Utter v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Nicolette Utter
Defendant: Dallas Thompson, Samuel Brashears, Rick Armstrong, Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Police Department, Kansas City, Kansas and Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, KS
Case Number: 2:2011cv02360
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 167 Defendants' Motion for an Order Permitting Ex Parte Communications with Christopher Utter's Treating Physicians and Other Health Care Providers. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 6/7/2013. (sj)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 143 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 3/20/2013. (sj)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendant shall produce the material consistent with this opinion on or before 3/15/2013 and the parties shall submit a protective order concerning the May 22, 2007 report by 3/15/2013. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 3/7/2013. (sj)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 95 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash; denying 103 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 104 Defendants' Motion to Compel. See order for further details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 11/27/2012. (sj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utter v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolette Utter
Represented By: Christopher J. Lawler
Represented By: Brian F. McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Brashears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Police Department, Kansas City, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, KS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?