Eric C. Rajala, Trustee in Bankruptcy for estate of Generation Resources Holding Company, LLC v. Robert H. Gardner, et al.
Plaintiff: Eric C. Rajala
Defendant: Mission Wind PA Two, Inc., Mission Wind PA Three, Inc., Akiko N. Stevens, Forward Windpower, LLC., Edison Mission Energy, Mission Wind Pennsylvania, Inc., R. James Ansell, Virginia Z. Ansell, Forward Windpower Holding Company, LLC, Freestream Capital, LLC, Robbin M. Gardner, Robert H. Gardner, Gardner Family Investment Company, LLC, Lookout Windpower Holding Company, LLC, William W. Stevens, Stevens Family Investment Company, LLC, Windforce Holdings, Inc. and Lookout Windpower, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv02524
Filed: August 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 4 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; granting 9 Motion for Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/9/2012. (alm)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 10 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying as moot 2 Motion to Clarify. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/19/2011. (alm)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 18 Trustee's Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint. It is recommended that the Insiders' motion to consolidate 10 be granted. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 12/13/2011. (sj)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Response Out of Time. Trustee shall file response on or before 11/14/2011. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/4/2011. (cm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric C. Rajala, Trustee in Bankruptcy for estate of Generation Resources Holding Company, LLC v. Robert H. Gardner, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Wind PA Two, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Burke
Represented By: Jeanne M. Janchar
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Wind PA Three, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Burke
Represented By: Jeanne M. Janchar
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akiko N. Stevens
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Windpower, LLC.
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Burke
Represented By: Jeanne M. Janchar
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Mission Energy
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Burke
Represented By: Jeanne M. Janchar
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Wind Pennsylvania, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Burke
Represented By: Jeanne M. Janchar
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. James Ansell
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Z. Ansell
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Windpower Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freestream Capital, LLC
Represented By: Tyler W. Hudson
Represented By: Vanessa H. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbin M. Gardner
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Gardner
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Family Investment Company, LLC
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lookout Windpower Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Stevens
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Family Investment Company, LLC
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windforce Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Epps Dade
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lookout Windpower, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Burke
Represented By: Jeanne M. Janchar
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric C. Rajala
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?