Schlumberger Technology Corporation v. Greenwich Metals, Inc

Plaintiff: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Defendant: Greenwich Metals, Inc
Case Number: 2:2007cv02252
Filed: June 12, 2007
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 104 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 111 Motion for Sanctions. In Court Hearing is scheduled for 1/25/2010. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/31/2009. (cm) Modified on 1/4/2010 to correct Judge name (alm).
December 30, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/30/2009. (cm)
May 21, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 60 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Expert Disclosures Out of Time; denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Expert Disclosures; granting 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 5/21/09. (sj)
October 27, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sustaining 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to third-party defendant Xstrata Canada Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/27/2008. (bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlumberger Technology Corporation v. Greenwich Metals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Represented By: Lori R. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Metals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?