is 2305209.(ses)
May 21, 2007 Filing 4634 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 5/22/2007 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call are instructed to call the conference operator prior to 10:30 AM on 5/22/2007. The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID #1579505.(ses)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4633 ORDER re #4631 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement. Telephone Conference set for 5/22/2007 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 5/21/2007.(ses)
May 18, 2007 Filing 4632 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #4631 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement (Brief in Support of Stipulation of Proposed Settlement and [Proposed] Order of Preliminary Confirmation of Settlement Agreement) by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company.(Yates, John) (Document title modified on 5/21/2007. (mg))
May 18, 2007 Filing 4631 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Collective Action Settlement Agreement by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Master Settlement Agreement#2 Exhibit A-1 - Sperling List#3 Exhibit A-2 - Named and Opt-In Plaintiffs#4 Exhibit B-1 - General Release#5 Exhibit B-2 - Individual Opt-in Release#6 Exhibit C - Stipulation and Order#7 Exhibit D - Notice#8 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Matrix#9 Exhibit 3 - Distributions to Opt-in Plaintiffs#10 Exhibit 4 - Settlement Amounts for Named Plaintiffs#11 Exhibit 5 - Notice#12 Exhibit 6A - General Release#13 Exhibit 6B - Opt-in Release) (Yates, John) (Motion title modified on 5/21/2007. (mg))
May 16, 2007 Filing 4635 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Status Conference held on 5/16/2007 re: preliminary approval of settlement. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 15, 2007 Filing 4630 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 5/16/2007 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum in Courtroom #427. (ses)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4629 ORDER STAYING CASE 60 DAYS. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are hereby stayed for 60 days, until July 2, 2007. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/2/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4628 ORDER granting #4625 Defendant's Consent Motion for Ten-Day Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintffs' Second Request for Admissions; Fourteenth Request for Production of Documents; and Thirteenth Interrogatories. Defendant shall have an extension of time until May 11, 2007, in which to serve its responses to the following: Plaintffs' Second Request for Admissions, Plaintiffs' Fourteenth Request for Production of Documents, and Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Interrogatories. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/30/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4627 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice #4300 Plainitffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Tenth Interrogatoris and Eleventh Requests for Production of Documents. For the reasons set forth herein, the motion is denied without prejudice for failure to confer prior to filing the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/30/2007.(jm)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4626 ORDERED that the Special Masters February 13, 2007 Invoice for professional services rendered and costs advanced through January 31, 2007 in the amount of $4,515.00 is approved as reasonable and appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Special Masters February 13, 2006 Invoice be apportioned as follows: $2,257.50 to be paid by Plaintiffs and $2,257.50 to be paid by Defendant. The parties shall tender payment to the Special Master by May 21, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/30/2007.(jm)
April 30, 2007 Filing 4625 Consent MOTION for Ten Day Extension of Time to File Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Admissions; 14th Request for Production of Documents; 13th Interrogatories by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip) (Motion title modified on 5/1/2007. (mg))
April 25, 2007 Filing 4624 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Jean Robinson on May 3, 2007 at 1:00 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4623 ORDER granting #4621 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time and Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time until May 7, 2007, in which to file (1) Plaintiffs' Response Memorandum to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Portions of 3/19/07 Order Regarding Adverse Impact Analyses (Doc. #4603), and (2) Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider 3/19/07 Order (4597). Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/24/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
April 23, 2007 Filing 4622 LIST of Dispositive Motion Witnesses Pursuant to Third Amended Second-Phase Scheduling Order Witness List by Sprint/United Management Company.(Dupont, Philip)
April 23, 2007 Filing 4621 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file (1) Response to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Portions of 3/19/07 Order and (2) Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider Portions of 3/19/07 Order by Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, Dirk)
April 19, 2007 Filing 4620 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER granting, with limited inquiry, #4574 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150; Motion for sanctions. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 04/19/07. (mg)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4619 ORDER granting #4618 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Portions of 3/19/07 Order. Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension, up to and including 4/23/2007, in which to respond to 4603 Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Portions of 3/19/07 Order Regarding Adverse Impact Analyses. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/18/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
April 16, 2007 Filing 4618 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Portions of 3/19/07 Order by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 4/17/2007. (mg))
April 16, 2007 Filing 4617 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Vicki Kolb on 04/20/2007 at 11:00AM. (Klamann, John)
April 16, 2007 Filing 4616 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Bottoms on 04/20/2007 at 1:00PM. (Klamann, John)
April 16, 2007 Filing 4615 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Vicki Kolb on 04/20/2007 at 9:00AM. (Klamann, John)
April 11, 2007 Filing 4614 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Sixth Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff by Sprint/United Management Company. (Gavin, Patrick)
April 9, 2007 Filing 4613 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4597 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Portions of the Court's March 19, 2007 Order (Doc #4591). (Doc #4591) (Yates, John)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4612 ORDER granting #4594 Motion to Intervene and motion to modify protective order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 4/5/2007. (ses)
April 5, 2007 Filing 4611 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Motion Hearing held on 4/5/2007 re #4594 MOTION to Intervene, and MOTION to Modify Protective Order filed by Cheryl Bolton. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
April 5, 2007 Filing 4610 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4594 MOTION to Intervene, and MOTION to Modify Protective Order. (Hubbard, Dirk)
April 4, 2007 Filing 4609 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4594 MOTION to Intervene, and MOTION to Modify Protective Order. [Docket No. 4594] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Yates, John) (Modified on 4/5/2007. (mg))
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4608 ORDER - The telephone conference previously scheduled for 4/10/2007 is rescheduled for 4/5/2007 at 03:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum re (doc. 4594) MOTION to Intervene, and MOTION to Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support by Interested Party Cheryl Bolton. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference shall call the conference operator prior to 3:00 p.m. on 4/5/2007. The Conference Operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID number is 4861304. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 4/4/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4607 ORDER granting #4581 MOTION For Voluntary Dismissal. Opt-in plaintiffs Dayna Bozille, Agus Budarjo, Daniel Byrne, Brenda Eversole, Deborah Hufnagel, Roger Hunt, Gary Nolte, and Kevin Shannon are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/03/07. (mg)
April 3, 2007 Filing 4606 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER granting #4576 Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Witness for Deposition. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master, on 04/03/07. (mg)
April 3, 2007 Filing 4605 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER granting #4571 Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on the Subject of Exhibit 1115. Plaintiff's #4571 Motion for Sanctions is denied. See this order for further information and direction. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master, on 04/03/07. (mg)
April 3, 2007 Filing 4604 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4594 MOTION to Intervene, and MOTION to Protective Order: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing by telephone conference is set for 4/10/2007 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall do so by calling the conference operator prior to 11:00 A.M. on 4/10/2007. The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID number for this conference is 4861304.(ses)
April 2, 2007 Filing 4603 MOTION to Reconsider Portions of 03/19/07 #4591 Memorandum and Order and for Clarification Regarding Adverse Impact Analyses and Supporting Memorandum by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Yates, John) (Motion title modified on 4/3/2007. (mg))
April 2, 2007 Filing 4602 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4574 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150; Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(Hubbard, Dirk)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4601 ORDER granting #4600 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply Memorandum. Plaintiffs are hereby granted an one-day extension, up to and including 4/2/2007, in which to file Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum In Support of #4574 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150 and for Sanctions, which is presently referred to the Special Master. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/30/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
March 29, 2007 Filing 4600 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #4574 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150; Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
March 27, 2007 Filing 4599 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4576 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Witness for Deposition. (Hubbard, Dirk)
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4598 ORDER granting #4596 Defendant Sprint's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Admission; Fourteenth Request for Production of Documents and Thirteenth Interrogatories. Defendant is granted an additional 30 days, up to and including April 30, 2007, to respond to Plaintiffs' discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/26/2007.(jm)
March 26, 2007 Filing 4597 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Portions of the Court's March 19, 2007 Order (Doc #4591) by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1#2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3) (Hubbard, Dirk)
March 23, 2007 Filing 4596 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4577 Certificate of Service by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip)
March 23, 2007 Filing 4595 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents by Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip)
March 21, 2007 Filing 4594 MOTION to Intervene, and MOTION to Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support by Interested Party Cheryl Bolton. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 4/3/2007. (mg))
March 21, 2007 Filing 4593 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4571 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on the Subject of Exhibit 1115; Motion for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Part 1#2 Exhibit A -- Part 2#3 Exhibit A -- Part 3#4 Exhibit A -- Part 4)(Hubbard, Dirk)
March 20, 2007 Filing 4592 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Ken Steele on March 28, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4591 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3595 Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Declare Invalid Defendants Assertions of Privilege where Legal Counsel Was Not Involved and Motion to Compel such Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 03/19/2007 (mts).
March 16, 2007 Filing 4590 SEALED RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company regarding #4574 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150; Motion for Sanctions. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg) (hw).
March 16, 2007 Filing 4589 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER denying as moot #4178 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot #4198 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; and denying as moot #4202 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 03/16/07. (mg)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4588 ORDER granting #4587 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Defendant is hereby granted leave to file its response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150; Motion for Sanctions; and Memorandum in Support (doc. 4574) under seal. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/16/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
March 14, 2007 Filing 4587 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip)
March 13, 2007 Filing 4586 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4576 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Witness for Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Costello, Robert)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4585 ORDER granting #4583 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition and for Sanctions. Defendant is hereby granted an extension, up to and including 3/16/2007, in which to respond to #4574 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150 and for Sanctions, which is presently referred to the Special Master. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/13/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
March 13, 2007 Filing 4584 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4571 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on the Subject of Exhibit 1115; Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Costello, Robert) (Modified on 3/14/2007. (mg))
March 12, 2007 Filing 4583 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4574 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150; Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Costello, Robert) (Modified on 3/13/2007. (mg))
March 8, 2007 Filing 4582 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #3595 Second MOTION to Declare Invalid Defendant Sprint's Assertions of Privilege Where Legal Counsel was not Involved. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Hubbard, Dirk)
March 6, 2007 Filing 4581 MOTION For Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs Dayna Bozille; Agus Budarjo; Daniel Byrne; Brenda Eversole; Deborah Hufnagel; Roger Hunt; Gary Nolte; and Kevin Shannon by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin) (Motion title modified on 3/7/2007. (mg))
March 6, 2007 Filing 4580 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #3595 Second MOTION to Compel. (Dupont, Philip) (Document title modified on 3/7/2007. (mg))
March 2, 2007 Filing 4579 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Dr. John Ward on March 26, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
February 28, 2007 Filing 4578 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Noel Strong on March 16, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
February 28, 2007 Filing 4577 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Admissions; Fourteenth Request for Production of Documents; and Thirteenth Interrogatories to Defendant by Shirley Williams. (Braud, Bert)
February 28, 2007 Filing 4576 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Witness for Deposition and Memorandum in Support (re: Doc #4559) by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4575 ORDER granting #4560 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Jill S. Ferrell is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/27/2007. (byk)
February 27, 2007 Filing 4574 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on Document Bates Number SPRCS-000150; Motion for sanctions; and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4573 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4251 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Document #1000194[-]203 Without Redactions. Within 10 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Defendant shall produce document with bates number SPR-W1000194 through SPR-W1000203 without redaction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for a hearing on this matter is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that although the Court overrules Defendant's work product objection, the Court finds the objection to be substantially justified under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(4)(A) so that the parties shall bear their own costs incurred with making the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/27/2007.(jm)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4572 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4246 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents with Original Bates Numbers. Within 10 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Defendant shall re-produce the following documents with their original bates numbers: (1) documents bearing the new bates numbers of 201807 through 202605, and (2) documents identified by Defendant on its May 30, 2006 eleven-page listing of bates numbers ranges appearing on the privilege log but produced in the litigation from other sources. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that although the Court overrules Defendant's work product objection, the Court finds the objection to be substantially justified under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(4)(A) so that the parties shall bear their own costs incurred with making the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/27/2007.(jm)
February 27, 2007 Filing 4571 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition on the Subject of Exhibit 1115; Motion for Sanctions; and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
February 26, 2007 Filing 4570 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' 13th Request for Production of Documents by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
February 23, 2007 Filing 4569 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental and Amended Responses and Objections to Defendant's Third Request for Admissions and Plaintifs' Supplemental Answers to Defendant's Fifth Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiffs by Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
February 23, 2007 Filing 4568 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' 10th Request for Production of Documents by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4567 ORDERED that the Special Master's January 16, 2007 Invoice for professional services rendered and costs advanced through December 31, 2006 in the amount of $1,225.81 is approved as reasonable and appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Special Master's January 16, 2006 Invoice be apportioned as follows: $612.90 to be paid by Plaintiffs and $612.90 to be paid by Defendant. The parties shall tender payment to the Special Master by March 16, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/23/2007.(jm)
February 15, 2007 Filing 4566 SEALED REPLY to #4553 Sealed Response to Sealed Motion by Plaintiffs' regarding #4535 SEALED MOTION to Compel Ansers to Deposition Questions in Deposititons of Michael Machell, Deb Sprayberry, and Amy Canton. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg) (hw).
February 14, 2007 Filing 4565 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Quinetta Roberson on February 20, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
February 13, 2007 Filing 4564 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum - Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2007: denying as set forth in full on the record #4554 MOTION for Review of Paragraphs 1 and 3 of Special Master's Order Dated January 18, 2007 filed by Sprint/United Management Company. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (ses)
February 13, 2007 Filing 4562 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Helen Dennis on February 16, 2007. (Dupont, Philip)
February 9, 2007 Filing 4561 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4554 MOTION for Review of Paragraphs 1 and 3 of Special Master's Order Dated January 18, 2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Dirk)
February 9, 2007 Filing 4560 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney regarding Jill S. Ferrell by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip) (Motion title modified on 2/12/2007. (mg))
February 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4559 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4362 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions, as set out herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/7/2007.(jm)
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4558 ORDER expediting the response deadline as to the #4554 MOTION for Review of Paragraphs 1 and 3 of Special Master's Order Dated January 18, 2007 filed by Sprint/United Management Company. Response deadline is now 2/9/2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 2/05/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
February 5, 2007 Filing 4557 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4554 MOTION for Review of Paragraphs 1 and 3 of Special Master's Order Dated January 18, 2007: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing by telephone is set for 2/13/2007 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall call the conference operator prior to 1:30 p.m. on 2/13/2007. The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID # is 8438531.(ses)
February 5, 2007 Filing 4556 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Corporate Representative Re: Bates SPRCS-000151 on 02/17/2007 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
February 5, 2007 Filing 4555 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Corporate Representative Re: Bates SPRCS-000150 on 02/16/2007 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
February 1, 2007 Filing 4554 MOTION for Review of Paragraphs 1 and 3 of Special Master's Order Dated January 18, 2007, and memorandum in support by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit R#19 Exhibit S#20 Exhibit T#21 Exhibit U#22 Exhibit V#23 Exhibit W#24 Exhibit X#25 Exhibit Y#26 Exhibit Z#27 Exhibit AA) (Costello, Robert)
February 1, 2007 Filing 4553 SEALED RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company regarding #4535 SEALED MOTION to Compel Ansers to Deposition Questions in Deposititons of Michael Machell, Deb Sprayberry, and Amy Canton. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg) (hw).
February 1, 2007 Filing 4552 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Jan Duffy on February 6, 2007. (Dupont, Philip)
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4551 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4495 Motion for Reconsideration and/or clarify. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/31/2007. (ses)
January 30, 2007 Filing 4550 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Colin England on February 1, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dupont, Philip)
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4549 ORDERED that the Special Master's December 13, 2006 Invoice for professional services rendered and costs advanced through November 30, 2006 in the amount of $3,204.01 is approved as reasonable and appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Special Master's December 13, 2006 Invoice be apportioned as follows: $1,602.01 to be paid by Plaintiffs and $1,602.01 to be paid by Defendant. The parties shall tender payment to the Special Master by February 20, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/30/2007.(jm)
January 29, 2007 Filing 4548 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER denying as moot #4483 Motion to Compel Responses. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 01/29/07. (mg)
January 26, 2007 Filing 4547 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Mitzi Miller on February 27, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
January 26, 2007 Filing 4546 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of John Michael on February 2, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
January 26, 2007 Filing 4545 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Colin England on February 1, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dupont, Philip)
January 26, 2007 Filing 4544 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Dr. James L. Outtz on January 31, 2007 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
January 25, 2007 Filing 4543 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Dr. John Ward on February 9, 2007 at 8:30 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4542 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3670 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Answers to Supplemental (Tenth) Request for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/24/2007. (byk)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4541 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #4423 remand for factual findings concerning and explanation of reasons for denial of #3580 Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/23/2007.(byk)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4540 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4501 Motion for Review. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/23/2007. (ses)
January 19, 2007 Filing 4539 SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #4538 SEALED Reply to SEALED Response to #4495 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider and/or Clarify 4461 Order; and SEALED MOTION to Stay Orders by Plaintiffs'. (Filed Under Seal.) (mg) (hw).
January 19, 2007 Filing 4538 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs' regarding #4495 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider and/or Clarify #4461 Order; and SEALED MOTION to Stay Orders. (Filed Under Seal.) (mg) (hw).
January 19, 2007 Filing 4537 NOTICE of Filing Pleading Under Seal - Reply memorandum in Support of Motion to Reconsider and/or Clarify 12/8/06 Order (Doc. #4461) by Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) Mo
January 18, 2007 Filing 4563 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum - Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2007 : granting in part as set forth in full on the record the #4517 Motion for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs Experts Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such filed by Sprint/United Management Company. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (ses)
January 18, 2007 Filing 4536 SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #4535 SEALED MOTION to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions in the Depositions of Michael Machell, Deb Sprayberry, and Amy Canton by Plaintiffs. (mg) (hw).
January 18, 2007 Filing 4535 SEALED MOTION to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions in the Depositions of Michael Machell, Deb Sprayberry, and Amy Canton by Plaintiffs. (mg) (hw).
January 18, 2007 Filing 4534 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #4488 Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' 13th Request for Production of Documents. See this order for additional information. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 01/18/07. (mg)
January 18, 2007 Filing 4533 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #4363 Motion to Compel. See this order for additional information. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 01/18/07. (mg)
January 18, 2007 Filing 4532 NOTICE of Regarding Pleading Filed Under Seal (Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions in the Depositions of Michael Machell, Deb Sprayberry, and Amy Canton) by Shirley Williams. (Klamann, John)
January 16, 2007 Filing 4531 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re: #4501 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's Orders of 2/1/06 and 12/13/06 Compelling the Production of Certain Privileged Documents from Sprint's Privilege Log. (Dupont, Philip)
January 15, 2007 Filing 4530 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4483 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Gavin, Patrick) (Duplicate text removed on 1/16/2007. (mg))
January 12, 2007 Filing 4529 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4488 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents. (Braud, Bert)
January 10, 2007 Filing 4528 REPLY to Response to #4517 MOTION for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs Experts Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such Deadlines by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(Dupont, Philip) (Document title and docket text modified on 1/12/2007. (mg))
January 9, 2007 Filing 4527 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4517 RESPONSE to #4494 Motion to Supplement Expert Reports, AND MOTION for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs Experts Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such DeadlinesRESPONSE to #4494 Motion to Supplement Expert Reports, AND MOTION for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs Experts Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Meyers, Martin)
January 8, 2007 Filing 4526 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4483 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery. (Meyers, Martin)
January 8, 2007 Filing 4525 WITHDRAWAL Without Prejudice of #4494 MOTION to Supplement Expert Reports by plaintiffs. (Meyers, Martin) (Document title modified on 1/9/2007. (mg))
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4524 ORDER granting #4518 Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing Concerning Defendant's Motion for Extension of Defendant's Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs' Experts' Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such Deadlines. After consultation with the District Judge, Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Deadlines to Complete Plaintiffs' Experts' Depositions (doc. 4517) no later than 1/11/2007. Defendant shall file its reply no later than 1/12/2007. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/8/2007.(jm)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4523 ORDER - Motion Hearing (by telephone) is set for 1/18/2007 at 01:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum re #4494 MOTION to Supplement Expert Reports filed by Shirley Williams, and #4517 RESPONSE to #4494 Motion to Supplement Expert Reports, AND MOTION for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs Experts Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such deadlines. All counsel wishing to participate in the conference call shall call the conference operator prior to 1:00 p.m. The conference operator can be reached by dialing 1-866-207-0261. The conference ID # is 5966996. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/8/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
January 5, 2007 Filing 4522 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company regarding #4495 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider and/or Clarify #4461 Order; and SEALED MOTION to Stay Orders. (Filed Under Seal.)(mg) (hw).
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4521 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4427 Motion for Review. If plaintiffs have already returned the redacted Criteria Document to defendant, defendant shall provide another copy of the redacted Criteria Document to plaintiffs within 5 days of the date of this order. Otherwise, plaintiffs are entitled to retain the redacted Criteria Document. The court remands to the magistrate judge the limited issue of whether plaintiffs are entitled to an unredacted copy of the Criteria Document. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/5/2007. (ses)
January 5, 2007 Filing 4520 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4488 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 08/24/06 Hearing Transcript#2 Exhibit B - 03/03/06 Proceeding Transcript)(Yates, John)
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4519 ORDER granting #4516 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION for Extensions of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel #4483 . After consultation with the Special Master, Plaintiffs are granted a two-day extension of time until 1/08/2007 to file a response in opposition to #4483 Defendant Sprint's Motion to Compel Responses to its Third Request for Admissions, Fifth Interrogatories and Fifth Request for Production of Documents. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/5/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
January 5, 2007 Filing 4518 MOTION to Expedite Briefing regarding #4517 RESPONSE to #4494 Motion to Supplement Expert Reports, AND MOTION for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs Experts Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such Deadlines by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Gavin, Patrick) (Motion title modified on 1/5/2007. (mg))
January 5, 2007 Filing 4517 RESPONSE to #4494 Motion to Supplement Expert Reports, AND MOTION for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Complete Plaintiffs Experts Depositions, or in the Alternative, For a Stay of Such Deadlines by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gavin, Patrick) (Document/Motion title modified on 1/5/2007. (mg))
January 4, 2007 Filing 4516 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4483 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
January 4, 2007 Filing 4515 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4471 MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Hubbard, Dirk)
January 3, 2007 Filing 4514 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Telephone Conference held on 1/3/2007. (No court reporter.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 3, 2007 Filing 4513 NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Deputy Clerk: Attached to this Notice is the Memorandum and Order (document #4512) filed on 01/03/07; this notice is for the purpose of electronic noticing only. If you have any questions contact the Clerk's Office. (mg)
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4512 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4439 Sealed Motion for reconsideration of factual finding. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/3/2007. (ses)
January 3, 2007 Filing 4511 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dirk L. Hubbard. (Hubbard, Dirk)
January 3, 2007 Filing 4510 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4472 MOTION to Compel Production of "Due Diligence" Documents Previously Withheld by Defendant as Privileged. (Hubbard, Dirk)
January 2, 2007 Filing 4509 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re: #4352 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order (Court Doc. 4326). (Yates, John) (Modified on 1/4/2007. (mg))
January 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4508 ORDER that the Special Master's November 14, 2006 Invoice for professional services rendered and costs advanced through October 31, 2006 in the amount of $8,726.21 is approved as reasonable and appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Special Master's November 14, 2006 Invoice be apportioned as follows: $4,363.10 to be paid by Plaintiffs and $4,363.10 to be paid by Defendant. The parties shall tender payment to the Special Master by January 23, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/2/2007.(jm)
January 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4507 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's August 30, 2006 Amended Order Appointing Special Master [Doc. 4298], the automatic referral to the Special Master of #4402 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions is hereby withdrawn. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 1/2/2007.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
January 2, 2007 Filing 4506 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4427 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Order of November 6, 2006 [Doc. #4392]. (Hubbard, Dirk)
January 2, 2007 Filing 4505 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4501 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's Orders of 2/1/06 and 12/13/06 Compelling the Production of Certain Privileged Documents from Sprint's Privilege Log. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2#2 Exhibit 3#3 Exhibit 4#4 Exhibit 5#5 Exhibit 6#6 Exhibit 7#7 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Dirk) (Exhibit 1 replaced 1/2/07 by request of filer. (jb))
December 29, 2006 Filing 4504 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4471 MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Testimony from John Shannon's 12-06-06 Deposition)(Yates, John)
December 29, 2006 Filing 4503 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4472 MOTION to Compel Production of "Due Diligence" Documents Previously Withheld by Defendant as Privileged (Yates, John)
December 29, 2006 Filing 4502 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions (Hubbard, Dirk)
December 28, 2006 Filing 4501 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's Orders of 2/1/06 and 12/13/06 Compelling the Production of Certain Privileged Documents from Sprint's Privilege Log and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
December 27, 2006 Filing 4500 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re: #4402 MOTION for Sanctions. (Dupont, Philip)
December 26, 2006 Filing 4499 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Report of John R. Michael, Ph.D. on December 22, 2006 by Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4498 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Reports of D. Jan Duffy, Helen Dennis and Colin England by Shirley Williams. (Egan, Dennis)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4497 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Expert Reports of Dr. Outtz, Dr. Mann and Dr. Roberson by Shirley Williams (Meyers, Martin)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4496 SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #4495 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider and/or Clarify #4461 Order; and SEALED MOTION to Stay Orders by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Filed Under Seal.) (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2014: #1 Attachemnt) (hw).
December 22, 2006 Filing 4495 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider and/or Clarify #4461 Order; and SEALED MOTION to Stay Orders (and Memorandum in Support) by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Filed Under Seal.) (mg) (hw).
December 22, 2006 Filing 4494 (WITHDRAWN: See #4525 WITHDRAWAL.) MOTION to Supplement Expert Reports by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin) (Modified on 1/9/2007. (mg))
December 22, 2006 Filing 4493 Plaintiffs' Identification of Potential Witnesses by Shirley Williams.(Meyers, Martin) (Document title modified on 12/27/2006. (mg))
December 22, 2006 Filing 4492 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4427 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Order of November 6, 2006 [Doc. #4392]. (Yates, John)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4491 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Dr. Ward's Expert Report by Shirley Williams. (Kimak Judy, J'Nan)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4490 AFFIDAVIT of Bert S. Braud re #4488 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Braud, Bert)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4489 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4488 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G)(Braud, Bert)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4488 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Braud, Bert)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4487 ORDER granting #4455 Motion for Extension of Time to comply and defendant shall produce all responsive documents no later than February 9, 2007. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/22/2006. (ses)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4486 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by Shirley Williams of Motion to Reconsider and/or Clarify 12/8/06 Order (Doc. #4461); Motion to Stay; and Memorandum in Support and Exhibits. (Hubbard, Dirk)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4485 ORDER granting #4479 Plaintiffs' unopposed MOTION to Expedite Defendant's Responses to Motions. Defendant shall file its response in opposition to #4471 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents and #4472 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Production of "Due Diligence" Documents Previously Withheld by Defendant as Privileged by December 29, 2006. Plaintiffs shall file their reply briefs in support of these motions by January 5, 2007. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/22/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4484 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4479 MOTION to Expedite Defendnt's Responses to Motions. (Hubbard, Dirk)
December 21, 2006 Filing 4483 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1#2 Exhibit A Part 2#3 Exhibit A Part3#4 Exhibit B#5 Exhibit C#6 Exhibit D#7 Exhibit E) (Gavin, Patrick)
December 21, 2006 Filing 4482 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4479 MOTION to Expedite Defendnt's Responses to Motions. (Yates, John)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4481 ORDER TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING: - Defendant shall file any response in opposition to 4479 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Expedite Defendant's Responses to Motions no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, December 21, 2006. Plaintiffs' Reply due no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, December 22, 2006. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/19/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4480 ORDER granting #4475 Motion for Leave to File response to plaintiff's review out of time - Response due no later than 12/22/2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/19/2006. (ses)
December 19, 2006 Filing 4479 MOTION to Expedite Defendnt's Responses to Motions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
December 19, 2006 Filing 4478 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4352 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order (Court Doc. 4326) Granting, In Part, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Eighth and Ninth Requests for Production. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hubbard, Dirk) (Duplicate text removed on 12/20/2006. (mg))
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4477 ORDER TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING: - At the request of the District Judge to expedite briefing on this issue, Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief in support of their #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions no later than Friday, December 29, 2006. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/19/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4476 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's August 30, 2006 Amended Order Appointing Special Master [Document 4298], the automatic referrals to the Special Master of #4471 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon documents and #4472 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Production of "Due Diligence" Documents Previously Withheld by Defendant as Privileged are hereby withdrawn. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/19/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
December 18, 2006 Filing 4475 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Out of Time in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Attorney-Client Privilege by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
December 18, 2006 Filing 4474 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4402 MOTION for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Kimak Judy, J'Nan)
December 18, 2006 Filing 4473 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - deposition testimony of John Shannon)(Yates, John)
December 18, 2006 Filing 4472 MOTION to Compel Production of "Due Diligence" Documents Previously Withheld by Defendant as Privileged and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C - part 1#4 Exhibit C - part 2) (Hubbard, Dirk)
December 18, 2006 Filing 4471 MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F) (Hubbard, Dirk)
December 18, 2006 Filing 4470 REPLY Memorandum and Request for Ruling on Motion for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Order of November 6, 2006 [Doc #4392] by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Document title modified on 12/19/2006; not a motion. (mg))
December 14, 2006 Filing 4469 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re: #4439 SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Factual Finding Regarding Exhibits A-E and L in 11/09/06 Adverse Impact Order (Court Document #4404). (Yates, John)
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4468 ORDER granting #4466 the parties' Joint MOTION for Extensions of Time for File Responses. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time until 12/18/2006 to file a response in opposition to #4362 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions (doc. 4362). Plaintiffs are granted an extension of time until 12/18/2006 to file a response in opposition to #4402 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4467 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #3591 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration based on an updated privilege log. Defendant's Motion to Clarify the February 1, 2006 Memorandum and Order is granted in part and denied in part: It is granted to the extent that Defendant shall not be required to produce documents 54630, 54874, 54922, 57215, 57429-57471, 57330 and 163528; and Defendant shall not be required to produce the three documents referenced by Defendant that were listed multiple times in the privilege log and found by the Court in at least one instance to be protected by the attorney-client privilege. It is denied to the extent that no clarification is necessary with regard to documents 46294-46298, 179512, 154188-197, 154259-268, 154084-095, 153995-154001, 154084-95, 130597-130600, 130624-130626, 57214 and 153918. Defendant's Motion to Stay the February 1, 2006 Memorandum and Order is granted to the extent that Defendant need not produce any documents pending review of objections to be filed with the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/13/2006.(jm)
December 12, 2006 Filing 4466 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4402 MOTION for Sanctions, #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4465 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot #4244 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-Mails (doc. 4244); and denying #4245 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Transmittal E-Mails in Native Format. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/12/2006. (byk)
December 11, 2006 Filing 4464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Ninth Request for Production of Documents and Things by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
December 11, 2006 Filing 4463 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4439 SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Factual Finding Regarding Exhibits A-E and L in 11/09/06 Adverse Impact Order (Court Document #4404). (Hubbard, Dirk)
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4462 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiffs' #4360 Motion for Review. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/08/06. (mg)
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4461 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The portion of plaintiffs' #3605 and #4338 Motions for Review that the court previously retained under advisement are denied. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/08/06. (mg)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4460 ORDER granting #4458 Motion for Order to Place Plaintiffs' Document #4456 Under Seal. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/06/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
December 6, 2006 Filing 4459 RESPONSE to #4436 Proposed Findings of Fact and Motion for Findings of Fact Related to Denial of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5)(Hubbard, Dirk)
December 6, 2006 Filing 4458 Consent MOTION for Order to Place Plaintiffs' Document #4456 Under Seal by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Costello, Robert)
December 6, 2006 Filing 4457 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Shirley Williams executed upon Corporate Counsel - Development Dimensions International on 12/05/2006 by personal service. (Attachments: #1 Notice to take deposition#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B - Part I#4 Exhibit B - part II#5 Exhibit B - part III)(Klamann, John)
December 5, 2006 Filing 4456 SEALED REPLY MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4450 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meyers, Martin) (Document title modified on 12/6/2006. (mg)) (Document sealed on 12/6/2006 pursuant to Court's Order; see 4460 . (Sealed User MG)) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2014: #2 Main Document) (hw).
December 5, 2006 Filing 4455 MOTION for extension of time to comply with court order #4401 by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mark Browne) (Yates, John)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4454 ORDER granting #4453 the parties' Joint MOTION for Extensions of Time for File Responses. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time until 12/13/2006 to file a response in opposition to #4362 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions (doc. 4362). Plaintiffs are granted an extension of time until 12/13/2006 to file a response in opposition to #4402 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
December 4, 2006 Filing 4453 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions and to #4402 Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
December 4, 2006 Filing 4452 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Corporate Designee of Development Dimensions International on 12/11/06 at 9AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B - part I#3 Exhibit B - part II#4 Exhibit B - part III)(Klamann, John)
December 4, 2006 Filing 4451 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4450 Court's Order of December 1, 2006. (Yates, John) (Modified on 12/5/2006. (mg))
December 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4450 ORDER - Defendant shall file its supplemental brief no later than 12:00 pm on Monday, December 4, 2006. As the court is ultimately resolving plaintiffs motion to review, plaintiffs shall have the proverbial last word and shall file a response to defendants brief no later than 5:00 pm on Tuesday, December 5, 2006. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/01/2006.(ses)
November 30, 2006 Filing 4448 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF establishing that it has not injected any advice of counsel or the adverse impact analysis into this case by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John) /30/2006)
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4447 ORDER granting #4446 Motion for Leave to File to file a sur-reply in response to plaintiff's reply to defendant's supplemental brief. Said sur-reply shall be filed no later than 11:00 a.m. on 11/30/2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/29/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 29, 2006 Filing 4446 MOTION for Leave to file a surreply in response to plaintiffs' reply to defendant's supplemental brief by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Costello, Robert)
November 29, 2006 Filing 4445 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs of taking deposition of John Shannon on December 6, 2006. (Egan, Dennis) (Modified on 12/1/2006. (mg))
November 29, 2006 Filing 4444 REPLY by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4442 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N)(Meyers, Martin) (Document title modified on 11/29/2006. (mg))
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4443 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER FEES, re #4177 Order, as set out herein. The parties shall tender payment to the Special Master by December 19, 2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/28/2006.(jm)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4442 ORDER re #4430 Response to Order filed by Shirley Williams and #4440 Statement filed by Sprint/United Management Company. In light of the position taken by defendant in its supplemental brief, the court believes that a reply from plaintiffs is appropriate. Plaintiffs reply shall be filed no later than 9:00am on Wednesday, November 29, 2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/28/2006.(ses)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4441 ORDER granting 4433 the parties' Joint MOTION for Extensions of Time for File Responses. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time until 12/08/2006 to file a response in opposition to 4362 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions (doc. 4362). Plaintiffs are granted an extension of time until 12/08/2006 to file a response in opposition to 4402 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/28/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
November 27, 2006 Filing 4440 SEALED STATEMENT Establishing That it Has Not Injected Any Advice of Counsel or The Adverse Impact Analysis Into This Case by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Filed Under Seal) (mg) (hw).
November 27, 2006 Filing 4439 SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Factual Finding Regarding Exhibits A-E and L in 11/09/06 Adverse Impact Order (Court Document #4404) by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (mg) (Motion title modified on 11/28/2006. (mg)) (hw).
November 27, 2006 Filing 4438 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Answers to Plaintiffs' Twelfth Interrogatories Directed to Defendant Sprint by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
November 22, 2006 Filing 4437 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant's Third Request for Admissions to Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to Defendant's 5th Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant's 5th Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
November 22, 2006 Filing 4436 Proposed Findings of Fact by Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yates, John)
November 22, 2006 Filing 4435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
November 22, 2006 Filing 4434 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of John Shannon on November 30, 2006. (Egan, Dennis)
November 22, 2006 Filing 4433 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions and #4402 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
November 21, 2006 Filing 4432 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4364 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 20, 2006 Filing 4431 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF DOCUMENT SUBSTITUTION by Deputy Clerk regarding #4430 Response to Order. Due to a formatting problem at the time of filing, a correctly formatted Memorandum in Response has been attached to the above named docket entry and the original Response has been restricted from public viewing. A copy of the corrected Memorandum in Response is attached to this notice for the purpose of electronic notification. Contact the Clerk's Office with questions. (mg)
November 20, 2006 Filing 4430 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4404 Order on Motion for Review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Meyers, Martin) (Corrected Response attached on 11/21/2006; Original Response restricted from public viewing. (mg))
November 20, 2006 Filing 4429 SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #4427 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Order of November 6, 2006 [Doc. #4392] by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Filed Under Seal)(mg) (hw).
November 20, 2006 Filing 4428 NOTICE of Exhibit Attachment by Shirley Williams re #4427 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Order of November 6, 2006 [Doc. #4392]. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 20, 2006 Filing 4427 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Order of November 6, 2006 [Doc. #4392] and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 20, 2006 Filing 4426 Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2006 before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Hearing held on the issue remanded by Judge Lungstrum in his 11/9/2006 Memorandum and Order (doc. 4404) of whether defendant waived the attorney-client privilege with respect to Exhibits A through E and Exhibit L. Matter taken under advisement with written ruling to follow. Defendant shall file any supplemental briefing or proposed factual findings with regard Judge Lungstrum's 11/16/2006 Memorandum and Order (doc. 4423) remanding Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions no later than 11/22/2006. Plaintiffs shall have until 11/29/2006 to file any response. (Minute Sheet attached)(byk)
November 20, 2006 Filing 4425 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Shirley Williams executed upon Dianne Parker on 11/13/2006 by Personal Service. (Meyers, Martin)
November 17, 2006 Filing 4424 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER: Defendant's Objection to Plaintiffs' #4390 Amended Notice Duces Tecum is overruled. See this order for additional instructions. Further, the following are denied as moot: #4308 , #4318 , and #4321 Motions for Extensions of Time to Respond to Defendant's Third Request for Admissions. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 11/17/06. (mg)
November 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4423 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4102 Motion for Review and granting #4334 Motion for Review. This matter is remanded to the magistrate judge for factual findings concerning the denial of plaintiffs' motion for sanctions. If plaintiffs remain aggrieved after the issuance of the magistrate judge's factual findings, they may file a new motion to review. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/16/2006. (ses)
November 16, 2006 Filing 4422 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2006 re #4338 SEALED MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders filed by Shirley Williams, #3605 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Order of February 1, 2006 (Doc. #35491) as That Order Relates to Adverse Impact Analyses filed by Shirley Williams. Supplemental briefing is ordered Plaintiffs deadline is 11/20/2006 and defendant's deadline is 11/27/2006. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (ses)
November 16, 2006 Filing 4421 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of 30(b)(6) Representative of Ernst & Young on 11/22/06. (Meyers, Martin)
November 16, 2006 Filing 4420 TRANSCRIPT of telephone conference held 11/8/06 before Judge Lungstrum. Court Reporter: B. Ryder. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, the transcript will be made electronically available after 5 business days. NOTICE: For access to this document only (unlike other documents) via the Notice of Electronic Filing, click on the CASE NUMBER (not the Document Number) hyperlink; at the login screen enter your ECF login and password; click on Run Report; enter your PACER login and password; and click on the DOCUMENT NUMBER hyperlink. (Ryder, Becky) (Transcript made electronically available on 12/5/2006. (mg))
November 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4419 ORDER granting #4417 Motion to Seal Exhibits. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/16/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 15, 2006 Filing 4418 STATEMENT on Defendant's "Good Faith" and Other Defenses Waiving the Attorney Client Privilege by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 15, 2006 Filing 4417 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal with regard to 12/16/06 hearing by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin) (Motion title modified on 11/17/2006. (mg))
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4416 ORDER granting #4405 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert C. Johnson is withdrawn as counsel for defendant Sprint/United Management Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/15/06. (mg)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4415 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/20/2006 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse to discuss issue remanded by Judge Lungstrum in his Memorandum and Order dated 11/09/2006 (doc. 4404). All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall call the conference operator prior to **11:10 a.m.** The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-2194 and the conference ID # is 2379609. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/16/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mts)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4414 ORDER granting #4406 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Deadlines set forth in the Magistrate's Order [see document 4392]. This Motion is granted to the extent that the deadline imposed for return of the Criteria document is stayed pending a ruling from the district judge on Plaintiff's Motion for Review of the Magistrate's ruling. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/14/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
November 14, 2006 Filing 4413 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4363 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 14, 2006 Filing 4412 NOTICE of Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference (regarding motions #3605 and #4338) set for 11/16/2006 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel who wish to participate in this conference call shall call the conference operator prior to 2:00 p.m. The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID # is 2301363. (ses)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4411 ORDER granting in part #4378 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time until 11/27/2006 to file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions (doc. 4362). Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/14/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4410 ORDER granting in part #4371 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Portions of #4326 Order Pending Reconsideration and/or Review of the Order. The Court hereby stays the portions of the 9/25/2006 Memorandum and Order requiring Defendant to produce adverse impact documents that the Court has previously held to be privileged until such time as the Court rules on #4352 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/14/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
November 13, 2006 Filing 4409 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF DOCUMENT CORRECTION AND ATTACHMENT by Deputy Clerk: as directed in the Court's #4408 Order Nunc Pro Tunc, a corrected Memorandum and Order has been attached to docket entry #4404 . The corrected Memorandum and Order is also attached to this notice for the purpose of electronic notification. Contact the Clerk's Office with questions. (mg)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4408 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC correcting #4404 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Review. The clerk is directed to substitute the attached memorandum and order for the order filed on 11/9/2006 (doc. 4404). Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/13/2006. (Attachments: #1 11/09/2006 Memorandum and Order)(ses)
November 10, 2006 Filing 4407 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4360 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of October 5, 2006 [Doc. # 4343] by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 10, 2006 Filing 4406 MOTION to Stay Deadlines of Magistrate's 11/06/06 Order (Doc. #4392) by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Modified on 11/13/2006. (mg))
November 10, 2006 Filing 4405 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert C. Johnson by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Costello, Robert)
November 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4404 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - #3605 Motion for Review, AND #4338 Motion for Review are granted with respect to Exhibits A through E and Exhibit L and the court remands to the magistrate judge the issue of whether defendant waived the attorney-client privilege with respect to these Exhibits by not asserting that privilege in its privilege log and, if he concludes that defendant did waive the privilege, to consider the merits of defendant's claim that the documents are protected from discovery by the work product doctrine. The motions are retained under advisement with respect to plaintiffs' assertion that defendant waived the attorney-client privilege by asserting its good faith compliance with the ADEA. The motions are otherwise denied. The court will conduct a telephone conference on Thursday, November 16, 2006 at 2:00 PM to hear additional argument concerning whether defendant has waived the attorney-client privilege by asserting its good faith compliance with the ADEA. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/09/2006. (ses) (Corrected Memorandum and Order attached as directed on 11/13/2006. See #4408 Order Nunc Pro Tunc. (mg))
November 9, 2006 Filing 4403 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4402 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H)(Dupont, Philip)
November 9, 2006 Filing 4402 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip)
November 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4401 ORDER granting #4347 Motion for Review and plaintiffs' objections to the portion of the magistrate judge's 09/25/2006 order denying plaintiffs' motion to compel defendant to produce documents responsive to Requests Nos. 27 through 36 of Plaintiffs' Ninth Request for Product of Documents. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/09/2006. (ses)
November 8, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Motion Hearing held on 11/08/2006 re #4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326) filed by Shirley Williams. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 8, 2006 Filing 4400 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4364 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yates, John)
November 8, 2006 Filing 4399 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Shirley Williams executed upon Jerry Batt on 10/24/06 by Personal Service. (Meyers, Martin)
November 8, 2006 Filing 4398 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Shirley Williams executed upon David Soleno on 10/19/06 by Personal Service. (Meyers, Martin)
November 7, 2006 Filing 4397 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326). (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 7, 2006 Filing 4396 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326): (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone conference set for 11/8/2006 at 04:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. All counsel wishing to participate in this conference call shall call the conference operator prior to 4:00 p.m. The conference operator can be reached at 1-866-207-0261 and the conference ID # is 1805030.(ses)
November 6, 2006 Filing 4395 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Shirley Williams executed upon Teddy Stock on 11/06/06 by Personal service. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 6, 2006 Filing 4394 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Shirley Williams executed upon Jeff Mott on 10/23/06 by Personal Service. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 6, 2006 Filing 4393 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4378 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4392 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3454 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order,as follows: (1)That portion of the Motion requesting protection for the Criteria Document is granted and Plaintiffs shall return the Criteria document, and all copies thereof, within five days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall be prohibited from using this document in any manner. (2) That portion of the Motion requesting protection for five e-mails inadvertently produced is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/6/2006.(jm)
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4391 ORDER granting #4389 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply re #4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326). Reply deadline extended to 11/7/2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/06/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
November 3, 2006 Filing 4390 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of 30(b)(6) Represenative of Sprint on November 20, 2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klamann, John)
November 3, 2006 Filing 4389 MOTION for Extension of Time to File reply as to #4372 Response to #4347 Motion for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 [#4347] by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Document association to original motion made on 11/6/2006. (mg))
November 3, 2006 Filing 4388 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #4345 Motion to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents and Computer Information. See order for detailed information and instructions. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 11/03/06. (mg)
November 3, 2006 Filing 4387 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4371 MOTION to Stay Portions of #4326 Order Pending Reconsideration and/or Review of the Order. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4386 ORDER granting #4383 Defendant's unopposed MOTION for One-Week Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including November 8, 2006, to file its response to #4364 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/1/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
November 1, 2006 Filing 4385 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4334 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders of April 25, 2006 - Paragrah 8 (Doc #3865), July 10, 2006 (Doc #4221) and September 13, 2006 (Doc #4315) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Santions. (Hubbard, Dirk)
November 1, 2006 Filing 4384 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4363 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P)(Dupont, Philip)
October 31, 2006 Filing 4383 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4364 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Costello, Robert)
October 30, 2006 Filing 4382 SEALED HEARING AND DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS regarding #4380 Sealed Reply to Sealed Response to #4338 Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (mg) (hw).
October 30, 2006 Filing 4381 SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #4380 Sealed Reply to Sealed Response to #4338 Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (mg) (hw).
October 30, 2006 Filing 4380 SEALED REPLY to Sealed Response to Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams regarding #4338 SEALED MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders. (mg) (hw).
October 27, 2006 Filing 4379 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4360 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of October 5, 2006 [Doc. # 4343]. (Yates, John)
October 26, 2006 Filing 4378 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
October 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4377 ORDER granting #4376 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #4338 SEALED MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders Reply deadline extended to 10/30/2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/26/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 25, 2006 Filing 4376 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #4338 SEALED MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
October 25, 2006 Filing 4375 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4345 MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents and Computer Information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(Hubbard, Dirk)
October 24, 2006 Filing 4374 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re: #4352 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order (Court Doc. 4326) Granting, In Part, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Eighth and Ninth Requests for Production. (Yates, John)
October 24, 2006 Filing 4373 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' TWELFTH Interrogatories to Sprint by Shirley Williams. (Egan, Dennis)
October 20, 2006 Filing 4372 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326). (Yates, John)
October 20, 2006 Filing 4371 MOTION to Stay Portions of #4326 Order Pending Reconsideration and/or Review of the Order by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John) (Motion title modified on 10/23/2006. (mg))
October 20, 2006 Filing 4370 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4345 MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents and Computer Information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Dupont, Philip)
October 20, 2006 Filing 4369 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shirley Williams of Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Request for Production of Documents to Defendant. (Egan, Dennis)
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4368 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO SPECIAL MASTER. The automatic referral to the Special Master of Plaintiffs' #4364 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents is hereby withdrawn. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/19/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
October 18, 2006 Filing 4367 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4321 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Defendant's Third Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs. (Meyers, Martin)
October 18, 2006 Filing 4366 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' 9/27/06 Memorandum in Support (#4335) of Motion for Review of Magistrate's Order Denying Sanctions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4365 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO SPECIAL MASTER. The automatic referral to the Special Master of Plaintiffs' #4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions is hereby withdrawn. Plaintiffs' request for District Judge Lungstrum to rule on this motion is denied. The Magistrate Judge will rule on this motion after District Judge Lungstrum rules on the parties' pending motions for review that relate to the issues in this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/18/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
October 18, 2006 Filing 4364 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 10/19/2006. (mg))
October 18, 2006 Filing 4363 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 10/19/2006. (mg))
October 13, 2006 Filing 4362 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witnesses to Respond to Deposition Questions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Modified on 10/16/2006. (mg))
October 13, 2006 Filing 4361 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4360 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of October 5, 2006 [Doc. # 4343] by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L)(Hubbard, Dirk)
October 13, 2006 Filing 4360 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of October 5, 2006 [Doc. # 4343] by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
October 12, 2006 Filing 4359 Minute Entry for Telephone Status Conference held on 10/12/2006 before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. After hearing the respective positions of the parties which includes the objections of Defendant to the Special Master Report to the Court of October 9, 2006 (doc. 4350), the Court declines to enter any order at this time regarding mediation. Minute Sheet attached. (byk)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4358 ORDER approving Special Master's fees as set out herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/11/2006.(jm)
October 11, 2006 Filing 4357 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4352 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order (Court Doc. 4326) Granting, In Part, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Eighth and Ninth Requests for Production. (Hubbard, Dirk)
October 11, 2006 Filing 4356 SEALED RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company regarding #4338 SEALED MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders. (mg) (hw).
October 11, 2006 Filing 4355 NOTICE of Telephone Conference: A Telephone Conference to discuss the Special Master's recommendations with regard to resumption of mediation is set for 10/12/2006 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. The Court will initiate the conference call. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
October 10, 2006 Filing 4354 SEALED EXHIBITS (3-7) IN SUPPORT of #4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326) by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (mg) (hw).
October 10, 2006 Filing 4353 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4352 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order (Court Doc. 4326) Granting, In Part, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Eighth and Ninth Requests for Production by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dupont, Philip)
October 10, 2006 Filing 4352 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9/25/06 Order (Court Doc. 4326) Granting, In Part, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Eighth and Ninth Requests for Production by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4351 ORDER granting #4346 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsere #4334 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders of April 25, 2006 - Paragrah 8 (Doc #3865), July 10, 2006 (Doc #4221) and September 13, 2006 (Doc #4315) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Santions. Response deadline extended to 10/18/2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/10/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
October 10, 2006 Filing 4350 REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER (Dated October 9, 2006). (mg)
October 9, 2006 Filing 4349 NOTICE of Exhibit Attachment by Shirley Williams re #4348 Memorandum in Support of #4347 Motion. (Exhibits 3-7 are Filed Under Seal) (Hubbard, Dirk)
October 9, 2006 Filing 4348 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326) by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8)(Hubbard, Dirk)
October 9, 2006 Filing 4347 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Magistrate's Order of September 25, 2006 (Doc # 4326) by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
October 9, 2006 Filing 4346 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4334 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders of April 25, 2006 - Paragrah 8 (Doc #3865), July 10, 2006 (Doc #4221) and September 13, 2006 (Doc #4315) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Santions by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip)
October 6, 2006 Filing 4345 MOTION to Compel Production of John Shannon Documents and Computer Information by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Modified on 10/11/2006. (mg))
October 5, 2006 Filing 4344 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4300 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' 10th Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents (Braud, Bert)
October 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4343 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3417 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order to the extent specifically set forth in the Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/5/2006 (mts).
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4342 ORDER denying without prejudice #4241 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff Toby Young in Prison. In accordance with the provisions of the Third Amended, Second-Phase Scheduling Order (doc. 4292), the Court finds that Defendant's Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff Toby Young in Prison is premature and is therefore denied without prejudice to refiling at the appropriate time. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/4/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
October 2, 2006 Filing 4341 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4321 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Defendant's Third Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs (Opposition) (Gavin, Patrick)
September 29, 2006 Filing 4340 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Service of Motion for Review of Magistrate's February 1, 2006 and July 1, 2006 Orders (Doc. 4338) and Supporting Memorandum Doc. 4339 (Filed Under Seal) by Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin) (Document title modified on 10/2/2006. (mg))
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4337 ORDER granting #4336 Motion for leave to file motion for review under SEAL. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/28/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 27, 2006 Filing 4339 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4338 SEALED MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders by Plaintiff Shirley Williams.(mg) (hw).
September 27, 2006 Filing 4338 SEALED MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (mg) (hw).
September 27, 2006 Filing 4336 MOTION Leave to File Motion for Review and Objections Under Seal by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
September 27, 2006 Filing 4335 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4334 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders of April 25, 2006 - Paragrah 8 (Doc #3865), July 10, 2006 (Doc #4221) and September 13, 2006 (Doc #4315) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Santions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2#2 Exhibit 3#3 Exhibit 4)(Hubbard, Dirk)
September 27, 2006 Filing 4334 MOTION for Review and Objections to Magistrate's Orders of April 25, 2006 - Paragrah 8 (Doc #3865), July 10, 2006 (Doc #4221) and September 13, 2006 (Doc #4315) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Santions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
September 26, 2006 Filing 4333 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Chris Hubert on November 2, 2006. (Meyers, Martin)
September 26, 2006 Filing 4332 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of designated representatives of defendant Sprint pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) on multiple dates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Meyers, Martin)
September 26, 2006 Filing 4331 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of designated representatives of Sprint pursuant to 30(b)(6) on multiple dates. (Meyers, Martin)
September 26, 2006 Filing 4330 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint Employees on multiple dates. (Meyers, Martin)
September 26, 2006 Filing 4329 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint Former Employees on multiple dates. (Meyers, Martin)
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4328 ORDER granting #4319 Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Stay of July 1, 2006 Order Pending Motion for Review or Objection. To preserve the status quo, the stay entered July 10, 2006 is hereby continued until the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion for review of the September 13, 2006 Memorandum and Order overruling Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. Pending ruling on said motion, Plaintiffs are to make no use of the documents in question. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 9/26/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
September 25, 2006 Filing 4327 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint Employees on multiple dates. (Meyers, Martin)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4326 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3652 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Eighth and Ninth Requests for Production of Documents. If it has not already done so, Defendant shall produce documents responsive to Plaintiffs' Eighth Request No. 20, and Ninth Request Nos. 10, 12-14, 16, 40, 45-59, 64-66, 41-42, and 60-63 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. (See Memorandum and Order for further details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 9/25/2006. (byk)
September 25, 2006 Filing 4325 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Designated Representative of Sprint pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) on multiple dates. (Meyers, Martin)
September 25, 2006 Filing 4324 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint Former Employees on Multiple dates. (Meyers, Martin)
September 25, 2006 Filing 4323 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint 30(b)(1) witness on 10/6/06. (Meyers, Martin)
September 22, 2006 Filing 4322 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4319 MOTION Continue stay entered 07/01/06 re #4213 Memorandum and Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection, Pending Motion for Review or Objection. (Dupont, Philip)
September 22, 2006 Filing 4321 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Defendant's Third Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
September 21, 2006 Filing 4320 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4300 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' 10th Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from 8/17/06 Transcript#2 Exhibit B - Email to Monafo from Braud on 8/28/06#3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from 8/24/06 Transcript)(Yates, John)
September 20, 2006 Filing 4319 MOTION Continue stay entered 07/01/06 re #4213 Memorandum and Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection, Pending Motion for Review or Objection by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin) (Modified on 9/21/2006. (mg))
September 15, 2006 Filing 4318 Consent MOTION for extension of time To Respond To Defendant's 3rd Request for Admissions to Plaintiff by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
September 14, 2006 Filing 4317 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER: It is ordered that counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant report to the Special Master and the Court by 09/20/06 with respect to their voluntary agreement for production/exchange of expert witness information preparatory to the resumption of the mediation process. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 09/13/06. (mg)
September 14, 2006 Filing 4316 SPECIAL MASTER REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO THE COURT (Dated September 13, 2006). (mg)
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4315 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4234 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of July 1, 2006 Order. See Memorandum and Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 09/13/2006. (mts)
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4314 ORDER denying #4235 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of July 10, 2006 Order (doc. 4221). Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 9/13/2006. (byk)
September 12, 2006 Filing 4313 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER overruling #4143 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317. See this order for provisions. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 09/12/06. (mg)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4312 ORDER granting #4310 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gerard Karl Rodriguez is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Sprint/United Management Company. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate JudgeDavid J. Waxse on 09/07/06. (mg)
September 6, 2006 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: On 9/6/2006 in the amount of $50.00 for attorney Gerard K. Rodriguez re: #4310 MOTION for attorney Gerard K. Rodriguez to appear pro hac vice. Receipt Number K4631004463. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kao)
September 6, 2006 Filing 4311 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER denying as moot #4147 Motion to Strike Documents #4143 and #4144, denying as moot #4153 Motion to Strike Documents #4117, #4123, #4148, #4149, and #4153, denying as moot #4188 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, denying as moot #4210 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and deferring ruling on #4143 Motion for Protective Order until 09/11/06. See this Special Master Order for additional information and deadlines. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 09/06/06. (mg)
September 6, 2006 Filing 4310 MOTION for attorney Gerard K. Rodriguez to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit of Gerard K. Rodriguez) (Yates, John)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4309 ORDER granting #4307 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Lawrence Schenberg is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Sprint/United Management Company. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate JudgeDavid J. Waxse on 09/06/06. (mg)
September 6, 2006 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 9/6/06 re: #4307 MOTION for attorney David L. Schenberg to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number 1004445. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
September 5, 2006 Filing 4308 MOTION for extension of time To Respond To Defendant's Third Request For Admissions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
September 5, 2006 Filing 4307 MOTION for attorney David L. Schenberg to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit of David L. Schenberg) (Yates, John)
August 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4306 ORDER withdrawing the referral to the Special Master and denying without prejudice the following motions: #4095 Motion for Protective Order, #4096 Motion for Protective Order, #4097 Motion for Protective Order, #4098 Motion for Protective Order, #4099 Motion for Protective Order, #4101 Motion for Protective Order, #4117 Motion for Protective Order, #4123 Motion for Protective Order, #4148 Motion for Protective Order, #4149 Motion for Protective Order, #4150 Motion for Protective Order, #4207 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/31/2006. (ses)
August 31, 2006 Filing 4305 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER denying as moot #3843 Motion for Protective Order, denying as moot #3844 Motion for Protective Order, granting #4250 Motion to Compel Resumption of Deposition of James Kissinger, and granting Plaintiffs' Oral Motion to Substitute. Signed by John R. Phillips, Special Master on 08/31/06. (mg)
August 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4304 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's August 30, 2006 Amended Order Appointing Special Master (doc. 4298), the automatic referral to the Special Master of Plaintiffs' #4300 MOTION to Compel Reponses to Plaintiffs' 10th Interrogatories and 11th Request for Production of Documents is hereby withdrawn. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/31/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
August 31, 2006 Filing 4303 REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER (Dated August 31, 2006) regarding #4153 MOTION to Strike #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido, #4250 MOTION to Compel Resumption of Deposition of James Kissinger, #4098 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Paul LeMay, #4095 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Miguel Arredondo, #3844 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice for the Deposition of Gavin Pinchback, #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4147 MOTION to Strike #4144 Certificate of Compliance, #4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317, #4207 MOTION for Protective Order, #4099 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Affolder, #3843 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice for the Deposition of Renee Finks, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido, #4149 MOTION for Protective Order of Matt Borkowski, #4097 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Howard Holbrook, #4188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #4153 MOTION to Strike #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order, #4210 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #4153 MOTION to Strike #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order, #4096 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Dale Aston, #4101 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Carldene Sue Green, and #4150 MOTION for Protective Order of Deborah Hufnagel. (mg)
August 31, 2006 Filing 4302 AFFIDAVIT of Bert S. Braud re #4300 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' 10th Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Braud, Bert)
August 31, 2006 Filing 4301 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4300 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' 10th Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Braud, Bert)
August 31, 2006 Filing 4300 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' 10th Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Braud, Bert)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4299 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's August 30, 2006 Amended Order Appointing Special Master (doc. 4298), Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Carol Morahan (doc. 4207) and Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Strike (doc. 4210) are hereby referred to the Special Master. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/30/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4298 AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/30/2006.(byk)
August 30, 2006 Filing 4297 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4251 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Document #1000194203 Without Redactions. (Hubbard, Dirk)
August 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4296 ORDER granting #4266 Plaintiffs' MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel Concerning Plaintiffs' Tenth Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents. Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including August 31, 2006, to file a motion to compel relating to Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's Tenth Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/29/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
August 28, 2006 Filing 4295 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4250 MOTION to Compel Resumption of Deposition of James Kissinger. (Hubbard, Dirk)
August 28, 2006 Filing 4294 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #3595 Second MOTION to Declare Invalid Defendant Sprint's Assertions of Privilege Where Legal Counsel was not Involved. (Hubbard, Dirk)
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4293 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's June 7, 2006 Order Appointing Special Master (doc. 4177), Plaintiffs' #4250 MOTION to Compel Resumption of Deposition of James Kissinger, is hereby referred to the Special Master. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/28/2006.(jm)
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4292 THIRD AMENDED SECOND-PHASE SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for all deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/25/2006.(ses)
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4291 ORDER re 4285 Motion Hearing held on 08/24/2006: granting #4236 Motion for Hearing, granting in part and denying in part #4237 Motion for Review, granting in part and denying in part #4238 Motion, denying #4274 Motion for Reconsideration, and remanding in part to Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse #4177 Order Appointing Special Master for clarification. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DEADLINE INFORMATION Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/25/2006. (ses) (Additional text added on 8/25/2006. (mg))
August 25, 2006 Filing 4290 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4245 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Transmittal E-Mails in Native Format. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Dirk) (Modified on 8/28/2006. (mg))
August 25, 2006 Filing 4289 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4246 MOTION to Compel Documents with Original Bates Numbers. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Modified on 8/28/2006. (mg))
August 24, 2006 Filing 4288 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4266 MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel Concerning Plaintiffs' Tenth Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents. (Yates, John)
August 24, 2006 Filing 4287 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #4286 Response to Motion - Exhibit A-1 by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
August 24, 2006 Filing 4286 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4244 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-Mails. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - excerpts from January 13, 2006 transcript)(Yates, John)
August 24, 2006 Filing 4285 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2006 re #4238 MOTION for hearing regarding scheduling order filed by Shirley Williams, #4237 MOTION for Review of Special Master's Recommendations Regarding Discovery Limits filed by Sprint/United Management Company, #4236 MOTION for Rule 16 Conference filed by Sprint/United Management Company. (Court Reporter Becky Ryder.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4283 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER FEES. The Special Master's July 31, 2006 Invoice in the amount of $11,772.50 is approved as reasonable and appropriate. Payment apportioned as follows: $5,886.25 to be paid by Plaintiffs and $5,886.25 to be paid by Defendant. The parties shall tender payment to the Special Master by 9/13/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/23/2006. (byk)
August 21, 2006 Filing 4282 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4234 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration re #4213 Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection. (Meyers, Martin)
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4281 ORDER granting #4279 Defendant Sprint's Consent MOTION for a Three (3) Day Extension of Time to File Response as to #4244 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-Mails. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time, until 8/24/2006, within which to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-mails. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/21/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
August 21, 2006 Filing 4280 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4235 MOTION for Reconsideration of July 10, 2006 Order (Doc. #4221) and In The Alternative, For Clarification. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Duplicate text removed on 8/22/2006. (mg))
August 21, 2006 Filing 4279 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4244 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-Mails by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
August 21, 2006 Filing 4278 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re: #4241 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Depose Plaintiff Toby Young in Prison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C#2 Exhibit D#3 Exhibit E#4 Exhibit F#5 Exhibit G)(Costello, Robert)
August 21, 2006 Filing 4277 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Robert McIlrath on August 29, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4276 ORDER summarily denied in part and retaining under advisement in part the #4274 Motion for Reconsideration re #4255 Order on Motion for Review. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/21/2006. (ses)
August 19, 2006 Filing 4284 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. Lungstrum: Status Conference held on 8/19/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 18, 2006 Filing 4275 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4274 MOTION for Reconsideration/Clarification of #4255 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Review by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Part 1 - pages 1 thru 30; #(2) Part 2 - pages 31 thru 61; #(3) Part 3 - pages 62 thru 96)(Yates, John) (Motion title modified on 8/21/2006. (mg))
August 18, 2006 Filing 4274 MOTION for Reconsideration/Clarification of #4255 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Review by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John) (Motion title modified on 8/21/2006. (mg))
August 18, 2006 Filing 4273 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Christine Monticue on August 26, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4272 ORDER granting #4263 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #4234 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration re #4213 Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including August 21, 2006 to file such reply brief. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/17/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4271 ORDER granting #4262 Defendant Sprint's Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response as to #4244 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-Mails. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time, until 8/21/2006, within which to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-mails. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 8/17/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jm)
August 17, 2006 Filing 4270 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: #4238 MOTION for hearing regarding scheduling order, #4237 MOTION for Review of Special Master's Recommendations Regarding Discovery Limits, and #4236 MOTION for Rule 16 Conference: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2006 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum in courtroom #427. (ses)
August 16, 2006 Filing 4269 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4251 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Document #1000194203 Without Redactions. (Yates, John)
August 15, 2006 Filing 4268 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4250 MOTION to Compel Resumption of Deposition of James Kissinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I)(Costello, Robert)
August 14, 2006 Filing 4267 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support #4247 regarding Plaintiffs' #3595 Second MOTION to Declare Invalid Defendant Sprint's Assertions of Privilege Where Legal Counsel was not Involved. Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - excerpts from June 22, 2006 transcript#2 Exhibit B - excerpts from May 25, 2006 transcript)(Yates, John) (Document title modified on 8/16/2006. (mg))
August 14, 2006 Filing 4266 MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel Concerning Plaintiffs' Tenth Interrogatories and Eleventh Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E) (Braud, Bert) (Motion title modified on 8/16/2006. (mg))
August 11, 2006 Filing 4265 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4246 MOTION to Compel Documents with Original Bates Numbers. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - April 27, 2006 letter)(Yates, John) (Modified on 8/16/2006. (mg))
August 11, 2006 Filing 4264 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4245 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Transmittal E-Mails in Native Format. (Yates, John) (Motion title modified on 8/15/2006. (mg))
August 9, 2006 Filing 4263 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #4234 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration re #4213 Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection, by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
August 7, 2006 Filing 4262 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4244 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-Mails by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John) (Docket text modified on 8/8/2006. (mg))
August 7, 2006 Filing 4261 RESPONSE (Oppostion) by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4238 MOTION hearing regarding scheduling order. (Yates, John) (Document title modified on 8/8/2006. (mg))
August 7, 2006 Filing 4260 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4235 MOTION for Reconsideration of July 10, 2006 Order (Doc. #4221) and In The Alternative, For Clarification. (Yates, John)
August 7, 2006 Filing 4259 RESPONSE to Defendant's Objections to Special Master's Scheduling Order Recommendations by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4237 MOTION for Review of Special Master's Recommendations Regarding Discovery Limits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9#10 Exhibit 10#11 Exhibit 11#12 Exhibit 12#13 Exhibit 13#14 Exhibit 14#15 Exhibit 15#16 Exhibit 16#17 Exhibit 17#18 Exhibit 18)(Hubbard, Dirk) (Document title modified on 8/8/2006. (mg))
August 7, 2006 Filing 4258 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4241 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Depose Plaintiff Toby Young in Prison. (Braud, Bert)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4257 ORDER regarding #4225 Proposed Third Amended Second-Phase Scheduling Order by Special Master: an informal conference to discuss scheduling matters is set for Saturday, 8/19/2006 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John W. Lungstrum. See this order for detailed information regarding this matter. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/04/06. (mg)
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4256 ORDER regarding #4102 Motion for Review and Objections to Paragraph 8 of the Magistrate Judge's 04/25/06 Order: Plaintiffs shall have ten (10) days from the date the magistrate judge issues an order resolving #4235 Motion for Reconsideration, to file a supplemental brief. Defendant shall have ten (10) days thereafter to file a supplemental brief in response. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/03/06. (mg)
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4255 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4196 Motion for Review. Plaintiff's objection to the magistrate judge's 03/21/06 order compelling plaintiffs to respond to defendant's Fourth Interrogatory No. 2 is sustained. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/03/06. (mg)
August 3, 2006 Filing 4254 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Third Request for Admissisons, Fifth Request for Production of Documents and Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Sprint/United Management Company. (Gavin, Patrick)
August 3, 2006 Filing 4253 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Gene Betts on September 7, 2006. (Egan, Dennis)
August 3, 2006 Filing 4252 SEALED EXHIBIT G IN SUPPORT of #4251 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Document #1000194203 Without Redactions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (mg) (hw).
August 2, 2006 Filing 4251 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Document #1000194203 Without Redactions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G - FILED UNDER SEAL#8 Exhibit H) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 8/3/2006. (mg))
August 1, 2006 Filing 4250 MOTION to Compel Resumption of Deposition of James Kissinger by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
August 1, 2006 Filing 4249 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Final Phase II Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Sprint/United Management Company. (Gavin, Patrick)
July 31, 2006 Filing 4248 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company regarding #4234 SEALEDMOTION for Reconsideration of July 1, 2006 Order Regarding Adverse Impact Documents. (mg) (hw).
July 31, 2006 Filing 4247 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF regarding #3595 Second MOTION to Declare Invalid Defendant Sprint's Assertions of Privilege Where Legal Counsel was not Involvedby Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9)(Hubbard, Dirk) (Document title modified on 8/1/2006. (mg))
July 28, 2006 Filing 4246 MOTION to Compel Documents with Original Bates Numbers by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9#11 Exhibit 10#12 Exhibit 11#13 Exhibit 12#14 Exhibit 13#15 Exhibit 14#16 Exhibit 15#17 Exhibit 16#18 Exhibit 17) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Modified on 8/1/2006. (mg))
July 28, 2006 Filing 4245 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Transmittal E-Mails in Native Format by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Modified on 8/1/2006. (mg))
July 27, 2006 Filing 4244 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Attachments to E-Mails by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9#11 Exhibit 10#12 Exhibit 11#13 Exhibit 12#14 Exhibit 13#15 Exhibit 14#16 Exhibit 15#17 Exhibit 16#18 Exhibit 17#19 Exhibit 18#20 Exhibit 19#21 Exhibit 20#22 Exhibit 21#23 Exhibit 22#24 Exhibit 23#25 Exhibit 24#26 Exhibit 25#27 Exhibit 26#28 Exhibit 27#29 Exhibit 28#30 Exhibit 29#31 Exhibit 30#32 Exhibit 31#33 Exhibit 32#34 Exhibit 33#35 Exhibit 34#36 Exhibit 35#37 Exhibit 36#38 Exhibit 37#39 Exhibit 38#40 Exhibit 39#41 Exhibit 40#42 Exhibit 41#43 Exhibit 42#44 Exhibit 43#45 Exhibit 44#46 Exhibit 45#47 Exhibit 46#48 Exhibit 47#49 Exhibit 48#50 Exhibit 49#51 Exhibit 50#52 Exhibit 51#53 Exhibit 52#54 Exhibit 53#55 Exhibit 54#56 Exhibit 55#57 Exhibit 56#58 Exhibit 57#59 Exhibit 58#60 Exhibit 59#61 Exhibit 60#62 Exhibit 61#63 Exhibit 62#64 Exhibit 63) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 8/8/2006. (mg))
July 26, 2006 Filing 4243 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Carol Morahan re: #4207 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Video Conferencing)(Blakely, Deborah)
July 26, 2006 Filing 4242 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4241 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Depose Plaintiff Toby Young in Prison by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Costello, Robert)
July 26, 2006 Filing 4241 MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Depose Plaintiff Toby Young in Prison by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company (Costello, Robert)
July 25, 2006 Filing 4240 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Carolyn Adams-Hawkins on August 2, 2006 at 1:30 PM. (Dupont, Philip)
July 25, 2006 Filing 4239 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Dale Aston on July 31, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
July 24, 2006 Filing 4238 MOTION for hearing regarding scheduling order by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
July 24, 2006 Filing 4237 MOTION for Review of Special Master's Recommendations Regarding Discovery Limits by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - excerpts from meet and confer transcript#2 Exhibit B - excerpts from status hearing transcript#3 Exhibit C - excerpts from Special Master conference transcript) (Yates, John)
July 24, 2006 Filing 4236 MOTION for Rule 16 Conference by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John) (Motion title modified on 7/26/2006. (mg))
July 24, 2006 Filing 4235 MOTION for Reconsideration of July 10, 2006 Order (Doc. #4221) and In The Alternative, For Clarification by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Egan, Dennis) (Motion title modified on 7/26/2006. (mg))
July 18, 2006 Filing 4234 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of July 1, 2006, Order #4213 and, in the Alternative, for Clarification; Motion for Stay; and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (mg) (hw).
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4233 ORDER granting #4231 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of July 1, 2006 Order. Plaintiffs are hereby granted leave to file their Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's July 1, 2006 (doc. 4213) Order under seal. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 7/18/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
July 17, 2006 Filing 4232 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4196 MOTION for Review and Objections to Memorandum and Order Compelling Plaintiffs to Respond to Discovery Requests Regarding Individual Issues. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(DeFrain, Brian) (Duplicate text removed on 7/18/2006. (mg))
July 17, 2006 Filing 4231 MOTION for Leave to file Under Seal Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of July 1, 2006, Order (Doc #4213) and, in the Alternative, for Clarification; Motion for Stay; and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
July 13, 2006 Filing 4230 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shirley Williams of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's Fourth Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiffs. (Meyers, Martin)
July 13, 2006 Filing 4229 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs' Tenth Interrogatories by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
July 13, 2006 Filing 4228 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shirley Williams of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendant's Second Request for Admissions to Plaintiff. (Hubbard, Dirk)
July 13, 2006 Filing 4227 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint/United Management Company of Sprint's Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions. (Yates, John)
July 12, 2006 Filing 4226 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4207 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Carol Morahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Costello, Robert)
July 11, 2006 Filing 4224 REPLY to Response to #4178 MOTION for Protective Order of Kathy J. Lockaby by Plaintiff Kathy J. Lockaby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration#2 Exhibit B- Videoconferencing)(Blakely, Deborah) (Document title modified on 7/12/2006. (mg))
July 11, 2006 Filing 4223 REPLY to Response to #4149 MOTION for Protective Order of Matt Borkowski by Plaintiff Matthew J. Borkowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration#2 Exhibit B- Videoconferencing)(Blakely, Deborah) (Document title modified on 7/12/2006. (mg))
July 10, 2006 Filing 4225 REPORT TO THE COURT by John R. Phillips, Special Master. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Third Amended, Second-Phase Scheduling Order) Any motion for review or objections to the Special Master's Report to the Court and proposed Third Amended, Second-Phase Scheduling Order shall be filed within ten (10) days of the date of this filing.
July 10, 2006 Filing 4222 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF DOCUMENT ATTACHMENT by Deputy Clerk regarding #4221 Order. A second exhibit of the Transcript of 4-20-2006 Discovery Conference, pages 41-59, has been attached to that docket entry, and is also attached to this notice for the purpose of electronic notification. Contact the Clerk's Office with any questions. (mg)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4221 ORDER re #4212 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Review. Factual findings re #3580 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 7/10/2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Transcript of 4-20-2006 Discovery Conference; #(2) Exhibit Transcript of 4-20-2006 Discovery Conference, pages 41-59)(byk) (Exhibit #2 added on 7/10/2006. (mg))
July 10, 2006 Filing 4220 REPLY in Support of #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue by Plaintiffs. (Blakely, Deborah) (Document title modified and text removed on 7/11/2006. (mg))
July 10, 2006 Filing 4219 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Deborah M. Hufnagel re: #4150 MOTION for Protective Order of Deborah Hufnagel. (Blakely, Deborah) (Document association modified and text removed on 7/11/2006. (mg))
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4218 ORDER granting #4216 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Court's July 1, 2006 Order Pending a Motion for Reconsideration or an Objection to be Filed. To preserve the status quo, the provisions of the Court's July 1, 2006 Memorandum and Order (doc. 4213) ordering Plaintiffs to return the inadvertently disclosed adverse impact/due diligence documents, and all copies thereof, within five (5) days from the date of the Memorandum and Order is hereby stayed until further order of the Court. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 7/10/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
July 7, 2006 Filing 4217 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4216 MOTION to Stay regarding #4213 Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection. (Dupont, Philip)
July 6, 2006 Filing 4216 MOTION to Stay regarding #4213 Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection, by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
July 5, 2006 Filing 4215 STIPULATION: Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Due Dates For Certain Discovery by Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
July 3, 2006 Filing 4214 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4196 MOTION for Review and Objections to Memorandum and Order Compelling Plaintiffs to Respond to Discovery Requests Regarding Individual Issues. (Yates, John)
July 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3542 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief with Regard to Documents Inadvertently Disclosed by Defendant and Claimed to be Privileged; Plaintiffs shall return the inadvertently disclosed documents at issue, and all copies thereof, within five (5) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. See Memorandum and Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 07/01/2006 (mts).
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER taking under advisement #4102 Motion for Review and objections to paragraph 8 of the magistrate judge's April 25, 2006 order. This matter is remanded to the magistrate judge as set forth in this order. Upon the magistrate judge's filing the additional factual findings referred to in this order, plaintiffs shall have 10 days from the date thereof to supplement their brief with specific reference to the magistrate judge's findings and defendant shall have 10 days thereafter to file a supplemental brief in response.. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/30/2006. (ses, )
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4211 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4100 Motion for Review and objections to the magistrate judge's April 25, 2006 order. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/30/2006. (ses)
June 29, 2006 Filing 4210 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #4153 MOTION to Strike #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido by Plaintiff Shirley Williams (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 29, 2006 Filing 4209 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Carolyn Hawkins on July 12, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
June 29, 2006 Filing 4208 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Ronnie Cashwell on July 10, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
June 28, 2006 Filing 4207 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Carol Morahan. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Morahan Declaration) (Graham, Gene)
June 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4206 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's June 7, 2006 Order Appointing Special Master (doc. 4177), Defendant's #4198 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in support of Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317 (doc. 4143) and Plaintiffs' #4202 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Protective Order (docs. 4149, 4150, 4153 & 4178) are hereby referred to the Special Master. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/27/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
June 27, 2006 Filing 4205 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Gene Betts on August 10, 2006. (Egan, Dennis)
June 27, 2006 Filing 4204 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re: #4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317. (Costello, Robert)
June 23, 2006 Filing 4203 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shirley Williams of Plaintiffs' Thirteenth Supplemental Voluntary Disclosures. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 22, 2006 Filing 4202 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4149 MOTION for Protective Order of Matt Borkowski, #4150 MOTION for Protective Order of Deborah Hufnagel by Plaintiffs Matthew J. Borkowski, Christine Evelyn Monticue, Deborah M. Hufnagel. (Blakely, Deborah)
June 22, 2006 Filing 4201 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4178 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Kathy Lockaby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Costello, Robert) (Modified on 6/23/2006. (mg))
June 22, 2006 Filing 4200 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Tammy Edwards on July 31, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 21, 2006 Filing 4199 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Gene Betts on June 30, 2006. (Egan, Dennis)
June 20, 2006 Filing 4198 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #4172 Memorandum in Opposition to #4143 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317 by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Costello, Robert)
June 20, 2006 Filing 4197 STIPULATION (Parties Joint Stipulation Regarding Due Dates for Certain Discovery) by Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 19, 2006 Filing 4196 MOTION for Review and Objections to Memorandum and Order Compelling Plaintiffs to Respond to Discovery Requests Regarding Individual Issues by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin)
June 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4195 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's June 7, 2006 Order Appointing Special Master (doc. 4177), Plaintiffs' #4178 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Kathy Lockaby is hereby referred to the Special Master. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/19/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
June 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4194 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO SPECIAL MASTER. In accordance with the Court's June 7, 2006 Order Appointing Special Master (doc. 4177), Plaintiffs' #4188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #4153 MOTION to Strike, #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositon of Eduardo Garrido is hereby referred to the Special Master. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/19/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
June 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4193 ORDER granting #4107 Motion for Leave to File one day out of time their motion for review and objections to the magistrate's order compelling plaintiffs to answer interrogatories about individual issues at the pattern and practice state of this litigation. Plaintiffs shall file the motion for review that is attached as Exhibit A totheir motion no later than Wednesday, June 21, 2006. Signed by Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/19/2006. (ses)
June 19, 2006 Filing 4192 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Ken Obercrom on August 3, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Klamann, John)
June 19, 2006 Filing 4191 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative re the identity of each RIF Project Manager, etc. on August 1, 2006 at 9:30 AM. (Klamann, John)
June 19, 2006 Filing 4190 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Debra Simpson on June 22, 2006 at 10:00 AM. (Graham, Gene)
June 19, 2006 Filing 4189 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint Witness re SPR-W1460690 - 1460695 on August 2, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Klamann, John)
June 16, 2006 Filing 4188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #4153 MOTION to Strike #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 16, 2006 Filing 4187 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Aiguel Arredondo, Jr. re: #4095 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Miguel Arredondo. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A- Arredondo Declaration; #(2) Exhibit B- Arredondo B; #(3) Exhibit C - Videoconferencing)(Graham, Gene)
June 15, 2006 Filing 4186 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company , with June 1, 2006 Court Order. (Dupont, Philip)
June 15, 2006 Filing 4185 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Michael Kochevar re: #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kochevar Declaration#2 Exhibit B- Video Conferencing)(Graham, Gene)
June 15, 2006 Filing 4184 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4147 MOTION to Strike #4144 Certificate of Compliance, #4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Costello, Robert)
June 15, 2006 Filing 4183 STIPULATION -- Parties Joint Stipulatoin Regarding Due Dates for Certain Discovery by Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 13, 2006 Filing 4182 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4150 MOTION for Protective Order Deborah Hufnagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Costello, Robert)
June 13, 2006 Filing 4181 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4149 MOTION for Protective Order Matt Borkowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Costello, Robert)
June 13, 2006 Filing 4180 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Costello, Robert)
June 8, 2006 Filing 4179 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Eduardo S. Garrido re: #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Graham, Gene)
June 8, 2006 Filing 4178 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Kathy J. Lockaby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Graham, Gene)
June 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4177 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. John R. Phillips is hereby appointed as Special Master in this case. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/7/2006.(byk)
June 7, 2006 Filing 4176 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative re: Document #1133761-1134365 and others on July 5, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 7, 2006 Filing 4175 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative re: Document #1133306-08 and #1180036-37 on July 6, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 7, 2006 Filing 4174 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative re: Document #1002879-81 on July 7, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4173 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4102 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Paragraph 8 of Magistrate's Order of April 25, 2006 [Doc. # 3865]. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4172 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4171 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Representative of Sprint regarding identity of Sprint work groups which did not use Displacement Guidelines on June 26, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4170 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint representative re RIF-related practices,policies and procedures on June 30, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4169 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Representative of Sprint re RIF-related training on June 29, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4168 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Representative of Sprint re RIF Project Managers on July 10, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4167 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Representative of Sprint re Candidate Selection Worksheet on June 28, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4166 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint representative re Network Services RIF, Bates 190606-655 and all Exhibits on July 10, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4165 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of John St. Angelo on June 12, 2006. (Klamann, John)
June 5, 2006 Filing 4164 Defendant's Consent to Appointment of John Phillips as Special Master by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John) (Document title modified on 6/6/2006. (mg))
June 5, 2006 Filing 4163 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Jerine Newsome on July 7, 2006 at 8:00 AM. (Graham, Gene)
June 5, 2006 Filing 4162 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Consent to Appointment of John Phillips as Special Master by Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 5, 2006 Filing 4161 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G)(Costello, Robert) (Typographical error corrected on 6/6/2006. (mg))
June 5, 2006 Filing 4160 STIPULATION -- Joint Stipulation Regarding Due Dates for Certain Discovery by Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 5, 2006 Filing 4159 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #4097 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Howard Holbrook. (Graham, Gene)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4158 ORDER granting #4151 Plaintiffs' unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply. Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, until June 19, 2006, to file their reply in support of their #4095 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Miguel Arredondo. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/2/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4157 ORDER memorializing 6/1/2006 discovery/status conference rulings. #3845 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice for the Deposition of Gaylene Van Horn Motion is found to be moot. See Order for further rulings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 6/2/2006. (byk)
June 2, 2006 Filing 4156 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Betty Cabello on June 8, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
June 2, 2006 Filing 4155 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company executed upon Joe McKinney on May 31, 2006 by Personal Service. (Dupont, Philip)
June 2, 2006 Filing 4154 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Costello, Robert)
June 2, 2006 Filing 4153 MOTION to Strike #4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue, #4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar, #4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido, #4149 MOTION for Protective Order Matt Borkowski, #4150 MOTION for Protective Order Deborah Hufnagel by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Costello, Robert)
June 1, 2006 Filing 4152 Minute Entry for Discovery/Status Conference held on 6/1/2006 before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Written Order to follow. (byk)
June 1, 2006 Filing 4151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #4095 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Miguel Arredondo by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Graham, Gene) (Motion title and document association modified on 6/2/2006. (mg))
June 1, 2006 Filing 4150 MOTION for Protective Order of Deborah Hufnagel by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (Graham, Gene)
June 1, 2006 Filing 4149 MOTION for Protective Order of Matt Borkowski by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (Graham, Gene)
June 1, 2006 Filing 4148 MOTION for Protective Order of Plaintiff Chris Monticue by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (Graham, Gene)
June 1, 2006 Filing 4147 MOTION to Strike #4144 Certificate of Compliance and #4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317 by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 31, 2006 Filing 4146 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Gaylene VanHorn on June 9, 2006. (Egan, Dennis)
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4145 ORDER regarding Appointment of Special Master for discovery. Within five (5) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a pleading indicating whether they would be willing to consent to the appointment of John R. Phillips as special master even though his firm has represented Sprint in the matters disclosed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/30/2006.(byk)
May 26, 2006 Filing 4144 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE (Affidavit of Compliance) by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317. (Costello, Robert) Modified title 5/30/2006. (kao)
May 26, 2006 Filing 4143 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Concerning Deposition Exhibit 1317 by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I) (Costello, Robert)
May 26, 2006 Filing 4142 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of James Kissinger on June 2, 2006 at 9:00 A.M. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 26, 2006 Filing 4141 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative on AAR Surveys on June 1, 2006 at 9:00 A.M. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 26, 2006 Filing 4140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Eleventh Request for Production of Document by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
May 25, 2006 Filing 4139 Minute Entry for Telephone Status Conference re: special master held on 5/25/2006 before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Next Discovery/Status Conference set for 6/1/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. (byk)
May 25, 2006 Filing 4138 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patrick M. Gavin on behalf of Sprint/United Management Company. (Gavin, Patrick)
May 23, 2006 Filing 4137 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4102 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Paragraph 8 of Magistrate's Order of April 25, 2006 [Doc. # 3865]. (Yates, John)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Eleventh and Twelfth Sets of Discovery by Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4135 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4101 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Carldene Sue Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Costello, Robert)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4134 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4096 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Dale Aston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Costello, Robert)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4133 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4097 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Howard Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Costello, Robert)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4132 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4099 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Affolder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Costello, Robert)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4131 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4098 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Paul LeMay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Costello, Robert)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4130 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4100 MOTION for Review and Objections to Paragraph 11 Magistrate's Order of April 25, 2006 Doc. #3865. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G)(Costello, Robert) (Text modified on 5/23/2006. (mg))
May 22, 2006 Filing 4129 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #4095 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Miguel Arredondo. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B #(3) Exhibit C #(4) Exhibit D #(5) Exhibit E #(6) Exhibit F #(7) Exhibit G #(8) Exhibit H)(Costello, Robert) (Duplicate text removed on 5/23/2006. (mg))
May 22, 2006 Filing 4128 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Debra Zissis on May 25, 2006 at 9:00 a.m.. (Dupont, Philip)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4127 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Kevin Farley on May 24, 2006 at 1:30 p.m.. (Dupont, Philip)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4126 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Carol Faucher on May 24, 2006 at 1:30 p.m.. (Dupont, Philip)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4125 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Carol Bussing on June 8, 2006 at 10:30 a.m.. (Graham, Gene)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4124 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Frederic Fischer on May 22, 2006 at 1:30 p.m.. (Dupont, Philip)
May 22, 2006 Filing 4123 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Eduardo Garrido by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B) (Graham, Gene) (Text modified on 5/23/2006. (mg))
May 19, 2006 Filing 4122 STIPULATION -- Joint Stipulation Regarding Suspension of Due Dates for Certain Discovery by Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 19, 2006 Filing 4121 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Defendant Sprint re Extraordinary Achievement Award on May 31, 2006. (Klamann, John)
May 19, 2006 Filing 4120 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Defendant Sprint re adverse impact processes and procedures on May 31, 2006. (Klamann, John)
May 19, 2006 Filing 4119 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint Witness re SPR-W1460690 through 1460695 on May 31, 2006. (Klamann, John)
May 19, 2006 Filing 4118 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Sprint Witness re SPR-W1356353 and/or 1356326 on June 5, 2006. (Klamann, John)
May 19, 2006 Filing 4117 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Kochevar by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B) (Graham, Gene) (Motion title modified on 5/22/2006. (mg))
May 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4116 ORDER memorializing rulings from 5/18/2006 Discovery/Status Conference. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Limitations on All Future Deposition Discovery by Plaintiffs #3846 is denied without prejudice to refiling after the special master is appointed. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Provide Dates #4093 is moot. See Order for further rulings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/18/2006. (byk)
May 18, 2006 Filing 4115 Minute Entry for Discovery/Status Conference held on 5/18/2006 before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. A telephone Status Conference is set for 5/25/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. The parties shall initiate the 2:00 PM conference call. (byk)
May 18, 2006 Filing 4114 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of one or more agents of Sprint who consent to testify on its behalf as to the matters set forth on the attached Exhibit A on 05/26/06. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Meyers, Martin) (Duplicate text removed on 5/19/2006. (mg))
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4113 ORDER granting #4112 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ashley R. Hurst is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Sprint/United Management Company. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 05/17/06. (mg)
May 16, 2006 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 5/16/06 re: #4112 MOTION for attorney Ashley R. Hurst to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number 1002863. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
May 16, 2006 Filing 4112 MOTION for attorney Ashley R. Hurst to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit) (Yates, John)
May 16, 2006 Filing 4111 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Carol Bussing on May 26, 2006 at 9:30 a.m.. (Graham, Gene)
May 15, 2006 Filing 4110 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs. (Egan, Dennis) (Modified on 5/16/2006. (mg))
May 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4109 ORDER denying #3875 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply. At this time, the Court does not believe additional briefing is necessary for resolution of the pending dispute between the parties. If the Court later determines additional briefing would be helpful, the Court will notify the parties and enter the appropriate order. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 5/15/2006.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
May 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4108 ORDER granting #4103 , #4104 , #4105 , and #4106 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys J. Timothy McDonald, Hunter R. Hughes, III, John Da Grosa Smith, and Thomas Joseph Mew, IV are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Sprint/United Management Company. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 05/12/06. (mg)
May 11, 2006 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 5/11/06 re: #4106 MOTION for attorney Thomas Joseph Mew, IV to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number 1002785. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
May 11, 2006 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 5/11/06 re: #4105 MOTION for attorney John Da Grosa Smith to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number 1002784. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
May 11, 2006 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 5/11/06 re: #4104 MOTION for attorney Hunter R. Hughes to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number 1002783. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
May 11, 2006 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID: on 5/11/06 re: #4103 MOTION for attorney J. Timothy McDonald to appear pro hac vice in the amount of $50.00. Receipt Number 1002782. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jb)
May 10, 2006 Filing 4107 MOTION for Leave to file Motion for Review and Objection of Magistrate's Order Out of Time by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (Meyers, Martin) (Duplicate text removed on 5/11/2006. (mg))
May 10, 2006 Filing 4106 MOTION for attorney Thomas Joseph Mew, IV to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit) (Yates, John)
May 10, 2006 Filing 4105 MOTION for attorney John Da Grosa Smith to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit) (Yates, John)
May 10, 2006 Filing 4104 MOTION for attorney Hunter R. Hughes to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit) (Yates, John)
May 10, 2006 Filing 4103 MOTION for attorney J. Timothy McDonald to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit) (Yates, John)
May 9, 2006 Filing 4102 MOTION for Review and Objections to Portions of Paragraph 8 of Magistrate's Order of April 25, 2006 [Doc. #3865] by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1; #(2) Exhibit 2; #(3) Exhibit 3; #(4) Exhibit 4; #(5) Exhibit 5; #(6) Exhibit 6) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Duplicate text removed on 10/2006. (mg))
May 9, 2006 Filing 4101 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Carldene Sue Green by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Duplicate text removed on 5/10/2006. (mg))
May 8, 2006 Filing 4100 MOTION for Review and Objections to Paragraph 11 Magistrate's Order of April 25, 2006 Doc. #3865 by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 5/23/2006. (mg))
May 8, 2006 Filing 4099 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Affolder by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 5/9/2006. (mg))
May 8, 2006 Filing 4098 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Paul LeMay by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 5/9/2006. (mg))
May 8, 2006 Filing 4097 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Howard Holbrook by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 5/9/2006. (mg))
May 8, 2006 Filing 4096 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Dale Aston by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 5/9/2006. (mg))
May 8, 2006 Filing 4095 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Miguel Arredondo by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit B) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Motion title modified on 5/9/2006. (mg))
May 5, 2006 Filing 4094 REPLY to Memorandum in Opposition re #3846 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Limitations on All Future Deposition Discovery by Plaintiffs by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John) (Document title modified on 5/8/2006. (mg))
May 5, 2006 Filing 4093 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Provide Dates for James Kissinger Deposition, AND Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Two-part motion: motion title modified on 5/8/2006. (mg))
May 5, 2006 Filing 4092 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Vickie Koch on May 15, 2006 at 10:30 AM. (Graham, Gene)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4091 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Bill Hanson on 07/24/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4090 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Maureen McGuire on 07/21/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4089 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Lloyd Van Hooser on 07/20/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4088 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint "Catalyst Meeting Video Editing on May 22, 2006. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4087 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Linda Pickett on 07/19/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4086 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Christy Milroy on 07/18/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4085 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint "Catalyst Meeting Videographer on May 23, 2006. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4084 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Greg Cooper on 07/17/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4083 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Andrea Rogers on 07/14/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4082 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Heather Thorndike on 07/13/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4081 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint "Catalyst Meeting Events Group on May 24, 2006. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4080 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Soleno on 07/12/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4079 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Richard Hake on 07/11/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4078 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Roger Bailey on 07/10/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4077 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Ken Winterman on 07/07/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4076 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Lucinda Grove on 07/06/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4075 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Barbara Edwards on 06/30/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4074 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Kirk Baruth on 06/29/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4073 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Terry Yu on 06/28/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4072 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Stevens on 06/27/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4071 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Stephen Geldmacher on 06/26/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4070 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Phillip Garrison on 06/23/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4069 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Thomas Mateer on 06/22/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4068 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of James Mickey on 06/21/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4067 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Ali Zanjani on 06/20/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 4, 2006 Filing 4066 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of William Blessing on 06/19/06 at 9AM. (Klamann, John)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4065 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Noel Strong on May 19, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4064 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Kimberly Klosak on July 31, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4063 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Jennifer Bice on July 31, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4062 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Ted Stock on July 28, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4061 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Mark Bowser on July 28, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4060 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Arthur Chaykin on July 27, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4059 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Melanie Horstmeier on July 27, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4058 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Mike Machell on July 26, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4057 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Dave Pesh on July 25, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4056 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Fernando Ramirez on July 25, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4055 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Rhonda Beeler on July 24, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4054 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Robert Fox on July 24, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4053 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Karen Ynigues on July 21, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4052 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Kimberly Marshall on July 21, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4051 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Maryetta Campbell on July 20, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4050 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Steven Signoff on July 20, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4049 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Kurt Gastrok on July 19, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4048 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of P. Von Der Linde on July 19, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4047 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Keith Woods on July 18, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4046 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Patrick O'Malley on July 18, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4045 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Steven Fennel on July 17, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4044 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Joe Crockett on July 17, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4043 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Anthony D'Agata on July 14, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4042 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representatative of Sprint "Alpha" on July 14, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4041 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint The Project Hemingway Process Guide on July 13, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4040 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint Workforce Planning Group on July 10, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4039 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Faerie Kizzaire on July 10, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4038 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Representative of Sprint who prepared bates 149908 through 149914 on July 11, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4037 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Robert Azzi on July 12, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4036 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Yasef Javadi on July 12, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4035 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Flessas on July 7, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4034 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Amy L. Canton on July 6, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4033 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Diane Parker on July 11, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4032 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Berry on July 13, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4031 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Karin Miller on July 7, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4030 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Oliver Valente on July 6, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4029 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint on National Management Practices training course on June 30, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4028 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Jon Lightle on June 30, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4027 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Michael Hennigan on June 29, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4026 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Walter Novick on June 28, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4025 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of John Yuzdepski on June 27, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4024 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Jody Brann on June 27, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4023 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Dess on June 26, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4022 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Paul Kershisnik on June 23, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4021 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Scott Jensen on June 23, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4020 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Jerald Diepenbrock on June 22, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4019 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Vickie Koch on June 22, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4018 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Bottoms on June 21, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4017 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Joanne Walker on June 21, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4016 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Wilhelm on June 20, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4015 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Tammy Kinney on June 20, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4014 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Daniel Dooley on June 19, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4013 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint on 30(b)(6) AAR on June 19, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4012 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Joseph Edward on June 16, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4011 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Lynn Simpson on June 16, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4010 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Christopher Clark on June 15, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4009 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Debra Simpson on June 15, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4008 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Robert Walsh on June 14, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4007 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Michael W. Stout on June 14, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4006 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Robert Runke on June 13, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 3, 2006 Filing 4005 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Leon Lang on June 13, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 4004 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of John Mihalovich on June 8, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 4003 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Randy Osler on June 9, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 4002 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Phyllis Robertson on June 12, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 4001 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Tom McEvoy on June 7, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 4000 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Karl Kramer on June 6, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3999 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Carl Gast on June 5, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3998 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of David Farmer on June 2, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3997 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Cynthia Taylor-Wright on June 9, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3996 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of John Dupree on June 1, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3995 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative on June 12, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3994 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Dan Falvey on June 8, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3993 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint on June 7, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3992 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Bill Gunter on June 6, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3991 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Catherine Johnson on June 5, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3990 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Authorized Representative of Sprint on June 2, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3989 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Ralph Hodge on June 1, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3988 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Craig Child on May 31, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3987 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Keith Paglusch on May 26, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3986 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of 30(b)(6) Policies & Procedures Re: 1011 on May 25, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3985 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Pamela Johnson on May 24, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3984 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Kathy Walker on May 19, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 2, 2006 Filing 3983 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Don Hallacy on May 22, 2006 (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 1, 2006 Filing 3982 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Jan Price on May 11, 2006. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 1, 2006 Filing 3981 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Defendant of Sprint on May 30, 2006. (Hubbard, Dirk)
May 1, 2006 Filing 3980 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of John St. Angelo on May 16, 2006. (Hubbard, Dirk)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3979 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Request No. 3 of Plaintiffs' Twelfth Request for Production of Documents by Sprint/United Management Company. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3978 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Karen Pence on June 29, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3977 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Stacy Villines on June 29, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3976 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of William Benjamin Terrill on June 29, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3975 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of David Rohm on June 29, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3974 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Fred Raby on June 28, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3973 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Robyn Posey-Blue on June 28, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3972 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Linda Petersen on June 28, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3971 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Mike O'Brien on June 28, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3970 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Connie Miller on June 27, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3969 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Brenda Long on June 27, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3968 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Kathy Lockaby on June 27, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3967 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Martha Lally on June 27, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3966 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Frank Kulikowski on June 26, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3965 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #3875 MOTION (Application) for Leave to file Sur-Reply Brief Regarding Adverse Impact Documents (Yates, John)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3964 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of J. Roger Hunt on June 26, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3963 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Deborah Hufnagel on June 26, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3962 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Kevin Henry on June 26, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3961 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Linda Henderson on June 22, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3960 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Carolyn Hawkins on June 22, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3959 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Debra Fields-Williams on June 22, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3958 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Ron Evangelista on June 22, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3957 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of H. Marie Church on June 21, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3956 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Paul Buehler on June 21, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3955 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Joan Boro on June 21, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3954 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Jerald Bethke on June 21, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3953 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Rick Starling on June 20, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3952 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of B.J. Shiplet on June 20, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3951 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of William Radel on June 20, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3950 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Carol Morahan on June 20, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3949 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Christine Monticue on June 19, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3948 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Lonnie Miller on June 19, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3947 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Gerald Mersing on June 19, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3946 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Russell Mehl on June 19, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3945 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Cy Matin (Nia) on June 15, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3944 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Carol Majd on June 15, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3943 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Dianna Williams on June 15, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3942 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Mark Lundy on June 15, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3941 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Sally Leon-Guerrero on June 15, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3940 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Doreen Ledig on June 14, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3939 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Virender Kumar on June 14, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3938 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Judith Howard on June 14, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3937 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Robert Hodgson on June 14, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3936 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of John Hegstrom on June 13, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3935 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Ruby Harvey-Burgin on June 13, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3934 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Charles Oliver Hammond on June 13, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3933 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Mark Gaff on June 13, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3932 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Ralph Evans on June 12, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3931 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Marie Edwards on June 12, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3930 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Richard Eaton on June 12, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3929 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Sherry Drury on June 12, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3928 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Gale Dorman on June 8, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3927 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Beatrice Dewing on June 8, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3926 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of James Delaroche on June 8, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3925 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Barbara Davis on June 8, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3924 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Lennox Danielson on June 7, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3923 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Allen Dandeneau on June 7, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3922 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Barbara Combs on June 7, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3921 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Dave Carmel on June 7, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3920 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Betty Cabello on June 6, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3919 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Dayne Bozille on June 6, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3918 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Timothy Boyd on June 6, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3917 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Matthew Bordowski on June 6, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3916 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Nicole Bledsoe-Wise on June 5, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3915 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Rob Benson on June 5, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3914 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Joe McKinney on June 5, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3913 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Michael Kochevar on May 26, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3912 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Samir Demian on May 26, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3911 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Roger Kelly on May 25, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3910 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Susan Schwartz on May 25, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3909 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Deborah Morton on May 25, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3908 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Robin Karres on May 24, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3907 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Rosemary Delpino on May 24, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3906 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Larrie Loehr on May 24, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3905 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Frederic Fischer on May 23, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3904 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Howard Holbrook on May 23, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3903 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Sandra Edwards on May 19, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3902 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Claude Powell on May 19, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3901 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Randal Hammond on May 19, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3900 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Lee Lewis on May 18, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3899 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Harold Gray on May 18, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3898 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Craig Price on May 18, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3897 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Noel Strong on May 18, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3896 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Miguel Arredondo on May 17, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3895 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of David Nichols on May 17, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3894 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Debra Zissis on May 17, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3893 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Diane Maxwell-Lambert on May 16, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3892 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of William Chance on May 16, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3891 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of David Johnson on May 16, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3890 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Eduardo Garrido on May 12, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3889 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Kevin Farley on May 12, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3888 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Daniel Gilliam on May 12, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3887 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Patricia Cahoon on May 11, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3886 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Abigail Davis on May 11, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3885 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Howard Tiffany on May 11, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3884 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Joseph Carroll on May 11, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3883 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Christina Siemens on May 10, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3882 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of James Canter on May 10, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3881 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Rafael Molina on May 10, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3880 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Edward Birch on May 10, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3879 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Jacob Rodriguez on May 9, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3878 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Daniel Byrne on May 9, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3877 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Donna Kofsky on May 9, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 27, 2006 Filing 3876 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Peggy Broughton on May 9, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3875 MOTION (Application) for Leave to file Sur-Reply Brief Regarding Adverse Impact Documentsby Plaintiff Shirley Williams. (Meyers, Martin) (Motion title modified on 4/27/2006. (mg))
April 26, 2006 Filing 3874 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Kevin D. Brown on April 28, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3873 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Gordon Dean Brown on May 5, 2006 at 1:30 PM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3872 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Debra Markham on May 5, 2006 at 1:30 PM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3871 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of David Markham on May 5, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3870 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Thomas Bilvin on May 5, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3869 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Robert McIlrath on May 4, 2006 at 1:30 PM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3868 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Ronnie Cashwell on May 4, 2006 at 1:30 PM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3867 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of Lonnie Daniels on May 4, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 26, 2006 Filing 3866 NOTICE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company of taking deposition of John Beal on May 4, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Dupont, Philip)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3865 ORDER memorializing and supplementing the Court's rulings at the 4/20/2006 discovery conference. ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3580 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, granting in part and denying in part #3592 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, denying #3602 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, denying #3604 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, granting #3618 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, denying #3626 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, granting #3732 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, granting #3803 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, denying #3807 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order, denying #3808 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order, denying #3809 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order, denying #3834 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, denying #3835 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of 3/21/2006 Order. See Order for further details and rulings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/25/2006. (byk)
April 24, 2006 Filing 3864 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Vickie Koch on May 15, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Graham, Gene)
April 21, 2006 Filing 3863 SEALED POST-EVIDENTIARY HEARING REPLY to Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Brief Regarding Adverse Impact Documents by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (mg) (Filed Under Seal) (hw).
April 21, 2006 Filing 3862 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Motions for Protective Order Regarding Limitations on All Future Depositions by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #3846 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Limitations on All Future Deposition Discovery by Plaintiffs, #3844 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice for the Deposition of Gavin Pinchback, #3843 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice for the Deposition of Renee Finks, #3845 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice for the Deposition of Gaylene Van Horn. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index#2 Appendix A#3 Appendix B#4 Appendix C#5 Appendix D)(Hubbard, Dirk) (Document title modified on 4/24/2006. (mg))
April 20, 2006 Filing 3861 Minute Entry for Discovery/Status Conferenc held on 4/20/2006 before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Next Discovery/Status Conference set for 5/18/2006 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Bowen.) (byk)
April 19, 2006 Filing 3860 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re: #3809 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Out-of-Town Opt-In Plaintiffs and Request That Such Depositions be Conducted by Telephone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(DeFrain, Brian) (Duplicate text removed on 4/21/2006. (mg))
April 18, 2006 Filing 3859 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Shirley Williams executed upon Lamont Eanes on 4/18/06 by Personal Service. (Dennis, Stephen)
April 18, 2006 Filing 3858 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #3835 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3749 Order on Motion to Compel, and, in the Alternative, for Clarification; and Plaintiffs' Extension of Time to Respond Memorandum in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider. (Yates, John)
April 18, 2006 Filing 3857 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Lamont Eanes on 4/25/06. (Dennis, Stephen)
April 18, 2006 Filing 3856 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Victoria Koch on May 10, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (Graham, Gene)
April 18, 2006 Filing 3855 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shirley Williams of taking deposition of Carol Bussing on May 12, 2006 at 2:00 PM. (Graham, Gene)
April 17, 2006 Filing 3854 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff Shirley Williams re #3834 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Deposition Notice for the Deposition of Gene Betts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Appendix B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D-Excerpt from transcript#5 Exhibit E-Excerpt from transcript)(Dennis, Stephen)
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3853 ORDER granting #3851 Sprint's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #3847 Plaintiff's Sealed Post-Hearing Brief Regarding Adverse Impact Documents. For good cause shown, Defendant Sprint is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including April 21, 2006, by which to file its Reply to Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Brief Regarding Adverse Impact Documents. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/13/2006. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
April 11, 2006 Filing 3852 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #3807 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Opt-In Plaintiffs Who Have Been De-Listed and Who are Thus Not Witnesses for the Pattern and Practice Trial and Memorandum in Support, #3808 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Opt-In Plaintiffs Who Have Never Been Listed as Witnesses for the Pattern and Practice Trial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P)(Costello, Robert) (Duplicate text removed on 4/12/2006. (mg))
April 11, 2006 Filing 3851 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #3847 Sealed Document - Plaintiffs' post-hearing brief on adverse impact documents by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)
April 11, 2006 Filing 3850 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice for the Deposition of Sprint Employee (#3815) by Sprint/United Management Company re #3815 Notice to Take Deposition. (Dupont, Philip)
April 10, 2006 Filing 3849 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #3846 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Limitations on All Future Deposition Discovery by Plaintiffs by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - list of deposition topics)(Yates, John)
April 10, 2006 Filing 3848 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company re #3803 MOTION to Compel in Relation to Deposition of John St. Angelo and Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Dupont, Philip)
April 7, 2006 Filing 3847 SEALED DOCUMENT (Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Brief Regarding Adverse Impact Documents). (mg) (hw).
April 7, 2006 Filing 3846 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Limitations on All Future Deposition Discovery by Plaintiffs by Defendant Sprint/United Management Company. (Yates, John)