Nkemakolam et al v. St. John's Military School et al

Plaintiff: Yolanda Nkemakolam, Christine Stacy, Patrick Stacy, Diane Timm, John Does 1-50, Jennifer Mactagone, Carin Obad and Michael Kelly
Defendant: St. John's Military School, Domestic and Foreign Missionary Society of the Protestant Episcopal Church in the United States of America, The and Episcopal Diocese of Western Kansas
Case Number: 2:2012cv02132
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order 439 ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' 435 MOTION APPROVE SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF JUDGMENT as to minor plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/26/2014. (ses)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order 434 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 430 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/25/2014. (ses)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order 421 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 330 Sealed Motion. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT defendant's motion to exclude expert testimony by Dr. Roger Pitman (Doc. ## 330 / 331 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT defendant's motion to exclude expert testimony by Dr. Shirley Taylor (Doc. ## 330 / 332 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT defendant's motion to exclude expert testimony by Carol Hotchkiss (Doc. ## 330 / 333 ) is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/24/2014. (ses)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order 310 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 285 Defendant's Sealed Motion for Separate Trials. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/17/2014. (ses)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order 309 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 279 Motion by defendant St. John's Military School for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted with respect to the claims for intentional infliction of emotional distress and neglig ent infliction of emotional distress by plaintiffs J.A., G.S., N.S., C.U., and L.T., and judgment is awarded to defendant on those claims. The motion is otherwise denied. It is further ordered 281 plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on the af firmative defense of comparative fault is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted with respect to the defense as applied to plaintiffs claims for intentional infliction of emotional distress and intentional failure to supervise, and judgment is awarded to plaintiffs to that extent. The motion is otherwise denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/13/2014. (ses)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order 269 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 244 Sealed Second Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/7/2013. (df)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order 219 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 179 Motion for Finding of Violation of Protective Order. The Clerk shall immediately seal exhibits 173-3, 173-4, and 173-5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/17/2013. (df)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order 192 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 164 Defendant St. John's Military School's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 4/18/2013. (ses)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/18/2012. (df)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/20/2012. (aw)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 21 Motion by defendant St. John's Military School to strike the exhibits attached to plaintiffs' amended complaint; denying 19 motion by defendant St. John's Military School to dismiss the claims agai nst it or alternatively to compel arbitration of those claims; and denying 31 Motion by defendant St. John's Military School to designate Topeka as the place of trial. The Clerk of Court shall strike the exhibits attached to plaintiffs' amended complaint from the record of the case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 6/26/2012. (ses)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 50 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/24/2012. (df)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nkemakolam et al v. St. John's Military School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Nkemakolam
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Stacy
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Stacy
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Timm
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does 1-50
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mactagone
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carin Obad
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kelly
Represented By: Joseph M. Feierabend
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. John's Military School
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domestic and Foreign Missionary Society of the Protestant Episcopal Church in the United States of America, The
Represented By: Paul D. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Diocese of Western Kansas
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?