Coleman v. General Motors et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Coleman
Defendant: Joan Thomas, United Auto Workers, UAW Sub Region Office, United Auto Workers Local 31, Richard Cheers, United Auto Workers, UAW International Union, General Motors, Christopher Andrews and Christopher Listenbee
Case Number: 2:2012cv02305
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 135 Motion for Order; denying 136 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 143 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/12/14.Mailed to pro se party Charlotte Coleman by regular and certified mail. (Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3460 0000 8262 4029) Mailed to Richard Cheers by regular mail. (kao)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 145 Report and Recommendations. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's remaining state law claims and, therefore, dismisses without prejudice those claims asserted against Richard Cheers and Raymond Petty. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/12/14. Mailed to pro se party Charlotte Coleman, Richard Cheers, Raymond Petty by regular mail. (kao)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court grants summary judgment to GM, Joan Thomas, and Christopher Listenbee. The defamation claim against Cheers is the only remaining claim in this case. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Extension (Doc. 127) and plaintiff's Motion Requesting Time (Doc. 128) are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 100, 105) are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that GM's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 103) is granted; Thomas's Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 101, 112) are granted; and Listenbee's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 114) is granted. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/20/14. Mailed to pro se party Charlotte Coleman, Richard Cheers by regular mail. (kao)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss and for more definate statement. The court orders plaintiff to file a second amended complaint within fourteen (14) days that includes additional factual allegations supporting plaintiffs libel and/or slander claim against defendant Thomas. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/17/2013. Mailed to pro se party Charlotte Coleman by regular mail (mm)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 48 Defendant General Motors LLCs Motion To Dismiss. Plaintiff is cautioned that her failure to prosecute her case or timely comply with court orders and deadlines will likely result in monetary sanctions or the sanction of dismissal. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/8/2013. (ses)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to dismiss 34 is granted on the conditions stated within the order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/30/2013. Mailed to pro se party Charlotte Coleman by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 7009 1410 0002 0381 8303 (kao)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Christopher Andrews' Motion to Dismiss and For More Definite Statement (doc. 18) is granted in part. The court dismisses plaintiff's Title VII claim and libel and/or slander cl aim against defendant Andrews. The court denies as moot and without prejudice defendant Andrews' motion for more definite statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion of UAW Defendants To Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Employment Discrimin ation Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) (doc. 21) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is granted ten (10) days to file a second amended complaint that includes additional factual llegations supporting her libel and/or slander claim ag ainst defendant Andrews and her Title VII claim against the UAW defendants. Failure to file a second amended complaint within this time will result in dismissal of these laims. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/21/2012. Mailed to pro se party Charlotte Coleman by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 7009 1410 0002 0381 3421 (also mailed by regular mail to pro se defendant Listenbee) (kao)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 7/6/2012. Mailed to pro se Plaintiff by regular mail. (bw)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting 6 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee of $350.00 on or before July 11, 2012. Failure to pay the fee by this deadline may result in dismissal of plaintiff's case without further notice. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/25/2012.Mailed to pro se party Charlotte Coleman by regular and certified mail. ( Certified Tracking Number: 7009 1410 0002 0381 7733) (kao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. General Motors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Workers, UAW Sub Region Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Workers Local 31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cheers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Workers, UAW International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Listenbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?