National Credit Union Administration Board v. RBS Securities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Credit Union Administration Board
Defendant: RBS Securities, Inc., Greenwich Capital Acceptance, Inc., Financial Asset Securities Corp., Fremont Mortage Securities Corp., Residential Funding Mortgage Securities II, Inc., Indymac MBS, Inc., Novastar Mortgage Funding Corp., Nomura Home Equity Loan, Inc., Lares Asset Securitization, Inc., Saxon Asset Securities Co. and Wachovia Mortgage Loan and Trust, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv02340
Filed: June 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER denying NCUA's request to cancel the Barclays Rule30(b)(6) deposition scheduled for July 14, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/13/2015. (ah)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER denying Nomura's requests to extend discovery cut-off date or to compel CoreLogic to respond before 7/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/10/2015. (kg)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER setting schedule related to Nomura's motion for extension of time or to compel as to CoreLogic. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/8/2015. (ah)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER setting briefing schedule regarding dispute over Loveless deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/23/2015. (ah)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER denying request to modify expert discovery deadlines regarding loss causation reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/22/2015. (ah)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER re (582 in 2:11-cv-02340-JWL-JPO) Joinder, filed by Financial Asset Securities Corp., RBS Securities, Inc., RBS Acceptance, Inc.: NCUA shall respond by June 23, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (EDT). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/19/2015. (ah)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER setting briefing schedule related to NCUA's June 17, 2015 letter motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/17/2015. (ah)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER denying James Whittemore's motion to quash deposition subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/16/2015. (ah)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting leave to file under seal Whittemore exhibits 6--9. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/10/2015. (ah)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER regarding RBS reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/9/2015. (ah)
June 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER setting response deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/5/2015. (ah)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER regarding UBS's answer to interrogatory 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/21/2015. (ah)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER setting deadline for UBS's response letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/19/2015. (ah)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER regarding interpretation of Section 10(d) of the Master Discovery Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/13/2015. (ah)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER setting schedule regarding Goldman Sachs's May 8, 2015, discovery letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/11/2015. (ah)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER regarding RBS disclosures and expert reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/20/2015. (ah)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER that RBS shall submit any response to NCUA's April15 letter by April 20 at 10:00am EDT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/16/2015. (ah)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER regarding RBS disclosures under section k of the Loan File Re-Underwriting Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/31/2015. (ah)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER denying RBS's March 24, 2015 applications regarding new custodians and loan files. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/27/2015. (ah)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER regarding RBS's letter-motion seeking order compelling NCUA. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/25/2015. (ah)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER related to NCUA damages calculation and Barclays spreadsheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/23/2015. (ah)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER setting deadline for Credit Suisse to respond to NCUA's letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/17/2015. (kg)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER requiring Credit Suisse to respond to interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/16/2015. (ah)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER regarding response deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/12/2015. (ah)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER regarding loan file collection and stipulations as to the Nomura defendant group. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/10/2015. (ah)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 470 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - granting in part and denying in part RBS defendants Motion to Dismiss 448 and granting in part and denying in part Wachovia defendants' Motion to Dismiss 446 . Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/25/2015. (ses) (Main Document 470 replaced on 2/25/2015 to correct signature date. NEF regenerated.) (mg))
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER regarding NCUA discovery dispute with Credit Suisse. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/28/2015. (ah)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER regarding mediation status reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/16/2015. (ah)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER denying RBS's request for an extension of the expert-rebuttal deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/15/2015. (ah)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER regarding status report deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/12/2014. (ah)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER regarding collection of files from Residential Capital Liquidating Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/1/2014. (ah)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER denying defendants' November 14, 2014 discovery request. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/21/2014. (ah)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER regarding discovery from non-party Ocwen. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/20/2014. (ah)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER setting response deadline to defendants' November 14, 2014 letter regarding discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/17/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER concerning the collection of sample loan files. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/3/2014. (ah)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER AMENDING MASTER DISCOVERY PROTOCOL. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/3/2014. (ah)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER regarding fact deposition limits. Order originally filed in the Southern District of New York on 9/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/24/2014. (ah)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER scheduling NCUAB's response to RBS's application of September 16, 2014. Order originally filed in the Southern District of New York on Septmber 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/18/2014. (ah)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER regarding scheduling objections to loan files (originally filed in the Southern District of New York on 8/11/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/11/2014. (ah)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER regarding sample loan files (originally filed in the Southern District of New York on 7/14/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/14/2014. (ah)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER regarding defenses based on indispensable parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/9/2014. (ah)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER extending deadline for production of third-party transcripts (originally filed in the Southern District of New York on 7/1/2014). The order is approved by the undersigned and shall be binding in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/1/2014. (ah)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER extending deadline for production of third-party transcripts (originally filed in the Southern District of New York on 6/17/2014). The order is approved by the undersigned and shall be binding in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/18/2014. (ah)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER regarding joinder of parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/16/2014. (ah)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding joinder of indispensable parties (originally filed in the Southern District of New York on 6/2/2014). The order is approved by the undersigned and shall be binding in this case, to the extent such defenses have been raised (the court's review indicates such defenses were raised only in case numbers 12-2591 and 13-2418). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/6/2014. (ah)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER regarding Goldman Sachs document custodians (originally filed in the Southern District of New York on 6/4/2014). The order is approved by the undersigned and shall be binding in this case (particularly as it relates to redaction and mindful that Goldman Sachs is not a party to this particular case). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/4/2014. (ah)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 329 RBS defendants' Motion to Modify the Master Discovery Protocol. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/27/2014. (ses)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 215 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine regarding statistical sampling testimony. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/30/2014. (ses)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying defendants' various motions to dismiss the amended complaint 144 146 150 153 . Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/12/2013. (ses)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER - All proceedings shall be stayed pending the Tenth Circuits resolution of the interlocutory appeal taken in Case Nos. 11-2340 and 11-2649, with the following exceptions: (a) the completed briefing and resolution by the Court of any pending mo tion to dismiss; and (b) the submission by plaintiff, if it chooses, of a motion related to the issue of statistical sampling, as described by plaintiff at the status conference conducted on this date. The Court shall issue orders as appropriate after the Tenth Circuit has issued an opinion in the interlocutory appeal. The pending motions for a stay are hereby granted to the extent set forth herein.. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 4/29/2013. (ses)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 115 Motion to Certify. The court shall certify for appeal the issues of whether the extender statute descibed in the court's order dated 7/25/12 applies to the 3-year time limitation (statute of repose) contained in § 77m and whether the extender statute applies to federal and state statutory claims. Signed by District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 9/19/2012. (meh)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 108) is denied except as to claims relating to the credit enhancement language cited in 137-39 of the complaint. Signed by District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 7/25/2012. (meh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Credit Union Administration Board v. RBS Securities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Credit Union Administration Board
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Capital Acceptance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Asset Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Mortage Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Mortgage Securities II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac MBS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novastar Mortgage Funding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Home Equity Loan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lares Asset Securitization, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Asset Securities Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Loan and Trust, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?