Sibley et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roxie Sibley, Jeanne Noel, Ernesto Bennett, Jamie Williams, Greg St. Julien, Tracie Hernandez, John Jasinski, Jay Richie and Teisha King
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation and Sprint/United Management Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv02063
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 860 ORDER sustaining 856 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims of Eman Fakhori, Bret Larson, RobertGonzales, and Brian Howard, who timely requested exclusion, are dismissed without prejudice. IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that the timely objection of James Williams and the untimely objection of Jerome Daniels are OVERRULED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, and judgmententered consistent with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/20/18. (hw)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 833 Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval Of Adequacy Of Settlement Notice Process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 814 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval Of Settlement, 817 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement, and 831 Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement are sustained. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/1/2018. (as)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 848 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval Of Adequacy Of Settlement Notice Process (Doc. #833) filed May 21, 2018 is SUSTAINED in part. On or before July 27, 2018, plaintiffs shall submit a revised notice of settlement which explains that the settlement web sites provide free access to a list of the class members in each subclass and instructs class members how to access that information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court AMENDS Nunc Pro Tunc Memo randum And Order (Doc. #847) filed July 17, 2018 to conditionally SUSTAIN Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval Of Settlement (Doc. #814) filed March 2, 2017, Plaintiffs' Amended Motion ForPreliminary Approval Of Settlement (Doc. #817 ) filed March 7, 2018 and Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement (Doc. #831) filed May 21, 2018 subject to the Court's approval of the adequacy of the settlement notice process. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/17/18. (hw)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 845 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part 814 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and sustaining in part 817 Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Plaintiffs' requests for a final approval hearing date are OVERR ULED as moot in light of plaintiffs' plan to request a final hearing date when they provide the Court a report on the postcard mailing. Plaintiffs' motions are otherwise conditionally SUSTAINED subject to plaintiffs providing the Court a notice of settlement which complies with Rule 23(c)(3)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED conditionally sustaining 831 Second Supplemental Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Plaintiffs' motion is conditionally sustained subject to plaintiffs providing the Court notice of settlement which complies with Rule 23(c)(3)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P. The parties shall immediately begin the notice plan as described in the Settlement Agreement (Doc. #842-1) filed June 21, 2018. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/28/2018. (ydm)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 844 ORDER sustaining 839 Motion to Certify Class. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Parties' Joint Proposed Amendment To The Pretrial Order (Doc. #841) filed June 18, 2018 is SUSTAINED. The Pretrial Order (Doc. #436) filed March 14, 2013 is amended to include the settlement subclasses defined above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval Of Adequacy Of Settlement Notice Process (Doc. #833) filed May 21, 2018 is SUSTAINED in part. On or beforeWednesday, July 11, 2018, plaintiffs shall submit a revised notice of settlement which meets the requirements set forth in Rule 23(c)(2)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/27/18. (hw)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 836 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER And ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before 6/11/2018, the parties shall file (1) a motion to certify subclasses which alleges how each subclass meets the certification requirements of Rule 23, Fed. R. Civ. P., and defines each subclas s; (2) a joint proposed amendment to the pretrial order which sets forth the claims of the subclasses; (3) a revised settlement agreement which defines the subclasses and identifies the class representatives for each subclass; and (4) a revised notic e of settlement which defines the subclasses, identifies the named class representative for each subclass and includes an explanation that class members who were correctly paid or overpaid will not receive a settlement allocation. Order ( 830 ) filed 5/21/2018 is VACATED. The parties shall show cause why the Court should not enter an order which lifts limitations imposed upon the Technical Advisor and her partners in the Appointment Of Neutral Technical Advisor ( 559 ) filed 10/1/2014 at 6-8. The parties shall respond on or before 6/11/2018. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/4/2018. (mdc)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 829 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part 817 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/9/2018. See Order for additional details. (ydm)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 814 Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement. Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2018. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 4/5/2018. (ydm)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Show Cause Response on or before 2/14/2018. The parties may reply on or before February 19, 2018. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 2/6/2018. (ydm)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER sustained in part and overruled in part 636 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; overruling 637 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Court adopts in full the Special Master's FirstReport Regarding Cross-Motio ns For Summary Judgment (Doc. #682) filed October 15, 2016 and Second Report Regarding Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment (Doc. #712) filed April 21, 2017.PLEASE REVIEW ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL RULINGS. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/8/2017. (ydm)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 706 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 645 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 4/10/2017. (ydm)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER granting 432 motion for leave to supplement expert reports; granting in part and denying in part 439 motion to strike expert report. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/30/2013. (ah)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying 147 motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/6/2009. (RA)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 36 Motion to Certify Class; sustaining 79 Motion for Leave to File; overruling in part 82 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; overruling 84 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court appoints as class counsel the firms of Nichols Kaster, PLLP and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before December 22, 2008 defendants provide to plaintiffs the names, addresses, and telephone numbers of all employees w ho are potential members of the class. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before December 22, 2008, plaintiffs submit to the Court for approval an order regarding notice that complies with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c). Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on November 24, 2008. (mlm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sibley et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxie Sibley
Represented By: Michele Renee Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Noel
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Bennett
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Williams
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg St. Julien
Represented By: Michele Renee Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Hernandez
Represented By: Michele Renee Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jasinski
Represented By: Michele Renee Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Richie
Represented By: Michele Renee Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teisha King
Represented By: Michele Renee Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Elise M. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Company
Represented By: Elise M. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?