Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc. v. Wolf Creek Marketplace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Defendant: Wolf Creek Marketplace, Inc., Ed McIntosh, John Bell and Kevin Barclay
Case Number: 2:2010cv02012
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/24/2011. (pp)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (52) for 45 Motion for Order, filed by Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc. Plaintiff's Motion for Turnover of Funds (45) is granted. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 11/29/10. (pp)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 45 Motion for Turnover of Funds filed by Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/12/10. (mh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc. v. Wolf Creek Marketplace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Neil L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf Creek Marketplace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Barclay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?