Keith v. Koerner et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Keith
Defendant: Roger Werholtz, Richard D. Koerner, William L. Cummings, Joseph P. Essman, Mark Robertson and Ananstacio Gallardo
Case Number: 2:2011cv02281
Filed: May 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/18/2014. (mig)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's 38 Report and Recommendations. Further, overruling defendant's 28 Motion For Interlocutory Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/11/2012. (mg)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part defendants Werholtz, Koerner, Cummings, Essman, and Robertson's 7 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Gallardo and Koerner remain in the case. The claims against defendants Werholtz, Cummings, Essman and Robertson are dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/28/2012. (mg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith v. Koerner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Keith
Represented By: John W. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Werholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Koerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Essman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ananstacio Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?