Fulghum et al v. Embarq Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Faye P. Abbott, Judith R. Adams, Lois J. Ainley, Lois J. Ainsley, Robert D. Aldridge, James L. Alford, Johnny W. Allen, Mary S. Allen, Thomas G. Allgood, Jr., Evelyn A. Alligood, Henry W. Ammons, Anzilia K. Anderson, Clara W.L. Anderson, Mary Ellen Anderson, Donald E. Armstrong, Howard D. Armstrong, James E. Armstrong, Michael L. Atkinson, Charles E. Autry, Dwight C. Autry, James L. Autry, Lila H. Autry, W. J. Avent, Effie H. Avery, Janie B. Ayers, George W. Bailey, Jack Bailey, Johnny Preston Baker, Joseph K. Baker, Lough Massey Baker, Mary Harrell Baker, Ophelia H. Baker, Rufus James Baker, Shelby M. Baker, William A. Baker, Clifford E. Ball, Naomi M. Ball, Thomas V. Barden, Katie Cook Barnes, Sue Barnes, Thomas Scott Barnes, Willie E. Barnes, Judith W. Basnight, Gerald Bass, Verona W. Bass, Carolyn J. Batchelor, Verona W. Bath, Frances L. Batts, Gerald C. Batts, Mary P. Batts, Madeline B. Beach, Carl Beacham, Jr., Linda C. Beaman, Noah Alfred Beamon, Jenette C. Bell, V. Allen Bender, III, John O. Benson, Peggy J. Biggs, Ronnie Bill, L.S. Blades, III, Essie L. Blalock, Curtis W. Bland, Wynona H. Blount, Mel Steven Bobbitt, Johnny D. Bordeaux, Ann L. Boyette, Geraldine E. Boyette, Jack H. Boyette, Mary B. Boykin, Joyce C. Bracy, Marian E. Bracy, Claude Braddy, Jr., Janice C. Braddy, Thelma Robbins Braddy, Steven P. Bradley, Jean T. Bradshaw, Edward R. Brady, Mary Ann Brame, Charles M. Bratcher, Josephine S. Bratcher, Linda G. Brewer, James Woodie Britt, Mary E. Britton, Audrey A. Brown, Carol J. Brown, Eddie R. Brown, Graham T. Brown, Henry W. Brown, Janice Brown, William P. Brown, Gordon D. Brunson, Roberta H. Brunson, Marie W. Bucknam, Betsy Bullock, Geneva E. Bullock, Geneya Bullock, Mattie J. Bullock, Patricia W. Bunch, Tony A. Bunch, Carol S. Burchette, John Lee Burgess, James F. Burnette, Ethel A. Burns, Clayton O. Burris, Jr., Clayton O. Burriss, Jr., Diamond H. Butler, Dorothy G. Butler, Franklin D. Butler, Robert C. Byrd, Ruth M. Cagle, Bertha S. Campbell, Shirley G. Canady, Kerry W. Carawan, Daniel H. Carlisle, Stanton R. Carnes, Alice B. Carpenter, Betty A. Carpenter, Kenneth A. Carpenter, Milton R. Carpenter, Betty M. Carr, Dolores P. Carraway, Linda K. Carroll, Lucille H. Carta, Bernard John Carter, Jr., Carl Ray Carter, Melvin S. Carter, Lois Ann Carver, Bobby B. Cashwell, Glenn M. Causway, John W. Cherry, Betty W. Chesson, Linda W. Chesson, Eileen L. Childers, Ann P. Chipps, Daisy A. Clark, Donald E. Clark, Donald R. Clark, Robert L. Clegg, Shirley W. Cleland, Cullen Cobb, Jr., Earl G. Coble, James C. Cofield, Josie D. Cofield, Annie M. Coggins, Colleen H. Coker, Naomi M. Coker, Leo Colabauth, Alvin L. Coley, Linda C. Coley, Raymond A. Collins, Victoria C. Collins, Joyce L. Connor, Nancy D. Cook, Carl T. Cooley, William H. Cooley, Ann G. Cooper, Callie L. Cooper, Charles W. Cooper, Edward G. Corey, James H. Council, Dolley E. Cox, Walter L. Cratch, John W. Craver, Veronica P. Crawley, Henry E. Creel, Arvey O. Crocker, Jr., Shelby A. Croom, Marshall W. Crumpler, Melvin D. Crumpler, Nancy R. Curtis, Harold B. Cutler, Jack E. Cutler, Vernon R. Dail, Ada F. Daniel, Dorsey Daniel, Terry F. Daniels, Ulyss Glenn Daughtridge, Belva J. Davenport, Shelby F. Davenport, Billy E. Davidson, Helen I. Davis, Hinton Carlton Davis, Lesly B. Davis, Robert I. Davis, Selma W. Davis, Vivian W. Davis, Jack D. Dawson, Betty W. Deal, Walter F. Deal, Janis S. Dempster, Betty Jean Dennie, Bobby C. Dennie, Marcelene D. Denny, Richard H. Denton, Grace J. Devane, Edward M. Dickens, Margaret S. Dildy, Timothy Dillon, Charles T. Dorman, Paul D. Dorman, Willie Dorman, Gordon H. Doughtie, Lena W. Doughtie, Martha M. Douglas, Isabel Downing, Eugene F. Dozier, William P. Duckett, Jr., William F. Dugger, George F. Duke, Julia J. Duke, Bobby E. Dunn, Lois W. Dunn, Robert W. Duvall, Dolly O. Eastwood, Billy Y. Edgerton, Bobby Ray Edmondson, Amy T. Edwards, Finley C. Edwards, W. Thomas Edwards, Mary Eldridge, Mildred T. Elks, Eva Kaye G. Ellington, Christine K. Ellis, Larry T. Ellis, Louis E. Ellis, Lucille B. Ellis, Michael L. Ellis, William E. Elmore, Betty Elmore-Stancill, Selby A. Etheridge, Jr., Carolyn R. Evans, Kermit M. Evans, Tony W. Evans, Vonita H. Evans, Jeannette M. Ezzell, Jenell B. Ezzell, John D. Ezzelle, Mavis E. Faircloth, Olivia B. Farrell, Michael E. Ferrell, Preston L. Fields, Charles W. Fisher, Leslie B. Fisher, Ruth F. Fisher, Janie G. Fleming, Donna S. Fling, Dianne K. Flint, Bertha S. Floyd, Floyd L. Flythe, Linda L. Flythe, Clarence G. Forbes, Marilyn B. Forbes, Martha S. Foster, Barbara Franks, William R. Frazier, Judy S. Freeman, William Douglas Fulghum, I. Gerald Futrell, William Games, Elizabeth H. Gardner, Linda A. Garrett, Robert L. Garrett, Margie A. Garris, Deidrick H. Gaskill, Donald P. Gaskins, Linda H. Gaskins, Herbert L. Gay, Willie R. Gay, William A. Gilbert, Willie E. Godwin, Jerry S. Gore, Lillie B. Grady, Priscilla T. Granger, Jane T. Grantham, Hilda B. Gray, Grover L. Griffin, Alton C. Grissom, Rosalyn S. Guirkins, Charlie J. Gurganus, Van A. Gurkins, Brenda B. Hairr, Junie Mack Hairr, John O. Hall, Jimmy C. Hamilton, Betty F. Hamm, Shirley G. Hammock, Joel F. Hancock, James E. Haney, Robert Alton Hanford, Frances H. Hardee, Linda P. Hardee, Kenneth R. Harrell, Linda H. Harrell, Loretta F. Harrell, Melvin R. Harrell, John Harrington, Alice W. Harris, Donnie P. Harris, Doris C. Harris, Elizabeth R. Harris, Jimmy L. Harris, Sr., Barbara J. Harrison, Norma H. Harrison, Jonathan F. Havens, Shelby B. Heath, David R. Hemby, Shirley G. Henderson, Bennie Herman, Jr., Hoytte Douglas Herrin, Wilton L. Herring, Lindsey W. Hewitt, Charles D. Hinson, Ruby M. Hinton, Bobby R. Hobgood, Lindbergh Holden, Christine M. Holland, Eugene R. Holland, Julia H. Holland, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Nancy L. Hollis, Murrell T. Hollman, Jane F. Holloman, Roger L. Holt, Rebecca F. Hooker, Rosby R. Hopkins, William H. Hopkins, Willie C. Hopkins, Dennis Horchler, Jeannette Faye Horne, Carolyn M. Horton, Clarence S. Hough, Annette A. House, Chester B. Houston, Stacy J. Houston, Heywood B. Houtz, Maryland Y. Howard, Marvin Howell, Katherine H. Howse, Dorothy E. Hudson, S. J. Humienny, Sr., Eleanor E. Huston, Roger Dennis Hutchison, James S. Ikner, Estella Ipock, George L. Ipock, Lewis R. Irvin, Charles E. Isles, Patricia D. Jackson, Paul A. Jackson, Raymond L. Jackson, William Franklin Jackson, Johnnie E. James, Joyce S. Jefferson, William W. Jefferson, Donald S. Jenkins, James Kenneth Johnson, John Charles Johnson, Lillie M. Johnson, Marcus W. Johnson, Ralph A. Johnson, Ralph L. Johnson, Jr., Bobby D. Jolly, Alice R. Jones, Aubrey D. Jones, John C. Jones, Kathy Beach Jones, Leona A. Jones, Peter H. Jones, Shirley L. Jones, Willie J. Jones, Norma C. Josey, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Dolly J. Joyner, Doris L. Joyner, Dorothy B. Joyner, Wilbur Glenn Joyner, Nancy R. Justice, Charles J. Kearney, Martha H. Keen, W. E. Kelchner, Donald G. Kennedy, Walter L. Kennedy, Valerie Kern, J. J. Killebrew, Eleanor S. King, Irma E. King, Robert E. King, Thelma V. King, William B. King, William Mack King, Bruce R. Kirkwood, Lorraine E. Kirkwood, Wesley G. Knott, Charles Ray Knowles, Miriam S. Kricko, Carolyn Kuklok, Thelma W. Lafferty, Bobby L. Lamm, Martha C. Lamm, William E. Lamm, Dennis R. Lane, Ernestine C. Langley, James D. Langley, Violet H. Lanier, William A. Larrimore, Frances W. Latham, Kenneth Lee, Milton E. Lee, Patricia B. Lee, Rosyln A. Lefevers, Billy M. Leggett, Sherrie B. Leggett, Patricia C. Letchworth, Betty D. Lewis, Brenda B. Lewis, Leo N. Lewis, Sandra B. Lewis, Sybil Rowe Lewis, Sylvia B. Lewis, Polly C. Lilley, Shelby M. Lilley, Norma Midyette Lindsey, Geraldine Little, B. G. Littleton, Thomas E. Littleton, Gerald T. Lockamy, Alice D. Long, Betty B. Long, Clara M. Long, Elsie O. Long, Rachel G. Lovick, Faye M. Lucas, Jaye M. Lucas, Terry T. Lucas, Joyce C. Mahan, George P. Maier, Donald H. Mallard, Randall G. Mallard, Shirley B. Malpass, Mamie R. Manning, Lucy O. Mantas, Joyce A. Marshburn, Joe E. Martin, Clarence L. Mason, Helen C. Massey, Rose D. Matthews, Ruth H. Matthews, John T. May, Kenneth S. May, Mary H. Maynard, James P. Mayo, Mickey R. McAdams, Naomi B. McBride, Roy E. McCarter, William Troy McCarter, David L. McCaskill, Mae Vonne McClure, Alice R. McCorquodale, Clifford C. McCullough, Donna H. McCullough, Roderick A. McGlohon, Daniel B. McLamb, Nellie O. McLamb, Eunice Stephens McLaurin, Laudie Colon McLaurin, Hilda A. McLawhorn, Weldon E. McLawhorn, Neal C. McLeod, Jr., Rachel C. McManus, Eunice McNeal, Rodney M. Medlin, Linda L. Meeks, Margaret Ann Meeks, William Ann Meeks, Ennis W. Mercer, Carlton V. Metts, James Truitt Miller, Jeanette Y. Miller, Leon Gene Miller, Mary M. Miller, Darling David Mills, Virginia R. Minton, Ethel D. Mitchel, Dorothy R. Moore, George Moore, Jr., James H. Moore, Jane T. Moore, Jesse C. Moore, John Thomas Moore, Lemuel K. Moore, Marland G. Moore, Barbara P. Mooring, D. Michelle Morlock, William C. Morris, Evelyn F. Morrow, Patricia B. Morrow, Nancy J. Moseley, Norman Carlton Moseley, Gloria P. Mosley, Ernest Mozingo, Darlynn Muhlbach, Emma Frances Nanney, Mary D. Narron, Charlie G. Neal, Claude T. Neal, Dianne S. Neal, Eleanor Nelms, Lonnie R. Nelms, Carol Nelson, Peggy S. Nelson, Troy W. Nelson, June W. Newberry, Evelyn W. Nicholson, Janie P. Nicholson, Hazel M. Nixo, Ramona S. Norman, Kay W. Norville, Robert L. Norville, Sr., Gregory Nunnery, Grace O'Geary, Jacqueline L. O'Neal, Joseph W. Odom, Braxton S. Oliver, Herbert W. Oliver, Thomas M. Oliver, Michael D. Outlaw, Barbara B. Overby, Charles G. Overby, Evelyn C. Overby, Frances K. Overton, John W. Overton, Joyce Y. Owens, George C. Pace, Joyce E. Pace, Jimmy L. Packard, Charles E. Page, Lynwood V. Page, Albert B. Parker, Allen R. Parker, Bobby F. Parrish, Doris J. Patterson, Willis R. Peaden, Jewell H. Pearsall, Luther D. Pearsall, Sr., Ethel J. Peedin, Lucille Peele, David B. Pepper, Theodore B. Perritt, Linda P. Perry, Robert L. Perry, Albert Ray Phelps, Diane Phillips, Hollis Phillips, Violet W. Phillips, Faye E. Phykitt, Brenda S. Pilgreen, Alice R. Pitt, Charles G. Pittman, Curtis C. Pittman, Kenneth N. Pollock, Harold D. Pope, Margie L. Pope, Marshall B. Pope, Mary B. Pope, Iris E. Powell, Larry Powell, Catherine R. Powers, Joyce P. Powers, Bobby F. Price, Joseph Earl Price, Retha A. Price, Shelby F. Pridgen, Grace N. Proctor, Cathy C. Pruitt, Sidney H. Purvis, Barbara B. Rackley, Francis Dalton Rackley, Gene D. Rackley, Margie T. Raines, Effie L. Raper, Rebecca R. Raynor, Sally C. Register, Shirley P. Respass, Bessie M. Reveal, W. S. Richardson, Janie S. Ridgeway, Albert F. Roach, Elinor S. Robeson, Johnathan L. Robeson, Jr., Henry John Roehr, Betty G. Rogers, Margie S. Rogers, Maxine R. Rogers, Vena Rogers, Mary D. Roller, Rosemary V. Romanus, Lynn C. Rooker, Effie L. Roper, Linda Ann Rose, W. H. Ross, Naomi M. Roundtree, William A. Rouse, Linda S. Rowe, Betty E. Ruffin, Clifton E. Ruffin, Johnnie Mack Ruffin, Ethel V. Ruffin-Collier, Dudley J. Rutledge, Hilda G. Saleeby, Lewis D. Sams, Marilyn L. Sandlin, Frederick L. Satterfield, Judy D. Satterwhite, Melody G. Savage, Benjamin F. Scott, J. P. Scott, Vicki Jean Seadore, George T. Sessoms, Sr., Rita T. Sexton, Mary Sharp Miller, Virgil B. Shaw, Wanda W. Shipley, Gaynelle S. Shipp, Vickie A. Shivar, Douglas E. Sibbett, Betty Gayle Simmons, Bryant Simmons, Jr., Maureen L. Simmons, Milford L. Simmons, Arthur D. Simoneau, Leon H. Simpkins, Willard G. Simpson, Barbara S. Smith, Betty G. Smith, Franklin D. Smith, Linda Faye Smtih, Wilton A. Smtih, Martha J. Snead, Talmadge R. Snead, Zelia S. Snead, Carl W. Somdahl, Ronald D. Sondergard, Rachel O. Spann, Frank J. Sparks, George R. Speight, James A. Speight, James A. Spruill, Doris A. Stainback, Gerald T. Stallings, John Harold Stallings, Linda L. Stallings, Margaret A. Stallings, William W. Stallings, Raymeta B. Stancil, Carlene Stanley, James E. Stanley, Donald G. Steele, Blanche R. Stell, Charles W. Stephens, Jr., Amy Stettler, Floyd W. Stewart, Peggy A. Stewart, Levy C. Stilley, James A. Stocks, Stanley M. Stone, Sr., Hazel Stox, Clayton Thomas Strickland, Grady C. Strickland, Linda P. Strickland, Owen W. Strickland, Patricia L. Strickland, Raymond O. Strum, Bobby G. Suggs, Dianne M. Summerlin, Elizabeth V. Sumner, Mattie Bass Sumner, Billy V. Sutton, Cecil E. Swinson, Rebecca R. Swinson, Kenneth H. Sykes, Kenneth F. Tarleton, Grady Tart, Emmett L. Tatum, Jr., Carol J. Taylor, Curtis V. Taylor, Edmond R. Taylor, Jennings B. Teal, Sr., Victoria H. Teal, Hubert D. Terry, Virginia Tew, Mary L. Tharrington, Donald L. Thomas, Garland V. Thomas, Carlton G. Thompson, Ella W. Thompson, Gene R. Thompson, Pearl N. Thompson, Roy H. Thompson, Elizabeth J. Thornell, Melody J. Thursby, Clennis T. Tolston, Henry T. Tolston, Annie Robinson Trevathan, Daphne B. Tripp, Geraldine H. Tucker, Shelby Jean Turnage, Jesse L. Turner, Robert C. Tyndall, Henry H. Umphlet, Jean Varnell, Joann A. Vaughan, Ronald Vick, Susie P. Vick, Verchie A. Vick, Alfred M. Waddell, Jr., Carolyn R. Wagner, Mary Frances Wagner, Shirley B. Wainwright, Jean M. Walden, Angela Walker, Rosa A. Walker, Charles W. Wall, Charles G. Wallace, Joyce F. Wallace, Randy W. Wallace, Edith A. Walston, George M. Walters, Jr., Lorene P. Walters, Annette E. Wantz, Janice C. Ward, John T. Ward, Myrtle W. Ward, Hassell Ray Wardsworth, Rebecca B. Warren, Martha R. Waters, Ruby J. Waters, Frances H. Watson, Richard B. Weatherington, Battle Brooks Webb, Earldean T. Webb, Ellie H. Webb, Evelyn G. Webb, Joseph W. Weeks, Margaret Wethington, Walter Thomas Wheeler, Henry M. White, Kenneth L. White, Mary M. White, Treacy Turner White, Trudy J. White, Vivian M. White, Walter C. White, George F. Whitehurst, Louise M. Whitehurst, Nancy B. Whitehurst, Ellis Reid Whitford, Sr., Billy S. Wilder, Bonner Wilder, Eleanor Wildhabe-Daly, Gordon Earl Wilkins, Jr., Ann W. Wilkinson, Bradley Willaford, Carl B. Williams, Connie L. Williams, George E. Williams, Hazel C. Williams, Herscal P. Williams, Julia V. Williams, Mary C. Williams, Roger Bert Williams, Roy K. Williams, Margie E. Williamson, Mollie L. Williamson, T. P. Williamson, Alice L. Williford, Jerry D. Williford, Ralph L. Williford, Howard C. Wilson, Jr., Jean Wilson, Ann D. Winborne, Derwood L. Winstead, Frances M. Winstead, Grady H. Winstead, Sr., Marion Branch Winstead, Sonya L. Winstead, William Boyd Wood, Billy G. Woodard, Thomas H. Woodard, John E. Woodlief, Alice B. Woodruff, Steven G. Woodward, Darrell Woolard, Vernell H. Woolard, David F. Woolsey, Earl D. Wooten, John T. Worrell, Lynwood R. Worrell, Jr., Annie T. Wynne, Janet N. Wynne, Lydia B. Wynne, Guy E. York, David M. Young, Ernest H. Young, Shirley Morgan Russell and Keith A. Britt
Defendant: Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medica, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Tel, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan and Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan
Case Number: 2:2007cv02602
Filed: December 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2017 ***Civil Case Terminated.(ydm)
March 31, 2017 Filing 585 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by All Defendants Joint Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims (Leopold, Christopher)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting #583 Motion to Substitute Party.. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/28/2017. (sz)
February 27, 2017 Filing 583 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs for Carol E.Nelson and Bessie M. Reveal by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Nygaard, Diane)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER granting #581 Motion for Case Management Order. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/14/2016. (cm)
October 31, 2016 Filing 581 Joint MOTION for Order Stipulated Motion for Entry of Case Management Order by Defendant Embarq Corporation (Hecht, Scott)
October 19, 2016 Filing 580 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held September 27, 2016, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Alan Sandals. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. (jw)
October 19, 2016 Filing 579 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held May 10, 2016, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Alan Sandals. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. (jw)
October 19, 2016 Filing 578 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson (jw)
October 18, 2016 Filing 577 Joint STATUS REPORT Re: Implementation of Proposed Settlement by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
September 27, 2016 Filing 576 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/27/2016 by telephone. (Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
September 9, 2016 Filing 575 STATUS REPORT Regarding Mediation by Embarq Corporation. (Leopold, Christopher)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT ON 2014-15 ORDERS RESOLVING ALL REMAINING CONTRACTUAL VESTING CLAIMS granting #570 Motion for Judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/5/2016. (mam)
June 9, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket Entry #573 CONSENT MOTION for extension of time was filed in incorrect case; see case # 11-2572 for correct case filing. (kao)
June 8, 2016 Filing 573 (DISREGARD: Filed in the Wrong Case. See Case #11-2572 For Correct Case Filing) Consent MOTION for extension of time by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Leopold, Christopher) Modified on 6/9/2016. (kao) (Viewing Restricted on 6/9/2016. (mg))
June 8, 2016 Filing 572 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: #570 MOTION for Order Entering Final Judgment on 2014-15 Orders Resolving All Remaining Contractual Vesting Claims. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 6, 2016 Filing 571 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #570 MOTION for Order Entering Final Judgment on 2014-15 Orders Resolving All Remaining Contractual Vesting Claimsby Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 6, 2016 Filing 570 MOTION for Order Entering Final Judgment on 2014-15 Orders Resolving All Remaining Contractual Vesting Claims by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
May 10, 2016 Filing 569 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference/Status Conference set for 9/27/2016 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. Counsel are directed to dial toll free 888-363-4749; access code 5024283 and follow the prompts to be connected to the call. (cm)
May 10, 2016 Filing 568 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2016. The Court will schedule an additional status conference under separate entry.(Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
May 2, 2016 Filing 567 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Scott M. Lempert as to All Plaintiffs (O'Connell, Mary)
April 20, 2016 Filing 566 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Ronald A. Bertino, CPA Regarding Dissemination of Notice to Certain Class Members Pursuant to the Order Dated March 15, 2016 by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Ronald A. Bertino, CPA)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 14, 2016 Filing 565 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom 408 (EFM) before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting #559 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/15/16. (lak)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 561 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #553 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/15/2016. (cm)
March 3, 2016 Filing 560 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #559 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Send Notice to Certain Class Members With Dismissed But Unappealed Claims by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nygaard, Diane)
March 3, 2016 Filing 559 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Send Notice to Certain Class Members With Dismissed But Unappealed Claims by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
November 30, 2015 Filing 558 LETTER FROM 10CCA advising petition for writ of certiorari denied re: #460 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 15-3230) (kao)
November 30, 2015 Filing 557 LETTER FROM 10CCA advising petition for writ of certiorari denied re: #460 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 13-3230) (kao)
October 30, 2015 Filing 556 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Randall T. Parker, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: #553 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 15, 2015 Filing 555 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: #553 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(O'Connell, Mary)
September 15, 2015 Filing 554 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #553 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Randall T. Parker, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A: Koenigs Declaration, #3 Exhibit A1, #4 Exhibit A2, #5 Exhibit A3, #6 Exhibit A4, #7 Exhibit A5, #8 Exhibit A6, #9 Exhibit A7, #10 Exhibit A8, #11 Exhibit A9, #12 Exhibit A10, #13 Exhibit A11, #14 Exhibit A12, #15 Exhibit A13, #16 Exhibit A14, #17 Exhibit A15, #18 Exhibit A16, #19 Exhibit A17, #20 Exhibit A18, #21 Exhibit A19, #22 Exhibit B: Parker Declaration, #23 Exhibit B1, #24 Exhibit B2, #25 Exhibit B3, #26 Exhibit B4, #27 Exhibit B5, #28 Exhibit B6, #29 Exhibit B7, #30 Exhibit B8)(Leopold, Christopher) (Attachment 12 replaced on 10/13/2015) (sz). (Attachment 6 replaced on 10/13/2015) (sz).
September 15, 2015 Filing 553 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Randall T. Parker, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
August 31, 2015 Filing 552 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jessica E. Leaven as to William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary) ** This Notice of Withdrawal is not in compliance with Local Rule 83.5.5(b) and therefore this attorney will not be withdrawn. Counsel may file a Certificate of Service of this Notice upon his actual clients (not attorneys of record) in order to be withdrawn.**
August 31, 2015 Filing 551 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held August 25, 2015, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Christopher Leopold. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2015. (jw)
August 31, 2015 Filing 550 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson. (jw)
August 28, 2015 Filing 549 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Adele Rapport as to William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary) ** This Notice of Withdrawal is not in compliance with Local Rule 83.5.5(b) and therefore this attorney will not be withdrawn. Counsel may file a Certificate of Service of this Notice upon his actual clients (not attorneys of record) in order to be withdrawn.**
August 28, 2015 Filing 548 LETTER FROM 10CCA advising petition for writ of certiorari filed re: #460 Notice of Appeal; assigned Supreme Court No. 15-241. (Appeal No. 13-3230) (kao)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER: During the telephone status conference the Court set out new deadlines and requirements for future filings. This Order memorializes that discussion. See Order for filing deadlines and page limits. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/27/2015. (cm)
August 25, 2015 Filing 546 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/25/2015. (Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
August 13, 2015 Filing 545 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2015 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. Counsel will arrange for a conference bridge; when all parties are on the conference, counsel will contact the Court at a predetermined phone number.(cs)
August 13, 2015 Filing 544 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Telephone Conference of 9/2/15 at 1:30 PM is CANCELLED. This hearing will be rescheduled at a later date. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lak)
August 12, 2015 Filing 543 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 9/2/2015 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. Counsel will arrange for a conference bridge for this telephone conference. Once all parties are connected to the conference, counsel will contact the Court, at a predetermined telephone number, so the Court can join the call.(lak)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER denying #534 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/27/2015. (cm)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER RESOLVING ALL REMAINING AND UNADJUDICATED CONTRACTUAL VESTING CLAIMS. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/27/2015. (cm)
July 22, 2015 Filing 540 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: #534 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #533 Memorandum and Order. (O'Connell, Mary)
July 17, 2015 Filing 539 STIPULATION and Request for Order by all Parties by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1-105)(Leopold, Christopher) **Reminder to Counsel: Pursuant to D. Kan. Civil Administrative Procedures - Each individual exhibit must be filed as a separate attachment to the main document.**
July 15, 2015 Filing 538 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Brian K. O'Bleness as to Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (O'Bleness, Brian)
July 8, 2015 Filing 537 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re #534 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #533 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 30, 2015 Filing 536 Joint STATUS REPORT by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 24, 2015 Filing 535 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #534 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #533 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum.(O'Connell, Mary)
June 24, 2015 Filing 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #533 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum .(O'Connell, Mary)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 533 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #488 Motion for Summary Judgment on Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Members; granting #495 Motion for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson; denying #502 Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability on Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Class Members; denying #505 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/10/2015. (cm)
May 21, 2015 Filing 532 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: The judgment of the district court is affirmed in part and reversed in part. The case is remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this court. (Appeal No. 13-3230) (Attachment: #1 Transmittal Letter)(kao)
May 5, 2015 Filing 531 (RECALLED BY 10CCA ON 5/20/15: The mandate was issued prematurely and will re-issue on the appropriate date.) APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: The judgment of the district court is affirmed in part and reversed in part. The case is remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this court. (Appeal No. 13-3230) (Attachment: #1 Transmittal Letter)(kao) Modified on 5/20/2015. (kao)
April 28, 2015 Filing 530 Joint NOTICE of Filing Tenth Circuit Order on Petitions for Rehearing and Revised Opinion Dated April 27, 2015 by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: #1 Order)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting #528 Motion for Leave to File. The Court will "stay" and defer ruling on the four pending motions until the earlier of June 1, 2015, or the Tenth Circuit's ruling on the parties' pending Petitions for Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc. The parties, however, should not expect to re-brief the current motions before the Court, due to the work the Court has already done on those motions. In fact, the Court will rule promptly on the pending motions once the above "stay" expires. If the Tenth Circuit grants the Petitions for Rehearing, the Court will revisit the issue. The parties should inform the Court promptly when the Tenth Circuit issues a ruling on their Petitions for Rehearing. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/13/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
April 13, 2015 Filing 528 Joint MOTION for Leave to file Parties' Joint Status Report by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Joint Status Report)(O'Connell, Mary)
January 30, 2015 Filing 527 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by William Douglas Fulghum re: MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members #488 filed by Defendant Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Defendant Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Defendant Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Defendant Randall T. Parker, Defendant Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Defendant Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Defendant Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Defendant Embarq Corporation, Defendant Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Defendant Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Defendant Embarq Management Company, Defendant Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Defendant Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability on Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Class Members #502 filed by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 27, 2015 Filing 526 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members # 488 filed by Defendant Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Defendant Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Defendant Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Defendant Randall T. Parker, Defendant Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Defendant Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Defendant Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Defendant Embarq Corporation, Defendant Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Defendant Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Defendant Embarq Management Company, Defendant Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Defendant Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability on Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Class Members # 502 filed by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Leopold, Christopher)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER re # 524 Stipulation and Request for Order for Attorneys' Fees filed by Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/15/2014. (cm)
December 12, 2014 Filing 524 STIPULATION and Request for Order by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 523 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part # 508 Motion for Sanctions; denying # 515 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs' Exhibits E-1 to E-3 and E-35 through E-84, contained in ECF Docs. 497 through 501 are stricken from the record. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/2/2014. (smg)
November 20, 2014 Filing 522 RESPONSE to # 521 Letter by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
November 18, 2014 Filing 521 LETTER from Plaintiff. (The clerks office is filing this since counsel does not have access to this particular event in CM/ECF.) (Attachments: # 1 Oral Argument) (ta)
October 16, 2014 Filing 520 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 515 MOTION for Leave to File Additional CBA Exhibits. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 16, 2014 Filing 519 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 508 MOTION for Sanctions for Violations of Court Orders. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 9, 2014 Filing 518 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher J. Lucas. (Lucas, Christopher)
October 2, 2014 Filing 517 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 508 MOTION for Sanctions for Violations of Court Orders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3)(Nygaard, Diane)
October 2, 2014 Filing 516 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 515 MOTION for Leave to File Additional CBA Exhibits by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3)(Nygaard, Diane)
October 2, 2014 Filing 515 MOTION for Leave to File Additional CBA Exhibits by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
September 30, 2014 Filing 514 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF # 502 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability on Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Class Members by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum.(Nygaard, Diane) Modified on 9/30/2014 to correct title of document. (smg)
September 30, 2014 Filing 513 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF # 505 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane) Modified on 9/30/2014 to correct event title. (smg)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting # 511 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: # 508 MOTION for Sanctions for Violations of Court Orders. Response deadline 10/2/2014. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/24/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
September 24, 2014 Filing 511 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to # 508 MOTION for Sanctions for Violations of Court Orders by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
September 15, 2014 Filing 510 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members, and RESPONSE to # 502 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability on Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Class Members. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit F: Koenigs Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Index F-1, # 4 Exhibit F-2, # 5 Exhibit F-3, # 6 Exhibit F-4, # 7 Exhibit F-5, # 8 Exhibit F-6, # 9 Exhibit F-7, # 10 Exhibit F-8, # 11 Exhibit F-9, # 12 Exhibit F-10, # 13 Exhibit F-11, # 14 Exhibit F-12, # 15 Exhibit F-13, # 16 Exhibit F-14, # 17 Exhibit G: Walsh Declaration, # 18 Exhibit H: Stubbs Declaration, # 19 Exhibit H-1, # 20 Exhibit H-2, # 21 Exhibit H-3)(Leopold, Christopher) (Modified on 9/19/2014 to reflect this is also a Response. (mg))
September 15, 2014 Filing 509 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 508 MOTION for Sanctions for Violations of Court Orders by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Koenigs, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6, # 8 Exhibit A-7, # 9 Exhibit Index)(Leopold, Christopher)
September 15, 2014 Filing 508 MOTION for Sanctions for Violations of Court Orders by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
September 15, 2014 Filing 507 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 495 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson, and RESPONSE to # 505 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. (Leopold, Christopher) (Modified on 9/19/2014 to reflect this is also a Response. (mg)) Modified on 9/30/2014 (smg).
August 13, 2014 Filing 506 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 505 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 13, 2014 Filing 505 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 13, 2014 Filing 504 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 495 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson, and in MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 13, 2014 Filing 503 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 502 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability on Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Class Members by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 13, 2014 Filing 502 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability on Contractual Vesting Claims of Unionized Class Members by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 13, 2014 Filing 501 (STRICKEN: See # 523 Memorandum and Order.) EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 497 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-71, # 2 Exhibit E-72, # 3 Exhibit E-73, # 4 Exhibit E-74, # 5 Exhibit E-75, # 6 Exhibit E-76, # 7 Exhibit E-77, # 8 Exhibit E-78, # 9 Exhibit E-79, # 10 Exhibit E-80, # 11 Exhibit E-80A, # 12 Exhibit E-81, # 13 Exhibit E-82, # 14 Exhibit E-83, # 15 Exhibit E-84)(Nygaard, Diane) Modified on 12/2/2014. (smg)
August 13, 2014 Filing 500 (STRICKEN: See # 523 Memorandum and Order.) EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 497 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-58, # 2 Exhibit E-59, # 3 Exhibit E-60, # 4 Exhibit E-61, # 5 Exhibit E-62, # 6 Exhibit E-63, # 7 Exhibit E-64, # 8 Exhibit E-64A, # 9 Exhibit E-65, # 10 Exhibit E-66, # 11 Exhibit E-67, # 12 Exhibit E-68, # 13 Exhibit E-69, # 14 Exhibit E-70)(Nygaard, Diane) Modified on 12/2/2014. (smg)
August 13, 2014 Filing 499 (STRICKEN: See # 523 Memorandum and Order.) EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 497 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-45, # 2 Exhibit E-46, # 3 Exhibit E-47, # 4 Exhibit E-48, # 5 Exhibit E-49, # 6 Exhibit E-49A, # 7 Exhibit E-50, # 8 Exhibit E-51, # 9 Exhibit E-52, # 10 Exhibit E-53, # 11 Exhibit E-54, # 12 Exhibit E-55, # 13 Exhibit E-56, # 14 Exhibit E-57)(Nygaard, Diane) Modified on 12/2/2014. (smg)
August 13, 2014 Filing 498 (STRICKEN: See # 523 Memorandum and Order.) EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 497 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-35, # 2 Exhibit E-36, # 3 Exhibit E-37, # 4 Exhibit E-38, # 5 Exhibit E-39, # 6 Exhibit E-40, # 7 Exhibit E-41, # 8 Exhibit E-42, # 9 Exhibit E-43, # 10 Exhibit E-44)(Nygaard, Diane) Modified on 12/2/2014. (smg)
August 13, 2014 Filing 497 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members, and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E Declaration of Alan Sandals, # 2 Exhibit E-1, # 3 Exhibit E-2, # 4 Exhibit E-3, # 5 Exhibit E-4, # 6 Exhibit E-5)(Nygaard, Diane) Exhibits E-1, E-2, E-3 Stricken; See # 523 Memorandum and Order.
July 16, 2014 Filing 496 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 495 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 495 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Clark and Nelson by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 494 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B: Koenigs Declaration, # 2 B1, # 3 B2, # 4 B3, # 5 B4, # 6 B5, # 7 B6, # 8 B7, # 9 B8, # 10 B9, # 11 B10, # 12 B11, # 13 B12, # 14 B13, # 15 B14, # 16 B15, # 17 B16, # 18 B17, # 19 B18, # 20 B19, # 21 B20, # 22 B21, # 23 B22, # 24 B23, # 25 B24, # 26 B25, # 27 B26, # 28 B27, # 29 B28, # 30 B29, # 31 B30, # 32 B31, # 33 B32, # 34 B33, # 35 B34, # 36 B35, # 37 B36, # 38 B37, # 39 B38, # 40 B39, # 41 B40, # 42 B41, # 43 B42, # 44 B43, # 45 B44, # 46 B45, # 47 B46, # 48 B47, # 49 B48, # 50 Exhibit C: Stubbs Declaration, # 51 C1, # 52 C2, # 53 C3, # 54 C4, # 55 C5, # 56 C6, # 57 C7, # 58 C8, # 59 C9, # 60 C10, # 61 C11, # 62 C12, # 63 C13, # 64 C14, # 65 C15, # 66 C16, # 67 C17, # 68 C18, # 69 C19, # 70 C20, # 71 C21, # 72 C22, # 73 Exhibit D: Walsh Declaration, # 74 D1)(Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 493 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members. (Attachments: # 1 A166, # 2 A167, # 3 A168, # 4 A168a, # 5 A169, # 6 A170, # 7 A171, # 8 A172, # 9 A173, # 10 A174, # 11 A175, # 12 A176, # 13 A177, # 14 A178, # 15 A179, # 16 A180, # 17 A181, # 18 A182, # 19 A183, # 20 A184, # 21 A185, # 22 A186, # 23 A187, # 24 A188, # 25 A189, # 26 A190, # 27 A191, # 28 A192, # 29 A193, # 30 A194, # 31 A195, # 32 A196, # 33 A197, # 34 A198, # 35 A199, # 36 A200, # 37 A201, # 38 A202, # 39 A203, # 40 A204, # 41 A205, # 42 A206, # 43 A207, # 44 A208, # 45 A209, # 46 A210, # 47 A211, # 48 A212)(Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 492 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members. (Attachments: # 1 A81, # 2 A82, # 3 A83, # 4 A84, # 5 A85, # 6 A86, # 7 A87, # 8 A88, # 9 A89, # 10 A90, # 11 A91, # 12 A92, # 13 A93, # 14 A94, # 15 A95, # 16 A96, # 17 A97, # 18 A98, # 19 A99, # 20 A100, # 21 A101, # 22 A102, # 23 A103, # 24 A104, # 25 A105, # 26 A106, # 27 A107, # 28 A108, # 29 A109, # 30 A110, # 31 A111, # 32 A112, # 33 A113, # 34 A114, # 35 A115, # 36 A116, # 37 A117, # 38 A118, # 39 A119, # 40 A120, # 41 A121, # 42 A122, # 43 A123, # 44 A124, # 45 A125, # 46 A126, # 47 A127, # 48 A128, # 49 A129, # 50 A130, # 51 A131, # 52 A132, # 53 A133, # 54 A134, # 55 A135, # 56 A136, # 57 A137, # 58 A138, # 59 A139, # 60 A140, # 61 A141, # 62 A142, # 63 A143, # 64 A144, # 65 A145, # 66 A146, # 67 A147, # 68 A148, # 69 A149, # 70 A150, # 71 A151, # 72 A152, # 73 A153, # 74 A154, # 75 A155, # 76 A156, # 77 A157, # 78 A158, # 79 A159, # 80 A160, # 81 A161, # 82 A162, # 83 A163, # 84 A164, # 85 A165)(Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 491 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members. (Attachments: # 1 A41, # 2 A42, # 3 A43, # 4 A44, # 5 A45, # 6 A46, # 7 A47, # 8 A48, # 9 A49, # 10 A50, # 11 A51, # 12 A52, # 13 A53, # 14 A54, # 15 A55, # 16 A56, # 17 A57, # 18 A58, # 19 A59, # 20 A60, # 21 A61, # 22 A62, # 23 A63, # 24 A64, # 25 A65, # 26 A66, # 27 A67, # 28 A68, # 29 A69, # 30 A70, # 31 A71, # 32 A72, # 33 A73, # 34 A74, # 35 A75, # 36 A76, # 37 A77, # 38 A78, # 39 A79, # 40 A80)(Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 490 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Joint stipulation, # 2 A1, # 3 A2, # 4 A3, # 5 A4, # 6 A5, # 7 A6, # 8 A7, # 9 A8, # 10 A9, # 11 A10, # 12 A11, # 13 A12, # 14 A13, # 15 A14, # 16 A15, # 17 A16, # 18 A17, # 19 A18, # 20 A19, # 21 A20, # 22 A21, # 23 A22, # 24 A23, # 25 A24, # 26 A25, # 27 A26, # 28 A27, # 29 A28, # 30 A29, # 31 A30, # 32 A31, # 33 A32, # 34 A33, # 35 A34, # 36 A35, # 37 A36, # 38 A37, # 39 A38, # 40 A39, # 41 A40)(Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 489 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Filing 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Unadjudicated Contractual Vesting Claims of Additional Unionized Class Members by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER granting # 486 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/15/2014. (cm)
July 11, 2014 Filing 486 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Briefs in Excess of Page Limits Set by Court's July 16, 2013 Order by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 12, 2014 Filing 485 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by Amii Castle as to Plaintiffs. (mg)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER granting # 483 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Additional summary judgment motion deadline 7/16/2014. Response deadline and filing of any cross-motions deadline 8/13/2014. Responses to any cross-motions and Reply to summary judgment motions deadline 9/15/2014. Reply deadline to cross-motions is 9/30/2014. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/3/2014. (cm)
May 29, 2014 Filing 483 Joint MOTION to # 482 Amend Case Management Order by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER Supplemental Case Management. See Order for filing deadlines. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/25/2014. (cm)
March 21, 2014 Filing 481 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Email Address of Plaintiffs' Counsel by William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
March 20, 2014 Filing 480 Joint Submittal of PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER and Report of Position Regarding Additional Discovery Proposed by Plaintiffs and Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: 477 Telephone Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Case Management Order, # 2 Exhibit 2: Sandals Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3: Walsh Declaration)(Leopold, Christopher) (Document title modified on 3/21/2014. (mg))
March 13, 2014 Filing 479 TRANSCRIPT of Other Hearing held March 11, 2014, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. James P. Walsh, Jr. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2014. (jw)
March 13, 2014 Filing 478 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson. (jw)
March 11, 2014 Filing 477 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/11/2014. The Court has directed the parties to submit a joint proposed case management order on or before 3/20/2014. (Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
March 2, 2014 Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT of Other Hearing held February 3, 2014, before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, 316-315-4334, jo_wilkinson@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Ms. Diane A. Nygaard. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2014. (jw)
March 2, 2014 Filing 475 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson. (jw)
February 27, 2014 Filing 474 Joint STATUS REPORT of Case Planning Conference by William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
February 18, 2014 Filing 473 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2014 at 01:30 PM (CDT) before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. The parties are directed to call (316) 315-4339 to join the call. The parties are also asked that if there is more than one individual from the same firm/office and in the same location, that all participants be in one room and call as one unit.(cm)
February 3, 2014 Filing 472 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/3/2014. The Court directed the parties to submit a Joint Written Statement, no longer than 10 pages, to the Court on or before 2/28/2014 as to the remaining issues and suggestions on how to proceed. The Court will contact the parties to schedule another telephone status conference. (Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
January 17, 2014 Filing 471 ADR REPORT by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. ADR session held on: 11/22/2013 and conducted by Kyle Schultz. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Other.(Leopold, Christopher)
January 17, 2014 Filing 470 ADR REPORT by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. ADR session held on: 9/21/2013 and conducted by Antonio Piazza. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: After Dispositive Motion Ruling. (Leopold, Christopher)
January 8, 2014 Filing 469 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephone Conference has been rescheduled for 2/3/2014 at 02:30 PM CDT before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. The parties are instructed to call (316) 315-4339 to join the call. (cm)
January 6, 2014 Filing 468 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2014 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. The parties are directed to call (316) 315-4339 to join the call.(cm)
January 2, 2014 Filing 467 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Counsel for Defendants by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION granting in part and denying in part # 450 Motion to Substitute Party. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/8/2013. (aa)
October 1, 2013 Filing 465 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 1, 2013 Filing 464 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re # 460 Notice of Appeal. ( Appeal No. 13-3230) (kao)
October 1, 2013 Filing 463 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required re # 460 Notice of Appeal. (Recvd from 10CCA) (kao)
September 17, 2013 Filing 462 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 9/17/13 and assigned Appeal No. 13-3230 re: # 460 Notice of Appeal filed by William Douglas Fulghum. (kao)
September 13, 2013 Filing 461 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re: # 460 Notice of Appeal. (Attachment: # 1 Preliminary Record)(kao)
September 13, 2013 Filing 460 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to # 45 Order on Motion to Dismiss, # 318 Order on Motion for Sanctions, # 349 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, # 407 Memorandum and Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, # 452 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Judgment, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File, # 387 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Review by Plaintiffs. Filing fee $455.00, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-2845334. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary) (Modified on 9/13/2013. (mg))
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting # 458 Motion for Extension of Time to participate in mediation. Mediation must be conducted on or before 9/27/2013. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/9/2013. (cm)
August 8, 2013 Filing 458 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting # 455 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. All plaintiffs may file their Notice of Appeal in the maximum time allowable under FRAP 4(a)(5)(C), which is September 16, 2013 or 14 days after the entry date of this Order, whichever is later. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/5/2013. (aa)
August 1, 2013 Filing 456 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 455 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal by Plaintiffs. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 1, 2013 Filing 455 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal by Plaintiffs. (Nygaard, Diane)
July 30, 2013 Filing 454 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 450 MOTION to Substitute Party. (O'Connell, Mary)
July 16, 2013 Filing 453 RESPONSE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 450 MOTION to Substitute Party. (Leopold, Christopher)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying # 409 Motion for Reconsideration; denying # 411 Motion for Reconsideration; granting # 415 Motion for Judgment; denying # 418 Motion for Reconsideration; denying # 420 Motion for Reconsideration; granting # 424 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying # 430 Motion for Order; denying # 442 Motion to Strike; denying # 444 Motion for Leave to File. AS STATED IN THIS ORDER, FILING RESTRICTIONS ARE IMMEDIATELY IMPOSED. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/16/2013. (cm)
July 2, 2013 Filing 451 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 450 MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary)
July 2, 2013 Filing 450 MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum.(O'Connell, Mary)
May 30, 2013 Filing 449 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 444 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply Memorandum In Opposition To Defendants Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 30, 2013 Filing 448 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs re: # 442 MOTION to Strike Portions of # 439 Reply to # 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 16, 2013 Filing 447 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 442 MOTION to Strike Portions of # 439 Reply to # 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark. (Leopold, Christopher)
May 16, 2013 Filing 446 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 444 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply Memorandum In Opposition To Defendants Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark. (Leopold, Christopher)
May 3, 2013 Filing 445 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 430 MOTION to Amend Class Definitions and Decertify Remaining Classes. (Leopold, Christopher)
May 2, 2013 Filing 444 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum In Opposition To Defendants # 418 Motion for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Connell, Mary)
May 2, 2013 Filing 443 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 442 MOTION to Strike Portions of # 439 Reply to # 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 2, 2013 Filing 442 MOTION to Strike Portions of # 439 Reply to # 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary) (Motion title modified on 5/3/2013. (mg))
April 19, 2013 Filing 441 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs re: # 430 MOTION to Amend Class Definitions and Decertify Remaining Classes. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 18, 2013 Filing 440 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 420 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes. (O'Bleness, Brian)
April 18, 2013 Filing 439 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stubbs Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Stubbs Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Stubbs Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Stubbs Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Stubbs Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Stubbs Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B - Walsh Declaration)(O'Bleness, Brian)
April 18, 2013 Filing 438 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to James W. Britt by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Bleness, Brian)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting # 436 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 4/19/2013. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/8/2013. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
April 8, 2013 Filing 436 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Decertify by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum.(O'Connell, Mary)
April 5, 2013 Filing 435 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 415 Amended MOTION for Judgment Based On Rulings Made In February 14, 2013 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and In December 2, 2008 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 4, 2013 Filing 434 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark. (Nygaard, Diane)
April 4, 2013 Filing 433 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 420 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Nygaard, Diane)
April 1, 2013 Filing 432 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 424 MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation.(Nygaard, Diane)
March 29, 2013 Filing 431 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 430 MOTION to Amend Class Definitions and Decertify Remaining Classesby Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A: Koenigs Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A1, # 4 Exhibit A2, # 5 Exhibit A3, # 6 Exhibit A4, # 7 Exhibit A5, # 8 Exhibit A6, # 9 Exhibit A7, # 10 Exhibit A8, # 11 Exhibit A9, # 12 Exhibit A10, # 13 Exhibit A11, # 14 Exhibit A12, # 15 Exhibit B: Browne Decl. and Expert Report)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 29, 2013 Filing 430 MOTION to Amend Class Definitions and Decertify Remaining Classes by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 28, 2013 Filing 429 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 409 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum.(Nygaard, Diane)
March 28, 2013 Filing 428 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 411 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting # 426 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 4/4/2013. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/25/2013. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
March 22, 2013 Filing 426 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants' # 418 , # 420 Motions to Reconsider by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 22, 2013 Filing 425 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 415 Amended MOTION for Judgment Based On Rulings Made In February 14, 2013 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and In December 2, 2008 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Koenigs Declaration)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 20, 2013 Filing 424 MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation and Memorandum in Support by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2013 Filing 423 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 409 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Order. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Walsh, # 2 Exhibit A to Walsh Declaration)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2013 Filing 422 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 411 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Order. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2013 Filing 421 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 420 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2013 Filing 420 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claims of Plaintiffs Dillon and Barnes by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2013 Filing 419 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2013 Filing 418 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 407 Memorandum and Order on Contractual Vesting Claims of Plaintiffs Britt and Clark by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 13, 2013 Filing 417 NOTICE of Unopposed Withdrawal of Motion by William Douglas Fulghum re: # 413 MOTION for Judgment Based on Rulings Made in February 14, 2013 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 8, 2013 Filing 416 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 415 Amended MOTION for Judgment Based On Rulings Made In February 14, 2013 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and In December 2, 2008 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 8, 2013 Filing 415 Amended MOTION for Judgment Based On Rulings Made In February 14, 2013 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and In December 2, 2008 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 28, 2013 Filing 414 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 413 MOTION for Judgment Based on Rulings Made in February 14, 2013 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 28, 2013 Filing 413 (WITHDRAWN: See # 417 Notice.) MOTION for Judgment Based on Rulings Made in February 14, 2013 Memorandum and Order Granting In Part Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 28, 2013 Filing 412 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 411 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Orderby Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary)
February 28, 2013 Filing 411 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 28, 2013 Filing 410 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 409 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary)
February 28, 2013 Filing 409 MOTION for Reconsideration re: # 407 Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER denying # 404 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/14/2013. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling # 285 Motion for Order; finding as moot # 287 Motion for Order; granting # 321 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part # 323 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot # 325 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot # 327 Motion to Exclude; granting # 329 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting # 332 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot # 333 Motion; granting in part and denying in part # 338 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying # 392 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/14/2013. (cm)
February 6, 2013 Filing 406 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 404 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting Plaintiffs' Oppositions to (A) Defendants' Motion to Decertify Class Action on the ERISA Claims (Counts One and Three), (B) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Fiduciary Breach Claim), and (C) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims). (O'Connell, Mary)
February 1, 2013 Filing 405 RESPONSE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 404 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Leopold, Christopher)
January 30, 2013 Filing 404 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting Plaintiffs' Oppositions to (A) Defendants' Motion to Decertify Class Action on the ERISA Claims (Counts One and Three), (B) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Fiduciary Breach Claim), and (C) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims) and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Connell, Mary)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting # 402 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order as to Mediation Deadline. Counsel is advised the current deadline of 11/16/2012 is vacated. New mediation deadline will be six weeks after the Court rules on pending motions. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/31/2012. (cm)
October 30, 2012 Filing 402 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order Provision Regarding Mediation Deadline by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 25, 2012 Filing 401 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: At the direction of Judge Eric F. Melgren, until all outstanding motions are ruled on, the Jury trial scheduled for 1/8/2013 will be cancelled. The Court will contact counsel at a later date to reschedule the trial. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER granting # 399 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Mediation deadline is amended by an additional week, to and including 11/16/2012. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/25/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
September 24, 2012 Filing 399 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order regarding Mediation Deadline by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
September 12, 2012 Filing 398 SURREPLY by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 332 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Selected Class Members' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (O'Connell, Mary)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting # 386 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/11/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
August 6, 2012 Filing 396 Amended NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mary C. O'Connell. (O'Connell, Mary)
July 25, 2012 Filing 395 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mary C. O'Connell. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 26, 2012 Filing 394 RESPONSE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 392 MOTION for Hearing on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgement. (Leopold, Christopher)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER: Due to the voluminous number of pending motions, and the length and the amount of exhibits attached to the motions, the Court directs counsel to send bound, hard copies of the summary judgment motions, memorandums, and exhibits (and responses with accompanying exhibits and replies with accompanying exhibits) with the CM/ECF header to Chambers on or before June 26, 2012.. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/19/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
June 18, 2012 Filing 392 MOTION for Hearing on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgement by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
June 12, 2012 Filing 391 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 386 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Named Plaintiffs' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (O'Connell, Mary)
June 11, 2012 Filing 390 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 338 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leopold, Christopher)
May 30, 2012 Filing 389 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 377 Memorandum in Opposition to # 329 Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(O'Connell, Mary)
May 29, 2012 Filing 388 RESPONSE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 386 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Named Plaintiffs' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (Leopold, Christopher)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying # 350 Motion for Review. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/24/2012. (cm)
May 22, 2012 Filing 386 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Named Plaintiffs' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims) by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Connell, Mary)
May 18, 2012 Filing 385 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims). (Leopold, Christopher)
May 14, 2012 Filing 384 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 338 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Excerpts of Deposition A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit C-1, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit H-1, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit K-1, # 17 Exhibit L, # 18 Exhibit L-1)(Nygaard, Diane)
May 11, 2012 Filing 383 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 325 MOTION to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Terry M. Long. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Leopold, Christopher)
May 11, 2012 Filing 382 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 327 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of David L. Crawford. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Leopold, Christopher)
May 11, 2012 Filing 381 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 321 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Professor Gail Stygall. (Leopold, Christopher)
May 11, 2012 Filing 380 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 332 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Selected Class Members' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (Leopold, Christopher)
May 11, 2012 Filing 379 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 323 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Named Plaintiffs' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (Leopold, Christopher)
May 11, 2012 Filing 378 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 333 MOTION for Advisory Jury. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 8, 2012 Filing 377 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(O'Connell, Mary)
May 7, 2012 Filing 376 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 350 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's February 24, 2012 and March 27, 2012 Orders. (Nygaard, Diane)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting # 373 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/7/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
May 4, 2012 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 373 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Their Unredacted Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims), and Four Exhibits to that Memorandum in Opposition, Nunc Pro Tunc as of April 11, 2012 by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
May 4, 2012 Filing 373 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Their Unredacted Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims), and Four Exhibits to that Memorandum in Opposition, Nunc Pro Tunc as of April 11, 2012 by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(O'Connell, Mary)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting # 371 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re # 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims). Reply deadline 5/18/2012. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/1/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
May 1, 2012 Filing 371 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to # 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER denying # 366 Motion for Leave to File; denying # 368 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs request that the Court allow them to exceed the arguments and authorities section in their memorandum opposing summary judgment by approximately five pages. The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' memorandum and notes that Plaintiffs facts total approximately 203 pages. This seems excessive. Thus, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit (Doc. 366). Furthermore, the Court imposes a total page limit on Plaintiffs' memorandum of 100 pages. Plaintiffs' can divide the 100 pages however they would like between facts and argument/authorities, but Plaintiffs' memorandum should not exceed 100 pages. The Court will give Plaintiffs' additional time to refine their memorandum, and their memorandum in opposition is now due on May 14. Defendants reply is due on June 11. Because the Court denies Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Nunc Pro Tunc is DENIED AS MOOT (Doc. 368). Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/26/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm) Modified on 4/26/2012. (cm)
April 24, 2012 Filing 369 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 350 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's February 24, 2012 and March 27, 2012 Orders. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Leopold, Christopher)
April 23, 2012 Filing 368 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Nunc Pro Tunc Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Diane Nygaard in Support of Nunc Pro Tunc Motion, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, # 3 Memorandum in Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Pls' 2nd Claim for Relieve, # 4 Affidavit of Stewart W. Fisher in Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Index in Support of Pls' Memorandum in Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit A (Apps. 1 - 20), # 7 Exhibit B (Apps. 21 - 35), # 8 Exhibit C (Apps. 36 - 50), # 9 Exhibit C-1 (Apps. 51 - 75), # 10 Exhibit D (Apps. 76 - 150), # 11 Exhibit E (Apps. 151 - 160), # 12 Exhibit F (Apps. 161 - 170), # 13 Exhibit G (Apps. 171 - 185), # 14 Exhibit H (Apps. 186 - 200), # 15 Exhibit H-1 (Apps. 201 - 225), # 16 Exhibit I (Apps. 226 - 260), # 17 Exhibit J (Apps. 261 - 300), # 18 Exhibit K (Apps. 301 - 374), # 19 Exhibit K-1 (Apps. 375 - 450), # 20 Exhibit L (Apps. 451 - 521), # 21 Exhibit L-1 (Apps. 522 - 600))(Nygaard, Diane)
April 21, 2012 Filing 367 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 366 MOTION for Leave To Exceed Page Limit by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Nygaard, Diane)
April 20, 2012 Filing 366 MOTION for Leave To Exceed Page Limit by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER denying # 362 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is not readily apparent to the Court as to why exhibits 1, 2, and 3 need to filed under seal. In addition, although Plaintiffs state that the motion is unopposed, it appears that Plaintiffs did not previously inform Defendants that they intended to seek leave to file exhibits 2 and 3 under seal. Thus, the Court questions whether the motion is unopposed. Furthermore, its readily apparent that it is unnecessary for Exhibit 5 to be filed under seal as it was previously filed as a public record. Accordingly, the Court denies Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File under Seal without prejudice (Doc. 362). Plaintiffs may resubmit their motion for leave to file under seal and should provide the court with appropriate reasons as to why the Court should allow Plaintiffs leave to file these exhibits under seal. Plaintiffs are directed to Judge Melgrens Guidelines for Motion Practice, which may be found on the Courts website. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/18/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting # 361 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 4/20/2012. Reply deadline 5/22/2012. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/16/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
April 16, 2012 Filing 363 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 362 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Their Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims), and to File Under Seal Four Exhibits to that Memorandum in Opposition by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 16, 2012 Filing 362 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Their Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims), and to File Under Seal Four Exhibits to that Memorandum in Opposition by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 16, 2012 Filing 361 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Tme to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Breach of Fiduciary Duty) by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 13, 2012 Filing 360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Document Requests by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
April 12, 2012 Filing 359 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplement to Amended Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to all Plaintiffs by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2012 Filing 358 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 323 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Named Plaintiffs' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2012 Filing 357 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 327 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of David L. Crawford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2012 Filing 356 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 332 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Selected Class Members' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2012 Filing 355 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2012 Filing 354 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 325 MOTION to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Terry M. Long. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Attachments A & B), # 2 Exhibit A (Attachments C - I), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2012 Filing 353 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 321 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Professor Gail Stygall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2012 Filing 352 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 333 MOTION for Advisory Jury. (Leopold, Christopher)
April 10, 2012 Filing 351 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 350 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's # 318 February 24, 2012 and # 349 March 27, 2012 Orders by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Nygaard, Diane)
April 10, 2012 Filing 350 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's # 318 February 24, 2012 and # 349 March 27, 2012 Orders by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 336 Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/27/2012. (ah)
March 20, 2012 Filing 348 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 336 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification of # 318 Order Granting Defendants' # 309 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lucas, Christopher)
March 16, 2012 Filing 347 RESPONSE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 336 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification of # 318 Order Granting Defendants' # 309 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Leopold, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2012 Filing 346 Corrected EXHIBIT (B-1) IN SUPPORT of # 335 Memorandum in Support of # 332 Motion for Summary Judgment on Selected Class Members' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims). (Leopold, Christopher)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting # 343 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit. Counsel is directed to file the corrected document forthwith. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/14/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting # 342 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re # 333 MOTION for Advisory Jury. Response deadline 4/11/2012. Reply deadline 5/11/2012. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/13/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
March 13, 2012 Filing 343 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Correct Exhibit by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-1)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 13, 2012 Filing 342 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to # 333 MOTION for Advisory Jury by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING DEADLINES regarding # 336 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification of # 318 Order Granting Defendants' # 309 Motion for Sanctions. Because the court's ruling on this motion might affect the parties' briefing on the recently filed motions for summary judgment, the deadlines are expedited as follows: response due 3/16/12; reply due 3/20/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/12/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
March 9, 2012 Filing 340 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of # 338 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Leopold, # 2 Appendix 1-107, # 3 Appendix 108-195, # 4 Appendix 196-274, # 5 Appendix 275-358, # 6 Appendix 359-433, # 7 Appendix 434-503, # 8 Appendix 504-561, # 9 Appendix 562-633, # 10 Appendix 634-720, # 11 Appendix 721-812, # 12 Appendix 813-887, # 13 Appendix 888-965, # 14 Appendix 966-1054, # 15 Appendix 1055-1163, # 16 Appendix 1164-1264, # 17 Letter 1265-1332, # 18 Appendix 1333-1392, # 19 Appendix 1393-1476, # 20 Appendix 1477-1562, # 21 Appendix 1563-1657, # 22 Appendix 1658-1749, # 23 Appendix 1750-1832, # 24 Appendix 1833-1912, # 25 Appendix 1913-1990, # 26 Appendix 1991-2071, # 27 Appendix 2072-2173, # 28 Appendix 2174-2203)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 9, 2012 Filing 339 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 338 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 9, 2012 Filing 338 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 9, 2012 Filing 337 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 336 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification of # 318 Order Granting Defendants' # 309 Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 9, 2012 Filing 336 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification of # 318 Order Granting Defendants' # 309 Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(O'Connell, Mary)
March 2, 2012 Filing 335 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 332 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Selected Class Members' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Randall T. Parker, # 3 Excerpts of Deposition B1, # 4 Exhibit B2, # 5 Exhibit B3, # 6 Exhibit B4, # 7 Exhibit B5, # 8 Exhibit B6, # 9 Exhibit B7, # 10 Exhibit B8, # 11 Exhibit B9, # 12 Exhibit B10, # 13 Exhibit B11, # 14 Exhibit B12, # 15 Exhibit B13, # 16 Exhibit B14, # 17 Exhibit B15, # 18 Exhibit B16, # 19 Exhibit B17, # 20 Exhibit B18, # 21 Exhibit B19, # 22 Exhibit B20, # 23 Exhibit B21, # 24 Exhibit B22, # 25 Exhibit B23, # 26 Exhibit B24, # 27 Exhibit B25, # 28 Exhibit B26, # 29 Exhibit B27, # 30 Exhibit B28, # 31 Exhibit 29 part 1, # 32 Exhibit 29 part 2, # 33 Exhibit 29 part 3, # 34 Exhibit B30, # 35 Exhibit B31, # 36 Exhibit B32, # 37 Exhibit B33, # 38 Exhibit B34, # 39 Exhibit B35, # 40 Exhibit B36 part 1, # 41 Exhibit B36 part 2, # 42 Exhibit B37 part 1, # 43 Exhibit B37 part 2, # 44 Exhibit B38 part 1, # 45 Exhibit B38 part 2, # 46 Exhibit B39 part 1, # 47 Exhibit B39 part 2, # 48 Exhibit B40 part 1, # 49 Exhibit B40 part 2, # 50 Exhibit B41 part 1, # 51 Exhibit B41 part 2, # 52 Exhibit B42 part 1, # 53 Exhibit B42 part 2, # 54 Exhibit B42 part 3, # 55 Exhibit B43 part 1, # 56 Exhibit B43 part 2, # 57 Exhibit B43 part 3, # 58 Exhibit B43 part 4, # 59 Exhibit B43 part 5, # 60 Exhibit B43 part 6)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 334 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 333 MOTION for Advisory Jury by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum.(Nygaard, Diane)
March 2, 2012 Filing 333 MOTION for Advisory Jury by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
March 2, 2012 Filing 332 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Selected Class Members' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 331 (DISREGARD: Filed in Error; Incorrect Event Selected.) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
March 2, 2012 Filing 330 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Declaration of Randall T. Parker, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Declaration of Christopher Koenigs, # 7 Exhibit B-1)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief (Age Discrimination Claims) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 328 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 327 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of David L. Crawford by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher J. Leopold, # 2 Exhibit A: Crawford Report, # 3 Exhibit B: Crawford Depo.)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 327 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of David L. Crawford by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 326 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 325 MOTION to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Terry M. Long by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Leopold, # 2 Exhibit A: Long Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit B: Long Deposition, # 4 Exhibit C: Long Rebuttal Report, # 5 Exhibit D: 10/11/11 Lempert letter)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 325 MOTION to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Terry M. Long by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 324 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 323 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Named Plaintiffs' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Declaration of Randall T. Parker, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit A-4, # 7 Exhibit A-5, # 8 Exhibit A-6, # 9 Exhibit A-7, # 10 Exhibit A-8, # 11 Exhibit A-9, # 12 Exhibit A-10, # 13 Exhibit A-11, # 14 Exhibit A-12, # 15 Exhibit A-13, # 16 Exhibit A-14, # 17 Exhibit A-15, # 18 Exhibit A-16, # 19 Exhibit A-17, # 20 Exhibit A-18, # 21 Exhibit A-19, # 22 Exhibit A-20, # 23 Exhibit A-21, # 24 Exhibit A-22, # 25 Exhibit A-23, # 26 Exhibit A-24, # 27 Exhibit A-25, # 28 Exhibit A-26, # 29 Exhibit A-27, # 30 Exhibit A-28)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 323 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Named Plaintiffs' First and Third Claims for Relief (Contractual Vesting Claims) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 321 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Professor Gail Stygall by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Declaration of Christopher Koenigs, # 3 Exhibit A1, # 4 Exhibit A2, # 5 Exhibit A3, # 6 Exhibit A4, # 7 Exhibit A5, # 8 Exhibit A6, # 9 Exhibit A7, # 10 Exhibit A8, # 11 Exhibit A9, # 12 Exhibit A10, # 13 Exhibit A11)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2012 Filing 321 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Professor Gail Stygall by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting # 319 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dispositive motion deadline 3/9/2012. Response deadline 4/18/2012. Reply deadline 5/18/2012. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/29/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
February 27, 2012 Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time of 7 days to file motion for summary judgment on Count II only by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting # 309 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/24/2012. (ah)
February 22, 2012 Filing 317 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 309 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Discovery Order. (Leopold, Christopher)
February 20, 2012 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 309 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Discovery Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 20, 2012 Filing 315 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplement to Amended Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to all Plaintiffs by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting defendants' motion for expedited briefing (doc. 311). As discussed during the telephone hearing on on 2/13/12, plaintiffs shall file their brief in opposition to defendants' motion for sanctions (doc. 309) by 2/20/12 (even though that is a federal holiday). Defendants' reply brief, if any, shall be filed by 2/22/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/13/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James) (Reply deadline modified on 2/13/2012 to reflect 02/22/2012. (mg))
February 13, 2012 Filing 313 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 311 MOTION for Expedited Briefing re # 309 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(O'Connell, Mary)
February 13, 2012 Filing 312 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion # 311 MOTION for Expedited Briefing re # 309 Motion for Sanctions: Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2012 at 2:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Counsel shall e-mail chambers at ksd_ohara_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov indicating who will be on the conference call and the telephone number to be reached for the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
February 13, 2012 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding 314 Order on Motion to Expedite: Order docket text regarding the reply deadline to # 309 Motion for Sanctions, has been modified to read as follows: Defendants' reply brief, if any, shall be filed by 2/22/12. Contact the Clerk's Office with any questions. (mg)
February 10, 2012 Filing 311 MOTION for Expedited Briefing re # 309 Motion for Sanctions by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Hecht, Scott) (Motion association added on 2/10/2012. (mg))
February 9, 2012 Filing 310 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 309 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Discovery Order by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Leopold, Christopher)
February 9, 2012 Filing 309 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Discovery Order by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
February 6, 2012 Filing 308 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 287 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action. (Leopold, Christopher)
January 30, 2012 Filing 307 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Corrected Third Supplement to Amended Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to all Plaintiffs by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 30, 2012 Filing 306 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Third Supplement to Amended Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to all Plaintiffs by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 23, 2012 Filing 305 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 285 MOTION to Decertify Class Action. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leopold, Christopher)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting # 302 unopposed motion for extension of time until January 27, 2012, for plaintiffs to serve supplemental discovery responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/23/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
January 17, 2012 Filing 303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Second Supplement to Amended Objections and Responses to Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 17, 2012 Filing 302 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Supplemental Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 6, 2012 Filing 301 Corrected MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 287 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(O'Connell, Mary)
January 6, 2012 Filing 300 (DISREGARD: See # 301 for the corrected document filing.) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 287 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(O'Connell, Mary)
January 4, 2012 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Document Requests by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting # 296 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 1/6/2012. Reply deadline 2/6/2012. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/27/2011. (cm)
December 23, 2011 Filing 297 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 285 MOTION to Decertify Class Action.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Connell, Mary)
December 23, 2011 Filing 296 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Briefing Deadline.by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED. Dispositive motion deadline 3/2/2012. Trial set for 1/8/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 408 before District Judge Eric F. Melgren; estimated trial time 15 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/21/2011. (kg)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed with counsel during the final pretrial conference on 12/15/11, and with the approval of the presiding U.S. District Judge, Eric F. Melgren, the deadline for filing dispositive motions and Daubert motions is extended to 3/2/12. The schedule for briefing those motions will be set out in the final pretrial order. A second mediation shall be held by 11/9/12. The case is specially set for jury trial on 1/8/13 at 9:00 AM Judge Melgren. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/15/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(O'Hara, James)
December 15, 2011 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/15/2011. (TEXT ENTRY FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
December 12, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The final pretrial conference set for 12/15/2011 at 9:00 AM CST will be conducted by telephone with Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The parties shall dial-in at 1-866-207-5448, the confirmation number is 36260327. The call will commence promptly at 9:00 AM Central Standard Time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kg)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting # 291 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 12/23/2011. Reply deadline 1/23/2012. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/5/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
December 5, 2011 Filing 291 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Deadlines by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting the informal request of the parties for an extension to 12/7/2011 to submit their proposed pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/30/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kg)
November 23, 2011 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 287 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
November 23, 2011 Filing 288 (DISREGARD: Incorrect document attached; see # 289 for corrected filing.) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 287 MOTION for Order to Decertify Collective Action by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher) (Public viewing restricted on 11/23/2011. (mg))
November 23, 2011 Filing 287 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants(Leopold, Christopher)
November 23, 2011 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 285 MOTION to Decertify Class Action by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
November 23, 2011 Filing 285 MOTION to Decertify Class Action by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Declaration of Randall T. Parker, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit A-4, # 7 Exhibit A-5, # 8 Exhibit A-6, # 9 Exhibit A-7, # 10 Exhibit A-8, # 11 Exhibit A-9, # 12 Exhibit A-10, # 13 Exhibit A-11, # 14 Exhibit A-12, # 15 Exhibit A-13, # 16 Exhibit A-14, # 17 Exhibit A-15, # 18 Exhibit A-16, # 19 Exhibit A-17, # 20 Exhibit A-18, # 21 Exhibit A-19, # 22 Exhibit A-20, # 23 Exhibit A-21, # 24 Exhibit A-22, # 25 Exhibit A-23, # 26 Exhibit A-24, # 27 Exhibit A-25, # 28 Exhibit A-26, # 29 Exhibit A-27, # 30 Exhibit A-28, # 31 Exhibit A-29, # 32 Exhibit A-30, # 33 Exhibit A-31, # 34 Exhibit A-32, # 35 Exhibit A-33, # 36 Exhibit A-34, # 37 Exhibit A-35, # 38 Exhibit A-36, # 39 Exhibit A-37, # 40 Exhibit A-38, # 41 Exhibit A-39, # 42 Exhibit A-40, # 43 Exhibit A-41, # 44 Exhibit A-42, # 45 Exhibit A-43, # 46 Exhibit A-44, # 47 Exhibit A-45, # 48 Exhibit A-46, # 49 Exhibit A-47, # 50 Exhibit A-48, # 51 Exhibit A-49, # 52 Exhibit A-50, # 53 Exhibit A-51, # 54 Exhibit A-52, # 55 Exhibit A-53, # 56 Exhibit A-54, # 57 Exhibit A-55, # 58 Exhibit A-56, # 59 Exhibit A-57, # 60 Exhibit A-58, # 61 Exhibit A-59, # 62 Declaration of Christopher Koenigs, # 63 Exhibit B-1, # 64 Exhibit B-2, # 65 Exhibit B-3, # 66 Exhibit B-4, # 67 Exhibit B-5, # 68 Exhibit B-6, # 69 Exhibit B-7, # 70 Exhibit B-8, # 71 Exhibit B-9, # 72 Exhibit B-10, # 73 Exhibit B-11, # 74 Exhibit B-12, # 75 Exhibit B-13, # 76 Exhibit B-14, # 77 Exhibit B-15, # 78 Exhibit B-16, # 79 Exhibit B-17, # 80 Exhibit B-18, # 81 Exhibit B-19, # 82 Exhibit B-20, # 83 Exhibit B-21, # 84 Exhibit B-22, # 85 Exhibit B-23, # 86 Exhibit B-24, # 87 Exhibit B-25, # 88 Exhibit B-26, # 89 Exhibit B-27, # 90 Exhibit B-28, # 91 Exhibit B-29, # 92 Exhibit B-30, # 93 Exhibit B-31, # 94 Exhibit B-32, # 95 Declaration of Steve Browne, # 96 Exhibit C-1, # 97 Declaration of Barbara Niehus, # 98 Exhibit D-1)(Leopold, Christopher)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting # 283 joint motion for extension. For good cause shown, the parties' deadline for completing expert-related discovery is extended to 12/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/23/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
November 22, 2011 Filing 283 Joint MOTION for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadline by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 269 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/9/2011. (ah)
November 4, 2011 Filing 281 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 269 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leopold, Christopher)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 251 plaintiffs' motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/4/2011. (ah)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting # 277 and # 278 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael B. Carroll and Christopher J. Koenigs are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non- Flexcare Participants. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/31/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
October 28, 2011 Filing 278 MOTION for attorney Christopher J. Koenigs to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-2185246.) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christopher J. Koenigs)(Leopold, Christopher)
October 28, 2011 Filing 277 MOTION for attorney Michael B. Carroll to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-2185238.) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael B. Carroll)(Leopold, Christopher)
October 26, 2011 Filing 276 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Expert Reports by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
October 21, 2011 Filing 275 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 269 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting # 273 unopposed motion for extension of time until October 21, 2011, for plaintiffs to respond to defendants' motion to compel (doc. 269). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/13/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
October 13, 2011 Filing 273 Unopposed MOTION for extension of Deadline to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
October 7, 2011 Filing 272 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemented Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting # 268 unopposed motion for extension of deadlines. The fact discovery deadline is extended until October 4, 2011, solely to allow plaintiffs to depose third-party Richard Murdock. The deadline for supplemental disclosures is extended until October 7, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/3/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
September 30, 2011 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 269 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Compliance, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Leopold, Christopher)
September 30, 2011 Filing 269 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
September 30, 2011 Filing 268 Unopposed MOTION for extension of Deadlines by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
September 30, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE of Filing Consent To Become Party Plaintiffs by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nygaard, Diane)
September 30, 2011 Filing 266 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Victoria Gorokhovich as to All Defendants. (Leopold, Christopher)
September 16, 2011 Filing 265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Supplement to Amended Objections and Responses to Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Plaintiffs by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
September 13, 2011 Filing 264 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 251 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Connell, Mary)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 EIGHTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: and ORDER granting # 262 joint motion for extension of deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/1/2011. (ah)
August 31, 2011 Filing 262 Joint MOTION for extension of Deadlines by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
August 29, 2011 Filing 261 NOTICE of Filing of Redacted Exhibit J to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 260 Response to # 251 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(Leopold, Christopher)
August 29, 2011 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Please note that exhibit #13 has been blocked from public view, attorney to re-file exhibit seperately.re: # 260 Response. (yh)
August 26, 2011 Filing 260 RESPONSE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 251 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve T. Reed, # 2 Declaration of Denise M. Dellaratta, # 3 Declaration of James P. Walsh, Jr., # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L)(Leopold, Christopher)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting # 258 joint motion to extend deadlines. Plaintiffs shall have until August 31, 2011, to file opt-in consent forms for the 70 individuals referenced in the motion. Defendants' response to the pending motion to compel (doc. # 251 ) is extended until August 26, 2011; plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by September 13, 2011. Defendants' supplemental response to Interrogatory No. 6 is due August 16, 2011. Any motion to compel by plaintiffs regarding defendants' response to Interrogatory No. 6 shall be filed by August 26, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/15/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
August 12, 2011 Filing 258 Joint MOTION for extension of certain deadlines by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
August 9, 2011 Filing 257 ADR REPORT by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. ADR session held on: August 3, 2011 and conducted by Philip Pfeiffer. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Discovery Complete. (Leopold, Christopher)
August 2, 2011 Filing 256 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Expert Report of Terry M. Long, FSA, MAAA and Expert Report of Gail Stygall, Ph.D. by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SEVENTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: and ORDER granting # 254 joint motion for extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/19/2011. (ah)
July 18, 2011 Filing 254 Corrected Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Plaintiffs. (Nygaard, Diane)
July 15, 2011 Filing 253 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Plaintiffs.(Nygaard, Diane) (Motion termed; see # 254 Motion for corrected filing. Modified on 7/18/2011. (mg))
July 15, 2011 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 251 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Nygaard, Diane)
July 15, 2011 Filing 251 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs. (Nygaard, Diane)
June 27, 2011 Filing 250 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 27, 2011 Filing 249 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 27, 2011 Filing 248 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 23, 2011 Filing 247 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 23, 2011 Filing 246 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 22, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 20, 2011 Filing 244 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 15, 2011 Filing 243 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 13, 2011 Filing 242 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10))(Nygaard, Diane)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SIXTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: and ORDER granting # 240 the parties' joint motion for extension of deadlines. See attached order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/13/2011. (ct)
June 10, 2011 Filing 240 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 FIFTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: and ORDER granting # 238 joint motion for extension of deadlines. See order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/1/2011. (RA)
May 27, 2011 Filing 238 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Nygaard, Diane)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER denying request for costs and legal fees (see doc. 198) associated with # 179 motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/16/2011. (RA)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting # 233 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jessica E. Leaven is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of William Douglas Fulghum. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/2/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting the joint motion of the parties # 234 for extension of deadlines. The court grants the following extensions: (1) the deadline for defendants to file a motion to compel regarding the second set of interrogatories to all plaintiffs is extended to July 1, 2011; (2) the deadline for defendants to serve responses and/or objections and any responsive documents to plaintiffs' second set of discovery requests is extended to May 13, 2011; (3) the deadline for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel regarding plaintiffs' second set of discovery requests is extended to June 3, 2011; and (4) the deadline for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel regarding plaintiffs' subpoena served on third-party Towers Watson is extended to June 3, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/2/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
April 29, 2011 Filing 234 Joint MOTION for extension of time by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
April 29, 2011 Filing 233 MOTION for attorney Jessica E. Leaven to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-2033432.) by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting # 231 joint motion to allow completion of the deposition of Gayle Phillips by May 31, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/28/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
April 27, 2011 Filing 231 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Allow Completion of Deposition by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting # 229 joint motion for extension of time. The fact-discovery deadline is extended until May 31, 2011, to allow the parties to complete the depositions outlined in the parties' motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/26/2011.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
April 25, 2011 Filing 229 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend the Deadline for Fact Discovery by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting the unopposed motion of defendants # 226 for an extension of time to April 29, 2011 to file a motion to compel relating to their second set of interrogatories to all plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/18/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
April 18, 2011 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 226 MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel under Local Rule 37.1 stating that plaintiffs do not oppose the motion by Defendants. (Leopold, Christopher)
April 15, 2011 Filing 226 MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel under Local Rule 37.1 by Defendants. (Leopold, Christopher)
April 14, 2011 Filing 225 NOTICE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum of taking deposition of Donald Clark on Thursday, April 28, 2011 beginning at 10:00 AM. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 14, 2011 Filing 224 NOTICE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum of taking deposition of Lisa Hux Benson on Tuesday, April 26, 2011 beginning at 10:30 AM. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 14, 2011 Filing 223 NOTICE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum of taking deposition of Gayle Phillips on Monday, April 25, 2011 beginning at 9:00 AM. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER denying plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a motion to compel relating to defendants' privilege log # 218 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/14/2011. (ct)
April 13, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE of Consent Form on behalf of Clayton O. Burriss, Jr. by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 11, 2011 Filing 220 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 218 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel Relating to Defendants' Privledge Log. (O'Connell, Mary)
April 8, 2011 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants re # 218 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel Relating to Defendants' Privledge Log. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Walsh, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Walsh, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Walsh, # 4 Declaration of Brian O'Bleness, # 5 Exhibit In re Universal Service Fund)(Hecht, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel Relating to Defendants' Privledge Log, and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott M. Lempert, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER: As discussed during an informal status conference with counsel on March 31, 2011, plaintiffs want to challenge defendants' privilege log, but the parties dispute whether any such challenge would be timely. Pursuant to the parties' agreed briefing schedule, plaintiffs shall file their motion for leave to file a motion to compel by April 4, 2011, limited to five pages. Defendants shall file their response by April 8, 2011, also limited to five pages. Plaintiffs shall file their reply by April 11, 2011, limited to two pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/1/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ct)
March 30, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE by William Douglas Fulghum of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Discovery Requests (O'Connell, Mary)
March 16, 2011 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Plaintiffs by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting # 213 joint motion for extension of time. The parties shall complete mediation by 7/28/2011. Supplementation of disclosures shall be completed by 6/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/10/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
March 9, 2011 Filing 213 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Conduct Mediation and Make Supplemental Disclosure by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER finding as moot # 206 Motion for Order; granting # 209 Motion for Approval of Form of Class Notice. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/15/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
February 14, 2011 Filing 211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories to All Plaintiffs by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
February 11, 2011 Filing 210 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of # 209 Joint MOTION for Approval of Form of Class Notice . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 11, 2011 Filing 209 Joint MOTION for Approval of Form of Class Notice by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(Nygaard, Diane)
February 4, 2011 Filing 208 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING regarding the Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Eric F. Melgren re # 206 Joint Motion for Approval of Form of Class Notice. PLEASE NOTE: Counsel is now instructed to call 866-963-7123 for the conference. The appropriate code, when prompted, is 6647. THIS IS A CHANGE REGARDING THE INITIATION OF THE CALL ONLY. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
February 3, 2011 Filing 207 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Eric F. Melgren re # 206 Joint Motion for Approval of Form of Class Notice. The Court will place the call. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
January 21, 2011 Filing 206 Joint MOTION for Order for Approval of Form of Class Notice by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nygaard, Diane)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting # 204 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Counsel shall have up to and including 1/21/2011 to submit the joint proposed notice as outlined in # 199 Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/19/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm) Modified on 1/20/2011 to correct text (alm).
January 18, 2011 Filing 204 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Complete Meet and Confer Concerning the Proposed Class Notice by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(Lucas, Christopher)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting # 201 unopposed motion for extension of time until 1/26/2011 to complete production. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/13/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
January 12, 2011 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Supplemental Response to Defendants Third Request for Production of Documents by William Douglas Fulghum. (O'Connell, Mary)
January 12, 2011 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to complete production pursuant to the Court's order granting defendants' motion to compel by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
January 5, 2011 Filing 200 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 197 Order on Motion to Compel (O'Connell, Mary)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 127 Motion to Certify Class; granting # 129 Motion to Certify; denying # 183 Motion for Leave to File. The parties are directed to meet and confer concerning the proposed notice and must submit a joint proposed notice on or before 1/18/2011. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/4/2011. (cm)
December 29, 2010 Filing 198 NOTICE of Defendants' Accounting of Costs and Legal Fees by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Accounting, # 2 Exhibit B: Invoices)(Leopold, Christopher)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting # 179 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/21/2010. (RA)
December 21, 2010 Filing 196 NOTICE of Corrected Citation by William Douglas Fulghum re # 185 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (O'Connell, Mary)
December 15, 2010 Filing 195 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of # 193 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, Exhibit 1 by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Leopold, Christopher)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting # 192 motion for leave to file exhibits 1-3 to defendants' reply memorandum under seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/15/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
December 15, 2010 Filing 193 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 179 MOTION to Compel (Leopold, Christopher)
December 15, 2010 Filing 192 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Leopold, Christopher)
December 13, 2010 Filing 191 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Justin O. Reliford as to All Defendants (Leopold, Christopher)
December 10, 2010 Filing 190 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by William Douglas Fulghum re # 128 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lucas, Christopher)
December 2, 2010 Filing 189 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) 6 re # 185 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Nygaard, Diane)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting # 186 motion for leave to file Exhibit 6 to plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition (doc. 185) under seal. Exhibit 6 contains personal financial information of a plaintiff. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/2/2010. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
December 1, 2010 Filing 187 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 183 MOTION for Leave to file supplemental brief and memorandum in support (Nygaard, Diane)
December 1, 2010 Filing 186 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Nygaard, Diane)
December 1, 2010 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs Faye P. Abbott, Judith R. Adams, Lois J. Ainley, Lois J. Ainsley, Robert D. Aldridge, James L. Alford, Johnny W. Allen, Mary S. Allen, Thomas G. Allgood, Jr, Evelyn A. Alligood, Henry W. Ammons, Anzilia K. Anderson, Clara W.L. Anderson, Mary Ellen Anderson, Donald E. Armstrong, Howard D. Armstrong, James E. Armstrong, Michael L. Atkinson, Charles E. Autry, Dwight C. Autry, James L. Autry, Lila H. Autry, W. J. Avent, Effie H. Avery, Janie B. Ayers, George W. Bailey, Johnny Preston Baker, Joseph K. Baker, Lough Massey Baker, Mary Harrell Baker, Ophelia H. Baker, Rufus James Baker, Shelby M. Baker, William A. Baker, Clifford E. Ball, Naomi M. Ball, Thomas V. Barden, Katie Cook Barnes, Sue Barnes, Thomas Scott Barnes, Willie E. Barnes, Judith W. Basnight, Gerald Bass, Verona W. Bass, Carolyn J. Batchelor, Verona W. Bath, Frances L. Batts, Gerald C. Batts, Mary P. Batts, Madeline B. Beach, Carl Beacham, Jr, Linda C. Beaman, Noah Alfred Beamon, Jenette C. Bell, V. Allen Bender, III, John O. Benson, Peggy J. Biggs, Ronnie Bill, L.S. Blades, III, Essie L. Blalock, Curtis W. Bland, Wynona H. Blount, Mel Steven Bobbitt, Johnny D. Bordeaux, Ann L. Boyette, Geraldine E. Boyette, Jack H. Boyette, Mary B. Boykin, Joyce C. Bracy, Marian E. Bracy, Claude Braddy, Jr, Janice C. Braddy, Thelma Robbins Braddy, Steven P. Bradley, Jean T. Bradshaw, Edward R. Brady, Mary Ann Brame, Charles M. Bratcher, Josephine S. Bratcher, Linda G. Brewer, James Woodie Britt, Mary E. Britton, Audrey A. Brown, Carol J. Brown, Eddie R. Brown, Graham T. Brown, Henry W. Brown, Janice Brown, William P. Brown, Gordon D. Brunson, Roberta H. Brunson, Marie W. Bucknam, Betsy Bullock, Geneva E. Bullock, Geneya Bullock, Mattie J. Bullock, Patricia W. Bunch, Tony A. Bunch, Carol S. Burchette, John Lee Burgess, James F. Burnette, Ethel A. Burns, Clayton O. Burriss, Jr, Diamond H. Butler, Dorothy G. Butler, Franklin D. Butler, Robert C. Byrd, Ruth M. Cagle, Bertha S. Campbell, Shirley G. Canady, Kerry W. Carawan, Daniel H. Carlisle, Stanton R. Carnes, Alice B. Carpenter, Betty A. Carpenter, Kenneth A. Carpenter, Milton R. Carpenter, Betty M. Carr, Dolores P. Carraway, Linda K. Carroll, Lucille H. Carta, Bernard John Carter, Jr, Carl Ray Carter, Melvin S. Carter, Lois Ann Carver, Bobby B. Cashwell, Glenn M. Causway, John W. Cherry, Betty W. Chesson, Linda W. Chesson, Eileen L. Childers, Ann P. Chipps, Daisy A. Clark, Donald E. Clark, Donald R. Clark, Robert L. Clegg, Shirley W. Cleland, Cullen Cobb, Jr, Earl G. Coble, James C. Cofield, Josie D. Cofield, Annie M. Coggins, Colleen H. Coker, Naomi M. Coker, Alvin L. Coley, Linda C. Coley, Raymond A. Collins, Victoria C. Collins, Joyce L. Connor, Nancy D. Cook, Carl T. Cooley, William H. Cooley, Ann G. Cooper, Callie L. Cooper, Charles W. Cooper, Edward G. Corey, James H. Council, Dolley E. Cox, Walter L. Cratch, John W. Craver, Henry E. Creel, Arvey O. Crocker, Jr, Shelby A. Croom, Marshall W. Crumpler, Melvin D. Crumpler, Nancy R. Curtis, Harold B. Cutler, Jack E. Cutler, Vernon R. Dail, Ada F. Daniel, Dorsey Daniel, Terry F. Daniels, Ulyss Glenn Daughtridge, Belva J. Davenport, Shelby F. Davenport, Billy E. Davidson, Helen I. Davis, Hinton Carlton Davis, Lesly B. Davis, Robert I. Davis, Selma W. Davis, Vivian W. Davis, Jack D. Dawson, Betty W. Deal, Walter F. Deal, Janis S. Dempster, Betty Jean Dennie, Bobby C. Dennie, Marcelene D. Denny, Richard H. Denton, Grace J. Devane, Edward M. Dickens, Margaret S. Dildy, Timothy Dillon, Charles T. Dorman, Paul D. Dorman, Willie Dorman, Gordon H. Doughtie, Lena W. Doughtie, Martha M. Douglas, Isabel Downing, Eugene F. Dozier, William P. Duckett, Jr, William F. Dugger, George F. Duke, Julia J. Duke, Bobby E. Dunn, Lois W. Dunn, Robert W. Duvall, Dolly O. Eastwood, Billy Y. Edgerton, Bobby Ray Edmondson, Amy T. Edwards, Finley C. Edwards, W. Thomas Edwards, Mary Eldridge, Mildred T. Elks, Eva Kaye G. Ellington, Christine K. Ellis, Larry T. Ellis, Louis E. Ellis, Lucille B. Ellis, Michael L. Ellis, William E. Elmore, Betty Elmore-Stancill, Selby A. Etheridge, Jr, Carolyn R. Evans, Kermit M. Evans, Tony W. Evans, Vonita H. Evans, Jeannette M. Ezzell, Jenell B. Ezzell, John D. Ezzelle, Mavis E. Faircloth, Olivia B. Farrell, Michael E. Ferrell, Preston L. Fields, Charles W. Fisher, Leslie B. Fisher, Ruth F. Fisher, Janie G. Fleming, Donna S. Fling, Dianne K. Flint, Bertha S. Floyd, Floyd L. Flythe, Linda L. Flythe, Clarence G. Forbes, Marilyn B. Forbes, Martha S. Foster, Barbara Franks, William R. Frazier, Judy S. Freeman, William Douglas Fulghum, I. Gerald Futrell, William Games, Elizabeth H. Gardner, Linda A. Garrett, Robert L. Garrett, Margie A. Garris, Deidrick H. Gaskill, Donald P. Gaskins, Linda H. Gaskins, Herbert L. Gay, Willie R. Gay, William A. Gilbert, Willie E. Godwin, Jerry S. Gore, Lillie B. Grady, Priscilla T. Granger, Jane T. Grantham, Hilda B. Gray, Grover L. Griffin, Alton C. Grissom, Rosalyn S. Guirkins, Charlie J. Gurganus, Van A. Gurkins, Brenda B. Hairr, Junie Mack Hairr, John O. Hall, Jimmy C. Hamilton, Betty F. Hamm, Joel F. Hancock, James E. Haney, Robert Alton Hanford, Frances H. Hardee, Linda P. Hardee, Kenneth R. Harrell, Linda H. Harrell, Loretta F. Harrell, Melvin R. Harrell, John Harrington, Alice W. Harris, Donnie P. Harris, Doris C. Harris, Elizabeth R. Harris, Jimmy L. Harris, Sr, Barbara J. Harrison, Norma H. Harrison, Jonathan F. Havens, Shelby B. Heath, David R. Hemby, Shirley G. Henderson, Bennie Herman, Jr, Hoytte Douglas Herrin, Wilton L. Herring, Lindsey W. Hewitt, Charles D. Hinson, Ruby M. Hinton, Bobby R. Hobgood, Lindbergh Holden, Christine M. Holland, Eugene R. Holland, Julia H. Holland, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Nancy L. Hollis, Murrell T. Hollman, Jane F. Holloman, Roger L. Holt, Rebecca F. Hooker, Rosby R. Hopkins, William H. Hopkins, Willie C. Hopkins, Dennis Horchler, Jeannette Faye Horne, Carolyn M. Horton, Clarence S. Hough, Annette A. House, Chester B. Houston, Stacy J. Houston, Heywood B. Houtz, Maryland Y. Howard, Marvin Howell, Katherine H. Howse, Dorothy E. Hudson, S. J. Humienny, Sr, James S. Ikner, Estella Ipock, George L. Ipock, Lewis R. Irvin, Charles E. Isles, Patricia D. Jackson, Paul A. Jackson, Raymond L. Jackson, William Franklin Jackson, Johnnie E. James, Joyce S. Jefferson, William W. Jefferson, Donald S. Jenkins, James Kenneth Johnson, John Charles Johnson, Lillie M. Johnson, Marcus W. Johnson, Ralph A. Johnson, Ralph L. Johnson, Jr, Bobby D. Jolly, Alice R. Jones, Aubrey D. Jones, John C. Jones, Kathy Beach Jones, Leona A. Jones, Peter H. Jones, Shirley L. Jones, Willie J. Jones, Norma C. Josey, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Dolly J. Joyner, Doris L. Joyner, Dorothy B. Joyner, Wilbur Glenn Joyner, Nancy R. Justice, Charles J. Kearney, Martha H. Keen, W. E. Kelchner, Donald G. Kennedy, Walter L. Kennedy, J. J. Killebrew, Eleanor S. King, Irma E. King, Robert E. King, Thelma V. King, William Mack King, William B. King, Bruce R. Kirkwood, Lorraine E. Kirkwood, Wesley G. Knott, Charles Ray Knowles, Miriam S. Kricko, Thelma W. Lafferty, Bobby L. Lamm, Martha C. Lamm, William E. Lamm, Dennis R. Lane, Ernestine C. Langley, James D. Langley, Violet H. Lanier, William A. Larrimore, Frances W. Latham, Kenneth Lee, Milton E. Lee, Patricia B. Lee, Rosyln A. Lefevers, Billy M. Leggett, Sherrie B. Leggett, Patricia C. Letchworth, Betty D. Lewis, Brenda B. Lewis, Leo N. Lewis, Sandra B. Lewis, Sybil Rowe Lewis, Sylvia B. Lewis, Polly C. Lilley, Shelby M. Lilley, Norma Midyette Lindsey, Geraldine Little, B. G. Littleton, Thomas E. Littleton, Gerald T. Lockamy, Alice D. Long, Betty B. Long, Clara M. Long, Elsie O. Long, Rachel G. Lovick, Faye M. Lucas, Jaye M. Lucas, Terry T. Lucas, Joyce C. Mahan, George P. Maier, Donald H. Mallard, Randall G. Mallard, Shirley B. Malpass, Mamie R. Manning, Lucy O. Mantas, Joyce A. Marshburn, Joe E. Martin, Clarence L. Mason, Helen C. Massey, Rose D. Matthews, Ruth H. Matthews, John T. May, Kenneth S. May, Mary H. Maynard, James P. Mayo, Mickey R. McAdams, Naomi B. McBride, Roy E. McCarter, William Troy McCarter, David L. McCaskill, Mae Vonne McClure, Alice R. McCorquodale, Clifford C. McCullough, Donna H. McCullough, Roderick A. McGlohon, Daniel B. McLamb, Nellie O. McLamb, Eunice Stephens McLaurin, Laudie Colon McLaurin, Hilda A. McLawhorn, Weldon E. McLawhorn, Neal C. McLeod, Jr, Rachel C. McManus, Rodney M. Medlin, Linda L. Meeks, Margaret Ann Meeks, William Ann Meeks, Ennis W. Mercer, Carlton V. Metts, James Truitt Miller, Jeanette Y. Miller, Leon Gene Miller, Mary M. Miller, Darling David Mills, Virginia R. Minton, Ethel D. Mitchel, Dorothy R. Moore, George Moore, Jr, James H. Moore, Jane T. Moore, Jesse C. Moore, John Thomas Moore, Lemuel K. Moore, Marland G. Moore, Barbara P. Mooring, William C. Morris, Evelyn F. Morrow, Patricia B. Morrow, Nancy J. Moseley, Norman Carlton Moseley, Gloria P. Mosley, Ernest Mozingo, Emma Frances Nanney, Mary D. Narron, Charlie G. Neal, Claude T. Neal, Dianne S. Neal, Eleanor Nelms, Lonnie R. Nelms, Peggy S. Nelson, Troy W. Nelson, June W. Newberry, Evelyn W. Nicholson, Janie P. Nicholson, Hazel M. Nixo, Ramona S. Norman, Kay W. Norville, Robert L. Norville, Sr, Gregory Nunnery, Grace O'Geary, Jacqueline L. O'Neal, Joseph W. Odom, Braxton S. Oliver, Herbert W. Oliver, Thomas M. Oliver, Michael D. Outlaw, Barbara B. Overby, Charles G. Overby, Evelyn C. Overby, Frances K. Overton, John W. Overton, Joyce Y. Owens, George C. Pace, Joyce E. Pace, Jimmy L. Packard, Charles E. Page, Lynwood V. Page, Albert B. Parker, Allen R. Parker, Bobby F. Parrish, Doris J. Patterson, Willis R. Peaden, Jewell H. Pearsall, Luther D. Pearsall, Sr, Ethel J. Peedin, Lucille Peele, David B. Pepper, Theodore B. Perritt, Linda P. Perry, Robert L. Perry, Albert Ray Phelps, Violet W. Phillips, Faye E. Phykitt, Brenda S. Pilgreen, Alice R. Pitt, Charles G. Pittman, Curtis C. Pittman, Kenneth N. Pollock, Harold D. Pope, Margie L. Pope, Marshall B. Pope, Mary B. Pope, Iris E. Powell, Larry Powell, Catherine R. Powers, Joyce P. Powers, Bobby F. Price, Joseph Earl Price, Retha A. Price, Shelby F. Pridgen, Grace N. Proctor, Cathy C. Pruitt, Sidney H. Purvis, Barbara B. Rackley, Francis Dalton
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting # 182 unopposed motion for extension of time until 12/1/2010 to file an opposition brief to defendants' motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/29/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
November 24, 2010 Filing 183 MOTION for Leave to file supplemental brief and memorandum in support by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit to Proposed Supplemental Brief)(Leopold, Christopher)
November 24, 2010 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to # 179 MOTION to Compel of Defendants ( Response deadline 12/8/2010) by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(Lucas, Christopher) Modified on 11/29/2010 to correct text (alm).
November 17, 2010 Filing 181 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action , # 127 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lucas, Christopher)
November 12, 2010 Filing 180 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 179 MOTION to Compel by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Cert of Compliance, # 2 Exhibit 2: Oct 19 letter, # 3 Exhibit 3: Oct 21 letter, # 4 Exhibit 4: Nov 5 letter, # 5 Exhibit 5: Requests for Production, # 6 Exhibit 6: Unisys discovery, # 7 Exhibit 7: Responses to Requests)(Leopold, Christopher)
November 12, 2010 Filing 179 MOTION to Compel by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants(Leopold, Christopher)
October 27, 2010 Filing 178 SUPPLEMENT Brief in Opposition to Class Certification and Plaintiffs' Request for Equitable Tolling by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Leopold, Christopher)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting # 176 unopposed motion for extension of time until 11/12/2010 for defendants to file a motion to compel regarding plaintiffs' responses to defendants' third set of requests for production. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/21/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (RA)
October 21, 2010 Filing 176 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants(Leopold, Christopher)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting # 174 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Initial Brief due by 10/27/2010. Reply brief will be due 21 days after filing of initial brief. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/13/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
October 12, 2010 Filing 174 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time for submission of supplemental briefing requested by Court during September 8, 2010 hearing by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants(Leopold, Christopher)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting # 172 unopposed motion for extension of time. Discovery deadline 4/29/2011. Dispositive motion deadline 2/3/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 236 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Jury Trial set for 8/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 408 (EFM) before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/4/2010. (ah)
October 1, 2010 Filing 172 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time of Deadlines by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lucas, Christopher)
October 1, 2010 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time for Deadlines by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(Lucas, Christopher)
September 27, 2010 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Faye P. Abbott, Judith R. Adams, Lois J. Ainley, Lois J. Ainsley, Robert D. Aldridge, James L. Alford, Johnny W. Allen, Mary S. Allen, Thomas G. Allgood, Jr, Evelyn A. Alligood, Henry W. Ammons, Anzilia K. Anderson, Clara W.L. Anderson, Mary Ellen Anderson, Donald E. Armstrong, Howard D. Armstrong, James E. Armstrong, Michael L. Atkinson, Charles E. Autry, Dwight C. Autry, James L. Autry, Lila H. Autry, W. J. Avent, Effie H. Avery, Janie B. Ayers, George W. Bailey, Johnny Preston Baker, Joseph K. Baker, Lough Massey Baker, Mary Harrell Baker, Ophelia H. Baker, Rufus James Baker, Shelby M. Baker, William A. Baker, Clifford E. Ball, Naomi M. Ball, Thomas V. Barden, Katie Cook Barnes, Sue Barnes, Thomas Scott Barnes, Willie E. Barnes, Judith W. Basnight, Gerald Bass, Verona W. Bass, Carolyn J. Batchelor, Verona W. Bath, Frances L. Batts, Gerald C. Batts, Mary P. Batts, Madeline B. Beach, Carl Beacham, Jr, Linda C. Beaman, Noah Alfred Beamon, Jenette C. Bell, V. Allen Bender, III, John O. Benson, Peggy J. Biggs, Ronnie Bill, L.S. Blades, III, Essie L. Blalock, Curtis W. Bland, Wynona H. Blount, Mel Steven Bobbitt, Johnny D. Bordeaux, Ann L. Boyette, Geraldine E. Boyette, Jack H. Boyette, Mary B. Boykin, Joyce C. Bracy, Marian E. Bracy, Claude Braddy, Jr, Janice C. Braddy, Thelma Robbins Braddy, Steven P. Bradley, Jean T. Bradshaw, Edward R. Brady, Mary Ann Brame, Charles M. Bratcher, Josephine S. Bratcher, Linda G. Brewer, James Woodie Britt, Mary E. Britton, Audrey A. Brown, Carol J. Brown, Eddie R. Brown, Graham T. Brown, Henry W. Brown, Janice Brown, William P. Brown, Gordon D. Brunson, Roberta H. Brunson, Marie W. Bucknam, Betsy Bullock, Geneva E. Bullock, Geneya Bullock, Mattie J. Bullock, Patricia W. Bunch, Tony A. Bunch, Carol S. Burchette, John Lee Burgess, James F. Burnette, Ethel A. Burns, Clayton O. Burriss, Jr, Diamond H. Butler, Dorothy G. Butler, Franklin D. Butler, Robert C. Byrd, Ruth M. Cagle, Bertha S. Campbell, Shirley G. Canady, Kerry W. Carawan, Daniel H. Carlisle, Stanton R. Carnes, Alice B. Carpenter, Betty A. Carpenter, Kenneth A. Carpenter, Milton R. Carpenter, Betty M. Carr, Dolores P. Carraway, Linda K. Carroll, Lucille H. Carta, Bernard John Carter, Jr, Carl Ray Carter, Melvin S. Carter, Lois Ann Carver, Bobby B. Cashwell, Glenn M. Causway, John W. Cherry, Betty W. Chesson, Linda W. Chesson, Eileen L. Childers, Ann P. Chipps, Daisy A. Clark, Donald E. Clark, Donald R. Clark, Robert L. Clegg, Shirley W. Cleland, Cullen Cobb, Jr, Earl G. Coble, James C. Cofield, Josie D. Cofield, Annie M. Coggins, Colleen H. Coker, Naomi M. Coker, Alvin L. Coley, Linda C. Coley, Raymond A. Collins, Victoria C. Collins, Joyce L. Connor, Nancy D. Cook, Carl T. Cooley, William H. Cooley, Ann G. Cooper, Callie L. Cooper, Charles W. Cooper, Edward G. Corey, James H. Council, Dolley E. Cox, Walter L. Cratch, John W. Craver, Henry E. Creel, Arvey O. Crocker, Jr, Shelby A. Croom, Marshall W. Crumpler, Melvin D. Crumpler, Nancy R. Curtis, Harold B. Cutler, Jack E. Cutler, Vernon R. Dail, Ada F. Daniel, Dorsey Daniel, Terry F. Daniels, Ulyss Glenn Daughtridge, Belva J. Davenport, Shelby F. Davenport, Billy E. Davidson, Helen I. Davis, Hinton Carlton Davis, Lesly B. Davis, Robert I. Davis, Selma W. Davis, Vivian W. Davis, Jack D. Dawson, Betty W. Deal, Walter F. Deal, Janis S. Dempster, Betty Jean Dennie, Bobby C. Dennie, Marcelene D. Denny, Richard H. Denton, Grace J. Devane, Edward M. Dickens, Margaret S. Dildy, Timothy Dillon, Charles T. Dorman, Paul D. Dorman, Willie Dorman, Gordon H. Doughtie, Lena W. Doughtie, Martha M. Douglas, Isabel Downing, Eugene F. Dozier, William P. Duckett, Jr, William F. Dugger, George F. Duke, Julia J. Duke, Bobby E. Dunn, Lois W. Dunn, Robert W. Duvall, Dolly O. Eastwood, Billy Y. Edgerton, Bobby Ray Edmondson, Amy T. Edwards, Finley C. Edwards, W. Thomas Edwards, Mary Eldridge, Mildred T. Elks, Eva Kaye G. Ellington, Christine K. Ellis, Larry T. Ellis, Louis E. Ellis, Lucille B. Ellis, Michael L. Ellis, William E. Elmore, Betty Elmore-Stancill, Selby A. Etheridge, Jr, Carolyn R. Evans, Kermit M. Evans, Tony W. Evans, Vonita H. Evans, Jeannette M. Ezzell, Jenell B. Ezzell, John D. Ezzelle, Mavis E. Faircloth, Olivia B. Farrell, Michael E. Ferrell, Preston L. Fields, Charles W. Fisher, Leslie B. Fisher, Ruth F. Fisher, Janie G. Fleming, Donna S. Fling, Dianne K. Flint, Bertha S. Floyd, Floyd L. Flythe, Linda L. Flythe, Clarence G. Forbes, Marilyn B. Forbes, Martha S. Foster, Barbara Franks, William R. Frazier, Judy S. Freeman, William Douglas Fulghum, I. Gerald Futrell, William Games, Elizabeth H. Gardner, Linda A. Garrett, Robert L. Garrett, Margie A. Garris, Deidrick H. Gaskill, Donald P. Gaskins, Linda H. Gaskins, Herbert L. Gay, Willie R. Gay, William A. Gilbert, Willie E. Godwin, Jerry S. Gore, Lillie B. Grady, Priscilla T. Granger, Jane T. Grantham, Hilda B. Gray, Grover L. Griffin, Alton C. Grissom, Rosalyn S. Guirkins, Charlie J. Gurganus, Van A. Gurkins, Brenda B. Hairr, Junie Mack Hairr, John O. Hall, Jimmy C. Hamilton, Betty F. Hamm, Joel F. Hancock, James E. Haney, Robert Alton Hanford, Frances H. Hardee, Linda P. Hardee, Kenneth R. Harrell, Linda H. Harrell, Loretta F. Harrell, Melvin R. Harrell, John Harrington, Alice W. Harris, Donnie P. Harris, Doris C. Harris, Elizabeth R. Harris, Jimmy L. Harris, Sr, Barbara J. Harrison, Norma H. Harrison, Jonathan F. Havens, Shelby B. Heath, David R. Hemby, Shirley G. Henderson, Bennie Herman, Jr, Hoytte Douglas Herrin, Wilton L. Herring, Lindsey W. Hewitt, Charles D. Hinson, Ruby M. Hinton, Bobby R. Hobgood, Lindbergh Holden, Christine M. Holland, Eugene R. Holland, Julia H. Holland, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Nancy L. Hollis, Murrell T. Hollman, Jane F. Holloman, Roger L. Holt, Rebecca F. Hooker, Rosby R. Hopkins, William H. Hopkins, Willie C. Hopkins, Dennis Horchler, Jeannette Faye Horne, Carolyn M. Horton, Clarence S. Hough, Annette A. House, Chester B. Houston, Stacy J. Houston, Heywood B. Houtz, Maryland Y. Howard, Marvin Howell, Katherine H. Howse, Dorothy E. Hudson, S. J. Humienny, Sr, James S. Ikner, Estella Ipock, George L. Ipock, Lewis R. Irvin, Charles E. Isles, Patricia D. Jackson, Paul A. Jackson, Raymond L. Jackson, William Franklin Jackson, Johnnie E. James, Joyce S. Jefferson, William W. Jefferson, Donald S. Jenkins, James Kenneth Johnson, John Charles Johnson, Lillie M. Johnson, Marcus W. Johnson, Ralph A. Johnson, Ralph L. Johnson, Jr, Bobby D. Jolly, Alice R. Jones, Aubrey D. Jones, John C. Jones, Kathy Beach Jones, Leona A. Jones, Peter H. Jones, Shirley L. Jones, Willie J. Jones, Norma C. Josey, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Dolly J. Joyner, Doris L. Joyner, Dorothy B. Joyner, Wilbur Glenn Joyner, Nancy R. Justice, Charles J. Kearney, Martha H. Keen, W. E. Kelchner, Donald G. Kennedy, Walter L. Kennedy, J. J. Killebrew, Eleanor S. King, Irma E. King, Robert E. King, Thelma V. King, William Mack King, William B. King, Bruce R. Kirkwood, Lorraine E. Kirkwood, Wesley G. Knott, Charles Ray Knowles, Miriam S. Kricko, Thelma W. Lafferty, Bobby L. Lamm, Martha C. Lamm, William E. Lamm, Dennis R. Lane, Ernestine C. Langley, James D. Langley, Violet H. Lanier, William A. Larrimore, Frances W. Latham, Kenneth Lee, Milton E. Lee, Patricia B. Lee, Rosyln A. Lefevers, Billy M. Leggett, Sherrie B. Leggett, Patricia C. Letchworth, Betty D. Lewis, Brenda B. Lewis, Leo N. Lewis, Sandra B. Lewis, Sybil Rowe Lewis, Sylvia B. Lewis, Polly C. Lilley, Shelby M. Lilley, Norma Midyette Lindsey, Geraldine Little, B. G. Littleton, Thomas E. Littleton, Gerald T. Lockamy, Alice D. Long, Betty B. Long, Clara M. Long, Elsie O. Long, Rachel G. Lovick, Faye M. Lucas, Jaye M. Lucas, Terry T. Lucas, Joyce C. Mahan, George P. Maier, Donald H. Mallard, Randall G. Mallard, Shirley B. Malpass, Mamie R. Manning, Lucy O. Mantas, Joyce A. Marshburn, Joe E. Martin, Clarence L. Mason, Helen C. Massey, Rose D. Matthews, Ruth H. Matthews, John T. May, Kenneth S. May, Mary H. Maynard, James P. Mayo, Mickey R. McAdams, Naomi B. McBride, Roy E. McCarter, William Troy McCarter, David L. McCaskill, Mae Vonne McClure, Alice R. McCorquodale, Clifford C. McCullough, Donna H. McCullough, Roderick A. McGlohon, Daniel B. McLamb, Nellie O. McLamb, Eunice Stephens McLaurin, Laudie Colon McLaurin, Hilda A. McLawhorn, Weldon E. McLawhorn, Neal C. McLeod, Jr, Rachel C. McManus, Rodney M. Medlin, Linda L. Meeks, Margaret Ann Meeks, William Ann Meeks, Ennis W. Mercer, Carlton V. Metts, James Truitt Miller, Jeanette Y. Miller, Leon Gene Miller, Mary M. Miller, Darling David Mills, Virginia R. Minton, Ethel D. Mitchel, Dorothy R. Moore, George Moore, Jr, James H. Moore, Jane T. Moore, Jesse C. Moore, John Thomas Moore, Lemuel K. Moore, Marland G. Moore, Barbara P. Mooring, William C. Morris, Evelyn F. Morrow, Patricia B. Morrow, Nancy J. Moseley, Norman Carlton Moseley, Gloria P. Mosley, Ernest Mozingo, Emma Frances Nanney, Mary D. Narron, Charlie G. Neal, Claude T. Neal, Dianne S. Neal, Eleanor Nelms, Lonnie R. Nelms, Peggy S. Nelson, Troy W. Nelson, June W. Newberry, Evelyn W. Nicholson, Janie P. Nicholson, Hazel M. Nixo, Ramona S. Norman, Kay W. Norville, Robert L. Norville, Sr, Gregory Nunnery, Grace O'Geary, Jacqueline L. O'Neal, Joseph W. Odom, Braxton S. Oliver, Herbert W. Oliver, Thomas M. Oliver, Michael D. Outlaw, Barbara B. Overby, Charles G. Overby, Evelyn C. Overby, Frances K. Overton, John W. Overton, Joyce Y. Owens, George C. Pace, Joyce E. Pace, Jimmy L. Packard, Charles E. Page, Lynwood V. Page, Albert B. Parker, Allen R. Parker, Bobby F. Parrish, Doris J. Patterson, Willis R. Peaden, Jewell H. Pearsall, Luther D. Pearsall, Sr, Ethel J. Peedin, Lucille Peele, David B. Pepper, Theodore B. Perritt, Linda P. Perry, Robert L. Perry, Albert Ray Phelps, Violet W. Phillips, Faye E. Phykitt, Brenda S. Pilgreen, Alice R. Pitt, Charles G. Pittman, Curtis C. Pittman, Kenneth N. Pollock, Harold D. Pope, Margie L. Pope, Marshall B. Pope, Mary B. Pope, Iris E. Powell, Larry Powell, Catherine R. Powers, Joyce P. Powers, Bobby F. Price, Joseph Earl Price, Retha A. Price, Shelby F. Pridgen, Grace N. Proctor, Cathy C. Pruitt, Sidney H. Purvis, Barbara B. Rackley, Francis Dalton Rackley, Gene D.
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting # 166 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing. Deadline is extended to 10/13/2010. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/24/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
September 24, 2010 Filing 168 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson (jlh)
September 24, 2010 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held September 8, 2010 before Judge Eric Melgren, Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson, Telephone number 316-315-4334. Transcript purchased by: Mark Hinderks. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2010. (jlh)
September 23, 2010 Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file supplemental briefing requested by the Court during the September 8 hearing by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants(Leopold, Christopher)
September 8, 2010 Filing 165 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: MOTION HEARING held on 9/8/2010 re # 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action filed by William Douglas Fulghum, # 127 MOTION to Certify Class filed by William Douglas Fulghum. (Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
September 7, 2010 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action , # 127 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(O'Connell, Mary)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting # 162 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Law. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/3/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
September 2, 2010 Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motions for Class Action and Collective Certification and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Memorandum of Law, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Memorandum of Law, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Supplemental Memorandum of Law)(O'Connell, Mary)
August 9, 2010 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 3d Requests for Production by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Leopold, Christopher)
August 6, 2010 Filing 160 ANSWER to # 117 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Third by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting # 158 Motion to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs John Lee Burgess, Curtis C. Pittman, and William F. Dugger without prejudice; granting # 158 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Answer re # 117 Amended Complaint. Deadline is 8/6/2010. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/6/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
August 2, 2010 Filing 158 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs John Lee Burgess, Curtis C. Pittman, and William F. Dugger without prejudice and to remove them from consideration as class representatives ( Response deadline 8/23/2010), Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re # 117 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, until August 6, 2010 ( Response deadline 8/16/2010) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leopold, Christopher)
July 28, 2010 Filing 157 NOTICE OF HEARING: In Court Hearing set for 9/8/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 440 (KC)before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. See # 156 Memorandum and Order for details.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER taking under advisement # 127 Motion to Certify Class; taking under advisement # 129 Motion to Certify Collective Action. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/28/2010. (cm)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying # 109 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/2/2010. (cm)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting # 153 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Victoria Lindel Gorokhovich is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behhalf of Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/11/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
June 10, 2010 Filing 153 MOTION for attorney Victoria Lindel Gorokhovich to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1773990.) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Victoria Gorokhovich, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(O'Bleness, Brian)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting # 151 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Justin O. Reliford is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/10/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
June 9, 2010 Filing 151 MOTION for attorney Justin O. Reliford to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1772485.) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Justin O. Reliford, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(O'Bleness, Brian)
May 28, 2010 Filing 150 NOTICE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants of taking deposition (Leopold, Christopher)
May 18, 2010 Filing 149 NOTICE by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants of taking deposition (Leopold, Christopher)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting # 147 joint motion for extension of time for defendants to file a motion to compel and for a THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for new deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/18/2010. (RA)
May 14, 2010 Filing 147 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order, Joint MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel ( Response deadline 5/28/2010) by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Proposed Dates)(Leopold, Christopher)
April 1, 2010 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Defendants' Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (O'Bleness, Brian)
February 26, 2010 Filing 145 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian K. O'Bleness on behalf of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (O'Bleness, Brian)
February 26, 2010 Filing 144 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2010. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/26/2010.(kg)
February 25, 2010 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action (O'Connell, Mary)
February 25, 2010 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 127 MOTION to Certify Class (O'Connell, Mary)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER finding as moot # 138 Motion for Leave to File; granting # 139 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/24/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
February 23, 2010 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Plaintiffs' Reply Memoranda Out of Time by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Action Certification, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Approval of a Collective Action)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 23, 2010 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Plaintiffs' Reply Memoranda Out of Time by Plaintiffs . (Nygaard, Diane) (Modified on 2/23/2010. (mg))
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: Pursuant to D.Kan.Rule 6.1(d), a reply must be filed within 14 days of the service of the response. If a reply is not filed within that time, Pursuant to D.Kan.Rule 15.1, the party must first seek leave of the Court prior to filing, attaching a copy of the proposed pleading or other document, which Plaintiffs failed to do. Accordingly, because Plaintiffs' replies re: # 135 and # 136 were filed out of time and without leave of the Court, they are STRIKEN from the record. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/22/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
February 19, 2010 Filing 136 STRIKEN PER 2/22/10 ORDER. REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action (O'Connell, Mary) Modified on 2/22/2010 to add text (alm).
February 19, 2010 Filing 135 STRIKEN PER 2/22/10 ORDER. REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 127 MOTION to Certify Class (O'Connell, Mary) Modified on 2/22/2010 to add text (alm).
February 18, 2010 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to All Named Putative Class and Sub-Class Representatives by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Hecht, Scott)
February 10, 2010 Filing 133 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT REPLACEMENT by Deputy Clerk regarding # 132 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. The originally filed Memorandum in Opposition contained several typographical errors. The corrected document has been attached to docket entry # 132 , and is also attached to this notice for the purpose of electronic notification. Contact the Clerk's Office with questions. (mg)
February 2, 2010 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 127 MOTION to Certify Class (Leopold, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2010: # 1 Corrected Memorandum in Opposition) (mg).
February 2, 2010 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re # 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leopold, Christopher)
January 19, 2010 Filing 130 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(O'Connell, Mary)
January 19, 2010 Filing 129 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
January 19, 2010 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 127 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(O'Connell, Mary)
January 19, 2010 Filing 127 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting # 125 joint motion to amend the scheduling order and AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/6/2010. (RA)
January 5, 2010 Filing 125 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hecht, Scott)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER finding as moot # 55 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot # 57 Motion to Certify. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/29/2009. (cm)
December 23, 2009 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants re: # 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Hecht, Scott)
November 30, 2009 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(O'Connell, Mary)
November 30, 2009 Filing 121 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (O'Connell, Mary)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting # 99 motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/24/2009. (RA)
November 23, 2009 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents on Plaintiffs Wanda W. Shipley, William F. Dugger, Carl W. Somdahl, Betty A. Carpenter and Kenneth Carpenter by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Hecht, Scott)
November 20, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE of Change of Address by Diane A. Nygaard (Nygaard, Diane)
November 12, 2009 Filing 117 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Embarq Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Employee Benefits Committee of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, filed by Faye P. Abbott, Judith R. Adams, Lois J. Ainley, Lois J. Ainsely, Robert D. Aldridge, James J. Alford, Johnny W. Allen, Mary S. Allen, Thomas G. Allgood, Jr, Evelyn A. Alligood, Anzilia K. Anderson, Clara W.L. Anderson, Mary Ellen Anderson, James E. Armonstrong, Donald E. Armstrong, Howard D. Armstrong, Michael L. Atkinson, Charles E. Autry, Dwight C. Autry, James L. Autry, Lila H. Autry, W. J. Avent, Effie H. Avery, Janie B. Ayers, George W. Bailey, Johnny Preston Baker, Joseph K. Baker, Lough Massey Baker, Mary Harrell Baker, Ophelia H. Baker, Rufus James Baker, Shelby M. Baker, William A. Baker, Clifford E. Ball, Naomi M. Ball, Thomas V. Barden, Katie Cook Barnes, Sue Barnes, Thomas Scott Barnes, Willie E. Barnes, Judith W. Basnight, Gerald Bass, Carolyn J. Batchelor, Verona W. Bath, Francis L. Batts, Gerald C. Batts, Mary P. Batts, Madeline B. Beach, Carl Beacham, Jr, Linda Beaman, Jenette C. Bell, V. Allen Bender, III, John O. Benson, Peggy J. Biggs, Ronnie Bill, L. S. Blades, Essie L. Blalock, Curtis W. Bland, Wynona H. Blount, Mel Steven Bobbitt, Johnny D. Bordeaux, Ann L. Boyette, Geraldine E. Boyette, Jack H. Boyette, Mary B. Boykin, Joyce C. Bracy, Marian E. Bracy, Claude Braddy, Jr, Janice C. Braddy, Thelma Robbins Braddy, Steven P. Bradley, Jean T. Bradshaw, Edward R. Brady, Mary Ann Brame, Charles M. Bratcher, Josephine S. Bratcher, Linda G. Brewer, James Woodie Britt, Mary E. Britton, Audrey A. Brown, Carol J. Brown, Eddie R. Brown, Graham T. Brown, Henry W. Brown, Janice Brown, William P. Brown, Gordon D. Brunson, Roberta H. Brunson, Marie W. Bucknam, Betsy Bullock, Geneva E. Bullock, Geneya Bullock, Mattie J. Bullock, Patricia W. Bunch, Tony A. Bunch, Carol S. Burchette, John Lee Burgess, James F. Burnette, Ethel A. Burns, Clayton Burriss, Jr, Diamond H. Butler, Dorothy G. Butler, Franklin D. Butler, Robert C. Byrd, Ruth M. Cagle, Bertha S. Campbell, Shirley G. Canady, Daniel H. Carlisle, Stanton R. Carnes, Alice B. Carpenter, Betty A. Carpenter, Kenneth A. Carpenter, Betty M. Carr, Dolores P. Carraway, Linda K. Carroll, Lucille H. Carta, Bernard John Carter, Jr, Melvin S. Carter, Lois Ann Carver, Bobby B. Cashwell, Glenn M. Causway, John Cherry, Betty W. Chesson, Linda W. Chesson, Eileen L. Childers, Ann P. Chipps, Daisy A. Clark, Donald E. Clark, Donald R. Clark, Robert L. Clegg, Shirley W. Cleland, Cullen Cobb, Jr, Earl G. Coble, James C. Cofield, Josie D. Cofield, Annie M. Coggins, Colleen H. Coker, Naomi M. Coker, Alvin L. Coley, Linda C. Coley, Raymond A. Collins, Victoria C. Collins, Joyce L. Connor, Nancy D. Cook, Carl T. Cooley, William H. Cooley, Callie L. Cooper, Charles W. Cooper, Edward G. Corey, James H. Council, Dolley E. Cox, Walter L. Cratch, John W. Craver, Henry E. Creel, Arvey O. Crocker, Jr, Shelfy A. Croom, Marshall W. Crumpler, Melvin D. Crumpler, Nancy R. Curtis, Harold B. Cutler, Jack E. Cutler, Vernon R. Dail, Ada F. Daniel, Dorsey Daniel, Terry F. Daniels, Ulyss Glenn Daughtridge, Belva J. Davenport, Shelby F. Davenport, Billy E. Davidson, Helen I. Davis, Hinton Carlton Davis, Lesly B. Davis, Robert I. Davis, Selma W. Davis, Vivian W. Davis, Jack D. Dawson, Betty W. Deal, Walter F. Deal, Janis S. Dempster, Betty Jean Dennie, Bobby C. Dennie, Marcelene D. Denny, Richard H. Denton, Grace J. Devane, Edward M. Dickens, Margaret S. Dildy, Timothy Dillon, Charles T. Dorman, Paul D. Dorman, Willie Dorman, Gordon H. Doughtie, Lena W. Doughtie, Martha M. Douglas, Isabel Downing, Eugene F. Dozier, William P. Duckett, Jr, William F. Dugger, George F. Duke, Julia J. Duke, Bobby E. Dunn, Lois W. Dunn, Robert W. Duvall, Dolly O. Eastwood, Billy Y. Edgerton, Bobby Ray Edmondson, Amy T. Edwards, C. Finley Edwards, W. Thomas Edwards, Mary Eldridge, Mildred T. Elks, Eva Kaye G. Ellington, Christine K. Ellis, Louis E. Ellis, Lucille B. Ellis, Michael L. Ellis, William E. Elmore, Betty Elmore-Stancill, Estate of Henry W. Ammons, Estate of Milton R. Carpenter, Selby A. Etheridge, Jr, Carolyn R. Evans, Kermit M. Evans, Tony W. Evans, Vonita H. Evans, Jeannette M. Ezzell, Jenell B. Ezzell, John D. Ezzelle, Mavis Earlene Faircloth, Mavis E. Faircloth, Olivia B. Farrell, Michael E. Ferrell, Preston L. Fields, Charles W. Fisher, Leslie B. Fisher, Ruth F. Fisher, Janie G. Fleming, Donna S. Fling, Dianne K. Flint, Bertha S. Floyd, Floyd L. Flythe, Clarence G. Forbes, Marilyn B. Forbes, Martha S. Foster, Barbara Franks, William R. Frazier, Judy S. Freeman, William Douglas Fulghum, Gerald I. Futrell, William Games, Elizabeth H. Gardner, Linda A. Garrett, Robert L. Garrett, Margie A. Garris, Deidrick H. Gaskill, Donald P. Gaskins, Linda H. Gaskins, Herbert L. Gay, Willie R. Gay, William A. Gilbert, Willie E. Godwin, Jerry S. Gore, Lillie B. Grady, Priscilla T. Granger, Jane T. Grantham, Hilda B. Gray, Grover L. Griffin, Alton C. Grissom, Rosalyn S. Guirkins, Charlie J. Gurganus, Van A. Gurkins, Brenda B. Hairr, Junie Mack Hairr, John O. Hall, Jimmy C. Hamilton, Betty F. Hamm, Joel F. Hancock, James E. Haney, Robert Alton Hanford, Francis H. Hardee, Linda P. Hardee, Kenneth R. Harrell, Linda H. Harrell, Loretta F. Harrell, Melvin R. Harrell, John Harrington, Alice W. Harris, Donnie P. Harris, Doris C. Harris, Elizabeth R. Harris, Jimmy L. Harris, Sr, Barbara J. Harrison, Norma H. Harrison, Jonathan F. Havens, Shelby B. Heath, David R. Hemby, Shirley G. Henderson, Bennie Herman, Jr, Hoytte Douglas Herrin, Wilton L. Herring, Lindsey W. Hewitt, Charles D. Hinson, Ruby Hinton, Bobby R. Hobgood, Lindbergh Holden, Christine M. Holland, Eugene R. Holland, Julia H. Holland, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Nancy L. Hollis, Murrell T. Hollman, Jane F. Holloman, Roger L. Holt, Rebecca F. Hooker, Rosby R. Hopkins, William H. Hopkins, Willie C. Hopkins, Dennis Horchler, Jeanette Faye Horne, Carolyn M. Horton, Clarence S. Hough, Annette A. House, Chester B. Houston, Stacy J. Houston, Heywood B. Houtz, Maryland Y. Howard, Marvin Howell, Katherine H. Howse, Dorothy E. Hudson, S. J. Humienny, Sr, James S. Ikner, Estella Ipock, George L. Ipock, Lewis R. Irvin, Charles E. Isles, Patricia D. Jackson, Paul A. Jackson, Raymond L. Jackson, William Franklin Jackson, Johnnie E. James, Joyce S. Jefferson, William W. Jefferson, Donald S. Jenkins, James Kenneth Johnson, John Charles Johnson, Lillie M. Johnson, Marcus W. Johnson, Ralph L. Johnson, Jr, Bobby D. Jolly, Alice R. Jones, Aubrey D. Jones, John C. Jones, Kathy B. Jones, Leona A. Jones, Peter H. Jones, Shirley L. Jones, Willie J. Jones, Norma C. Josey, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Dolly J. Joyner, Doris L. Joyner, Dorothy B. Joyner, Wilbur Glenn Joyner, Nancy R. Justice, Charles J. Kearney, Martha H. Keen, W. E. Kelchner, Donald G. Kennedy, Walter L. Kennedy, J. J. Killebrew, Eleanor S. King, Irma E. King, Robert E. King, Thelma V. King, William Mack King, William B. King, Bruce R. Kirkwood, Lorraine E. Kirkwood, Wesley G. Knott, Charles Ray Knowles, Miriam S. Kricko, Thelma W. Lafferty, Bobby L. Lamm, Martha C. Lamm, William E. Lamm, Dennis R. Lane, Ernestine Langley, James D. Langley, Violet Lanier, William A. Larrimore, Frances W. Latham, Kenneth Lee, Milton E. Lee, Patricia B. Lee, Rosyln A. Lefevers, Billy M. Leggett, Sherrie B. Leggett, Patricia C. Letchworth, Betty D. Lewis, Brenda B. Lewis, Leo N. Lewis, Sandra B. Lewis, Sybil Rowe Lewis, Sylvia B. Lewis, Polly C. Lilley, Shelby M. Lilley, Norma Midyette Lindsey, Geraldine Little, B. G. Littleton, Thomas E. Littleton, Gerald T. Lockamy, Alice D. Long, Betty B. Long, Clara M. Long, Elsie O. Long, Rachel G. Lovick, Faye M. Lucas, Jaye M. Lucas, Terry T. Lucas, Joyce C. Mahan, George P. Maier, Donald H. Mallard, Randall G. Mallard, Shirley B. Malpass, Mamie R. Manning, Lucy O. Mantas, Joyce A. Marshburn, Joe E. Martin, Clarence L. Mason, Helen C. Massey, Ruth H. Matthew, Rose D. Matthews, John T. May, Kenneth S. May, Mary H. Maynard, James P. Mayo, Mickey R. McAdams, Naomi B. McBride, Roy E. McCarter, William Troy McCarter, David L. McCaskill, Mae Vonne McClure, Alice R. McCorquodale, Clifford C. McCullough, Donna H. McCullough, Roderick A. McGlohon, Daniel B. McLamb, Nellie O. McLamb, Eunice Stephens McLaurin, Laudie Colon McLaurin, Hilda A. McLawhorn, Weldon E. McLawhorn, Neal C. McLeod, Jr, Rachel C. McManus, Rodney M. Medlin, Linda L. Meeks, Margaret Ann Meeks, William Ann Meeks, Ennis W. Mercer, Carlton V. Metts, James Truett Miller, Jeanette Y. Miller, Leon Gene Miller, Mary M. Miller, David Darling Mills, Virginia R. Minton, Ethel D. Mitchel, Dorothy R. Moore, George Moore, Jr, James Herbert Moore, Jane T. Moore, Jesse C. Moore, John Thomas Moore, Lemuel K. Moore, Marland G. Moore, Barbara P. Mooring, Ernest Moringo, William C. Morris, Evelyn F. Morrow, Patricia B. Morrow, Nancy J. Moseley, Norman Carlton Moseley, Gloria P. Mosley, Emma Frances Nanney, Mary D. Narron, Charlie G. Neal, Claude T. Neal, Dianne S. Neal, Eleanor B. Nelms, Lonnie R. Nelms, Troy W. Nelson, June W. Newberry, Evelyn W. Nicholson, Janie Peaks Nicholson, Hazel M. Nixon, Ramona S. Norman, Kay W. Norville, Robert L. Norville, Sr, Gregory Nunnery, Grace P. O'Geary, Jacqueline L. O'Neal, Joseph Wayne Odom, Braxton S. Oliver, Herbert W. Oliver, Thomas M. Oliver, Michael D. Outlaw, Barbara B. Overby, Charles G. Overby, Evelyn C. Overby, Frances K. Overton, Joyce Y. Owens, George C. Pace, Joyce E. Pace, Jimmy L. Packard, Charles E. Page, Lynwood V. Page, Albert B. Parker, Allen R. Parker, Bob
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting # 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re # 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint . Response deadline 11/30/2009 Reply deadline 12/23/2009. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/30/2009. (pat)
October 30, 2009 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants. (Hecht, Scott)
October 30, 2009 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to # 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
October 20, 2009 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 55 MOTION to Certify Class (O'Connell, Mary)
October 20, 2009 Filing 112 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 57 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action Under the Age Discrimination in Employment Act, and for an Order Requiring Defendants to Provide Contact Information for the Potential Members of the Collective Action, and its Assistance in Providing the Notice by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit Attachment 3, # 4 Exhibit Attachment 4)(O'Connell, Mary) (Document title modified on 10/21/2009. (mg))
October 8, 2009 Filing 111 Defendants' Amended ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants.(Leopold, Christopher)
October 8, 2009 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants(Leopold, Christopher)
October 8, 2009 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Management Company, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants(Leopold, Christopher)
September 25, 2009 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Sue Barnes, James Britt, Betsy Bullock, John Burgess, Ronald Clark, Dorsey Daniel, Timothy Dillon, Willie Dorman, William Douglas Fulghum, William Games, Douglas Hollingsworth, Calvin Bryce Joyner, Robert E. King, Laudie McLaurie, Curtis Pittman by Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker. (Hecht, Scott)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion to amend complaint # 76 and denying plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file amendments to complaint # 96 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/24/2009. (RA)
September 22, 2009 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker re # 55 MOTION to Certify Class, # 57 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action (Leopold, Christopher)
August 25, 2009 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 99 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(O'Connell, Mary)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying # 62 Defendants' Expedited Motion to Defer Class Action Proceedings; denying # 67 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting # 78 Plaintiffs' Rule 56(f)Motion to Deny or Continue Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendants are directed to file their responses to plaintiffs' pending motions for class action certification and collective action on or before 9/22/2009 and plaintiffs are directed to file their replies on or before 10/20/2009. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/25/2009. (cm)
August 11, 2009 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker re # 99 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Walsh, # 2 Exhibit A toWalsh Decl: Important News, # 3 Exhibit B to Walsh Decl: Utility Filing, part 1, # 4 Exhibit B to Walsh Decl: Utility Filing, part 2, # 5 Exhibit B to Walsh Decl: Utility Filing, part 3)(Leopold, Christopher)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting # 101 unopposed motion for an extension of time until 8/11/2009 for defendants to file a response to the motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/11/2009.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
August 10, 2009 Filing 101 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to # 99 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker(Leopold, Christopher)
July 27, 2009 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 99 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stewart W. Fisher in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, # 2 Exhibit A to Fisher Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Fisher Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Fisher Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Fisher Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Fisher Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Fisher Decl.)(O'Connell, Mary)
July 27, 2009 Filing 99 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
July 27, 2009 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 96 MOTION for extension of time of Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Amendments to their Complaint (O'Connell, Mary)
July 14, 2009 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker re # 96 MOTION for extension of time of Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Amendments to their Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James P. Walsh, Jr. and Exhibits)(Leopold, Christopher)
June 30, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION for extension of time of Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Amendments to their Complaint by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting the joint motion of the parties # 94 for an extension of time to July 30, 2009 for plaintiffs to file any motion to compel relating to defendants' objections and responses to plaintiffs' first request for production of documents and defendants' objections and responses to plaintiffs' first set of interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/30/09. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
June 30, 2009 Filing 94 Joint MOTION for extension of time of Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
June 18, 2009 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 76 MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 42 Amended Complaint to Designate Additional Class Representatives, Substitute One Class Representative, and Correct Misnomer of Certain Plaintiffs MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 42 Amended Complaint to Designate Additional Class Representatives, Substitute One Class Representative, and Correct Misnomer of Certain Plaintiffs (O'Connell, Mary)
June 18, 2009 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re: # 78 MOTION to Continue or Deny Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(O'Connell, Mary)
May 29, 2009 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker re: # 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint (Leopold, Christopher)
May 29, 2009 Filing 90 RESPONSE by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker re # 78 MOTION to Continue or Deny Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) (Leopold, Christopher)
May 29, 2009 Filing 89 RESPONSE by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker re # 76 MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 42 Amended Complaint to Designate Additional Class Representatives, Substitute One Class Representative, and Correct Misnomer of Certain Plaintiffs MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 42 Amended Complaint to Designate Additional Class Representatives, Substitute One Class Representative, and Correct Misnomer of Certain Plaintiffs (Leopold, Christopher)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting # 87 the parties' joint motion for extensions of briefing deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/7/09. (ct)
May 6, 2009 Filing 87 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Adjust Briefing Schedule by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker(Hecht, Scott)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting the joint motion of the parties # 85 for an extension to June 30, 2009 for plaintiffs to file any motion to compel relating to defendants' objections and responses to plaintiffs' first request for production of documents and defendants' objections and responses to plaintiffs' first set of interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/30/09. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
April 30, 2009 Filing 85 Joint MOTION for extension of time of Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion to Compel by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker(Hecht, Scott)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting # 83 defendants' unopposed motion for extensions of briefing deadlines. See attached order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/20/09. (ct)
April 17, 2009 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time of various briefing deadlines by Defendants Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker(Leopold, Christopher)
April 7, 2009 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Statutory and Regulatory Appendix, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Alan M. Sandals, # 3 Exhibit A Retiree Benefits 2006 Plan Year, # 4 Exhibit B Sprint Retiree Life Insurance, # 5 Exhibit C Retiree Benefits Changes, # 6 Exhibit D-1 Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, # 7 Exhibit D-2 Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents, # 8 Affidavit Affidavit of Todd B. Hilsee, # 9 Exhibit 1 Todd B. Hilsee C.V., # 10 Declaration Declaration of Robert E. King, # 11 Exhibit A Email Message and Response, # 12 Declaration Declaration of Willie Dorman, # 13 Exhibit 1 Summary Annual Report, # 14 Exhibit 2 Willie J. Dorman Benefits Calculations, # 15 Exhibit 3 Embarq Benefits Department Correspondence)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 7, 2009 Filing 81 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint (O'Connell, Mary)
April 7, 2009 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 78 MOTION to Continue or Deny Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
April 7, 2009 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Alan M. Sandals in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Deny or Continue Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re # 78 MOTION to Continue or Deny Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
April 7, 2009 Filing 78 MOTION to Continue or Deny Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
April 7, 2009 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 76 MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 42 Amended Complaint to Designate Additional Class Representatives, Substitute One Class Representative, and Correct Misnomer of Certain Plaintiffs MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 42 Amended Complaint to Designate Additional Class Representatives, Substitute One Class Representative, and Correct Misnomer of Certain Plaintiffs by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(O'Connell, Mary)
April 7, 2009 Filing 76 MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 42 Amended Complaint to Designate Additional Class Representatives, Substitute One Class Representative, and Correct Misnomer of Certain Plaintiffs by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Mary)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting # 73 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. 67]. Response deadline is 4/7/2009. Reply deadline is 5/5/2009. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/1/2009. (cm)
April 1, 2009 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents by Embarq Management Company, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker. (Hecht, Scott)
March 31, 2009 Filing 73 Joint MOTION for extension of time For Briefing On Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs.(O'Connell, Mary) (Modified on 2/23/2010. (mg))
March 13, 2009 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker re: # 62 Expedited MOTION to Defer Class Certification Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(Leopold, Christopher)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting # 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply re # 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint . Response deadline 4/2/2009 Reply deadline 4/30/2009. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/12/09. (cs)
March 12, 2009 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to # 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker(Leopold, Christopher)
March 11, 2009 Filing 69 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker (Leopold, Christopher)
March 2, 2009 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall T. Parker, # 2 Exhibit Index, # 3 Exhibit 1: Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, 5/17/06, # 4 Exhibit 2: United Telecom Retiree Medical Plan, 1/1/90, # 5 Exhibit 3: Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-FlexCare Participants, 12/31/01, # 6 Exhibit 4: United Telecom Retiree Medical Plan SPD, 1/1/91, # 7 Exhibit 5: Sprint Retiree Medical Plan SPD, 1/1/97, # 8 Exhibit 6: Sprint Retiree Medical Plan SPD, 1/1/98, # 9 Exhibit 7: Sprint Retiree Benefits SPD, 1/1/01, # 10 Exhibit 8: Group Medical Insurance Plan SPD, # 11 Exhibit 9: Group Contributory and Non-Contributory Life Insurance Plan SPD, # 12 Exhibit 10: Group Insurance Plan SPD, # 13 Exhibit 11: Group Basic Life and AD&D Benefits SPD, # 14 Exhibit 12: 7/7/05 Sprint EBC Meeting Minutes and Resolution, # 15 Exhibit 13: 7/27/07 Embarq EBC Meeting Minutes and Exhibit)(Hecht, Scott)
March 2, 2009 Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in the Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker(Hecht, Scott)
March 2, 2009 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Intial Disclosures of Defendants by Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker. (Hecht, Scott)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Defendant's response deadlines for # 55 Motion to Certify Class and # 57 Motion to Certify a Collective Action are stayed pending ruling by this Court on # 62 Motion Expedited Motion to Defer Class Certificatiom Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/2/2009.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
February 27, 2009 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
February 27, 2009 Filing 63 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum re # 62 Expedited MOTION to Defer Class Certification Proceedings (Kueser, Jason)
February 24, 2009 Filing 62 MOTION Expedited Motion to Defer Class Certification Proceedings re # 55 MOTION to Certify Class, # 57 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action by Defendants Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker. (Hecht, Scott)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROTECTIVE ORDER: The court finds good cause to enter the parties' proposed protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/23/09.(ct)
February 6, 2009 Filing 60 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: Scheduling Conference held on 2/6/2009. (TEXT ENTRY FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motion deadline 8/31/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Trial set for 3/1/2011 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Eric F. Melgren; estimated trial time 15 days. SEE ORDER FOR ANY ADDITIONAL SCHEDULED DEADINES AND HEARINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/6/2009.(kg)
January 29, 2009 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 57 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kueser, Jason)
January 29, 2009 Filing 57 MOTION to Certify a Collective Action by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(Kueser, Jason)
January 29, 2009 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 55 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Kueser, Jason)
January 29, 2009 Filing 55 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(Kueser, Jason)
January 28, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE OF HEARING: This matter is set for a telephone scheduling conference on February 6, 2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The court will initiate the conference call - contacting the participants as provided on the parties' planning meeting report. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kg)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Ordering granting the joint informal request of the parties for an extension to January 20, 2009 to submit their Rule 26(f) planning meeting report. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/9/09.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mt)
January 9, 2009 Filing 52 Defendants' Amended Answer and Defenses to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to # 42 Amended Complaint by Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Randall T. Parker.(Hecht, Scott)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting the joint motion of the parties # 50 for an extension of time to January 12, 2009 to submit their Rule 26(f) planning meeting report. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/23/08. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
December 23, 2008 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file Rule 26(f) Report by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum(Kueser, Jason)
December 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting the unopposed motion of the defendants # 48 for extensions of time. Defendants are granted until January 9, 2009 to answer the portions of plaintiffs' second amended complaint that were not recently dismissed (see doc. # 45 ). Plaintiffs' deadline to file a motion for class action determination under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 is extended to 20 days following the date defendants file their answers. The court also extends the parties' deadline in the court's May 14, 2008 order # 19 to submit a Rule 26(f) report to December 29, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/13/08. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
December 12, 2008 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re # 42 Amended Complaint by Defendants Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker(Hecht, Scott)
December 11, 2008 Filing 47 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Scott C. Hecht on behalf of Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker (Hecht, Scott)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/2/08.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ls)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER sustaining in part # 17 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses plaintiffs' claims for declaratory relief under ERISA Section 502(a)(3) (part of Count III) and plaintiffs' ADEA claims regarding medical and prescription drug benefits (part of Count IV). All other claims remain in the case. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/2/08. (ag)
October 23, 2008 Filing 44 (DISREGARD: Filed in Error; Orders are filed ONLY by the Court.) STIPULATION and Order by Embarq Corporation. (Hecht, Scott) (Modified on 10/23/2008. (mg))
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 17 and # 42 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/23/2008.(kg)
September 29, 2008 Filing 42 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Kueser, Jason)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting # 39 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/25/2008. (kg)
September 10, 2008 Filing 40 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. (mt)
September 10, 2008 Filing 39 MOTION to Amend Complaint re # 14 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Appendix A - Second Amended Complaint)(Kueser, Jason)
August 29, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE of Consent Form by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
August 29, 2008 RETURN E-mail received re # 38 Notice (Other) addressed to PHV attorney Adele Rapport at adele@rickseymourlaw.net. E-mail is being forwarded to adele_rapport@att.blackberry.net. Noticing turned off as Mailbox is disabled for this recipient. E-mail not resent. This is a text only entry. (bs)
July 30, 2008 Filing 37 NOTICE of Consent Forms by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
July 30, 2008 Filing 36 NOTICE of Consent Form by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
July 9, 2008 Filing 35 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mary C. O'Connell, R. Douglas Gentile, and Amii Castle on behalf of plaintiffs William Douglas Fulghum, et al. (O'Connell, Mary) (Modified on 7/10/2008. (mg))
July 8, 2008 Filing 34 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Lucas on behalf of William Douglas Fulghum. (Lucas, Christopher)
July 8, 2008 Filing 33 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Donald B. Keplinger on behalf of William Douglas Fulghum. (Keplinger, Donald)
June 30, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 30, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE of Consent by William Douglas Fulghum (Kueser, Jason)
June 23, 2008 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 17 MOTION to Dismiss The First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by All Defendents by Defendant Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC(Hinderks, Mark)
May 30, 2008 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Plaintiffs William Douglas Fulghum, et al. re # 17 MOTION to Dismiss The First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint.(Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16)(Kueser, Jason) (Modified on 7/10/2008. (mg))
May 30, 2008 Filing 20 RESPONSE by ALL Plaintiffs' # 17 MOTION to Dismiss The First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Kueser, Jason)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER postponing scheduling conference until after the ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss # 17 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/14/08.(mt)
April 30, 2008 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of # 17 MOTION to Dismiss The First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix)(Hinderks, Mark)
April 30, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss The First, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendants (Hinderks, Mark)
April 30, 2008 Filing 16 ANSWER to # 14 Amended Complaint by defendants.(Hinderks, Mark)
April 30, 2008 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan identifying Embarq Corporation and Sprint Nextel Corporation as corporate parent (Hinderks, Mark)
March 31, 2008 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker, filed by Betsy Bullock, William Douglas Fulghum, Dorsey Daniel, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Willie Dorman, Robert E. King, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes, William Games. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Amended Complaint Appendix A)(Nygaard, Diane)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Several revisions to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure went into effect on December 1, 2007. The revisions, largely technical in nature, are intended to improve style and consistency. Unfortunately, the numbering of several subsections of certain rules changed, including many cited in the December '06 version of the standardized form of final Pretrial Order used throughout the District of Kansas. Effective March 3, 2008, the Court approved a slightly revised standardized form of Pretrial Order. Irrespective of the Pretrial Order form that may have been referenced in the Scheduling Order or previously provided by the Court, the proposed Pretrial Order which is due to be submitted prior to the final pretrial conference in this case must be in the new standardized form, which may be downloaded from the Court's internet website, at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. If you do not have access to the Court's website, please contact Kathy Grant, Judge O'Hara's administrative assistant, at 913-551-6710. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/4/2008.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kg)
March 4, 2008 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Betsy Bullock, William Douglas Fulghum, Dorsey Daniel, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Willie Dorman, Robert E. King, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes, William Games. Embarq Corporation waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Embarq Retiree Medical Plan waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Sprint Nextel Corporation waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Sprint Retiree Medical Plan waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008; Randall T. Parker waiver sent on 2/1/2008, answer due 4/1/2008. (Kueser, Jason)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting # 10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/28/08. (ct)
February 28, 2008 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for extension of time and Stipulation of Counsel by Plaintiff William Douglas Fulghum. (Kueser, Jason)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting # 3 , # 4 , # 5 , # 6 , and # 7 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Stewart W. Fisher, Alan M. Sandals, Adele Rapport, Scott M. Lempert, and Richard T. Seymour are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 02/22/08. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting # 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael L. Banks, Joseph J. Costello, and James P. Walsh, Jr. are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 02/22/08.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
February 22, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Richard T. Seymour to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001141818.) by Plaintiffs Betsy Bullock, William Douglas Fulghum, Dorsey Daniel, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Willie Dorman, Robert E. King, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes, William Games. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 22, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Scott M. Lempert to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001141815.) by Plaintiffs Betsy Bullock, William Douglas Fulghum, Dorsey Daniel, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Willie Dorman, Robert E. King, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes, William Games. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 22, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Adele Rapport to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001141799.) by Plaintiffs Betsy Bullock, William Douglas Fulghum, Dorsey Daniel, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Willie Dorman, Robert E. King, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes, William Games. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 22, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Alan M. Sandals to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001141791.) by Plaintiffs Betsy Bullock, William Douglas Fulghum, Dorsey Daniel, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Willie Dorman, Robert E. King, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes, William Games. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 22, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Stewart W. Fisher to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001141760.) by Plaintiffs Betsy Bullock, William Douglas Fulghum, Dorsey Daniel, John Douglas Hollingsworth, Willie Dorman, Robert E. King, Calvin Bruce Joyner, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes, William Games. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit InSupport of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 ECF Registration Form)(Nygaard, Diane)
February 22, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney Michael L. Banks, Joseph J. Costello and James P. Walsh, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $150, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001141545.) by Defendants Embarq Corporation, Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of Embarq Corporation as Plan Administrator of the Embarq Retiree Medical Plan, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Embarq Mid-Atlantic Management Services Company, Sprint Retiree Medical Plan, Group Health Plan for Certain Retirees and Employees of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Welfare Benefit Plan for Retirees and Non-Flexcare Participants, Sprint Group Life and Long-Term Disability Plans, Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, Group Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent Life Plan for Employees of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Carolina Telephone and TelegraphCompany Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association Sickness Death Benefit Plan, Randall T. Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 affidavit)(Hinderks, Mark)
December 28, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, Kansas, filed by Betsy Bullock, Dorsey Daniel, Willie Dorman, Timothy Dillon, Sue Barnes.(kao)
December 28, 2007 FILING FEE PAID: In the amount of $350.00, receipt number K4631011035. (kao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulghum et al v. Embarq Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye P. Abbott
Represented By: Jason M. Kueser
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith R. Adams
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois J. Ainley
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois J. Ainsley
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Aldridge
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Alford
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny W. Allen
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S. Allen
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G. Allgood, Jr.
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn A. Alligood
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry W. Ammons
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anzilia K. Anderson
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara W.L. Anderson
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Anderson
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Armstrong
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard D. Armstrong
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Armstrong
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Atkinson
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Autry
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight C. Autry
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Autry
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lila H. Autry
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. J. Avent
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Effie H. Avery
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie B. Ayers
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Bailey
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Preston Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph K. Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lough Massey Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Harrell Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ophelia H. Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus James Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby M. Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Baker
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford E. Ball
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi M. Ball
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas V. Barden
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Cook Barnes
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Barnes
Represented By: Jason M. Kueser
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Scott Michael Lempert
Represented By: Stewart W. Fisher
Represented By: Richard T. Seymour
Represented By: Alan M. Sandals
Represented By: Adele Rapport
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Scott Barnes
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie E. Barnes
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith W. Basnight
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Bass
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verona W. Bass
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn J. Batchelor
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verona W. Bath
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances L. Batts
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald C. Batts
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary P. Batts
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline B. Beach
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Beacham, Jr.
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda C. Beaman
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Alfred Beamon
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenette C. Bell
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. Allen Bender, III
Represented By: Diane A. Nygaard
Represented By: Mary C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance