Foxfield Villa Associates, LLC et al v. Regnier et al

Plaintiff: Foxfield Villa Associates, LLC, Ernest J. Raub, III and Richard A. Bartlett
Defendant: Robert D. Regnier, Bank of Blue Valley, Blue Valley Ban Corp., Donald H. Alexander, Harvey S. Bodker, Suzanne E. Dotson, Charles S. Hunter, Richard L. Bond, Michael J. Brown, Robert D. Taylor, Thomas A. McDonnell and Anne D. St. Peter
Case Number: 2:2012cv02528
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2018 237 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 183 Motion for Summary Judgment On Plaintiff's Sole Federal Claim and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The court denies all other motions as moot 157 Motion Regarding Plaintiff' s Rebuttal Experts; 179 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims; 181 Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants Affirmative Defenses; 185 Motion for Summary Judgment on Question of Whether PRES, LLCS and Bartlett Fami ly Real Estate Fund, LLCS FVA Interests, and Bartlett's FVA Note are Securities; 187 Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants Mitigation of Damages and Statute of Limitations Affirmative Defenses; 189 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaint iffs' Affirmative Claims; 208 Motion to Strike or Disregard Portions of Paul Robben's May 31, 2017 Declaration; 215 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition; 221 Motion to Exclude and/or Strike Expert Evidence from Shawn D. Fox; 223 Motion to Exclude, Strike and/or Limit Testimony of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/23/18. (hw)
January 12, 2018 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 175 Motion for Review and to Amend Pretrial Order. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/12/18. (hw)
July 20, 2017 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 133 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 156 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/20/2017. (hl)
February 21, 2017 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 106 Motion to Dismiss; denying 119 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/21/2017. (hl)
January 17, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss Party. Bank of Blue Valley's alternative request to stay the case is granted as to all parties. This case is stayed as to all parties pending the outcome of the case of Foxfield Villa Assoc., LLC, v. Bank of Blue Valley, No. 11CV07558 in the District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/17/2013. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foxfield Villa Associates, LLC et al v. Regnier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foxfield Villa Associates, LLC
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: David Lewis Ballew
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest J. Raub, III
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: David Lewis Ballew
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Bartlett
Represented By: Deron A. Anliker
Represented By: David Lewis Ballew
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Regnier
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Blue Valley
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Valley Ban Corp.
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H. Alexander
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey S. Bodker
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne E. Dotson
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Hunter
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Bond
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Brown
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Taylor
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. McDonnell
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne D. St. Peter
Represented By: Jere D. Sellers
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?