Monopoly Acquisitions, et al v. T.E.N. Investments, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Odessa Ford, LLC, Monopoly Acquisitions, and Odessa Chrysler Jeep Dodge, LLC
Defendant: T.E.N. Investments, Inc, Anthony Soave, Darlene Soave, Andrea Soave, Bryant Frank, Richard Brockhaus, Michael Hollerbach, Michael L Piesko, Yale Levin, Angelique Soave and Kathleen B McCann
Case Number: 2:2007cv02161
Filed: April 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part 214 Motion to Retax Costs; sustaining 215 Motion to Retax Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/10/2009. (nf)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 203 Motion for Reconsideration and overruling 205 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/9/2009. (nf)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Defendant's 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 158 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of Odessa Plaintiffs Regarding Liability Only; denying as moot Defendant's 181 Motion to Exclude Chris topher Payne's Lay Opinion Damages Testimony at Trial; denying as moot Plaintiff's 186 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude Christopher Payne's Lay Opinion Damages Testimony at Trial. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/8/2008. (jw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monopoly Acquisitions, et al v. T.E.N. Investments, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.E.N. Investments, Inc
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Soave
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Soave
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Soave
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Frank
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Brockhaus
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hollerbach
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L Piesko
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale Levin
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelique Soave
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen B McCann
Represented By: Staci Olvera Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odessa Ford, LLC
Represented By: Rhonda Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monopoly Acquisitions,
Represented By: Rhonda Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odessa Chrysler Jeep Dodge, LLC
Represented By: Rhonda Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?