Boxum-Debolt et al v. Shawnee County District Attorney's Office et al
Plaintiff: Krystal L. Boxum-Debolt and Lisa Anne Moore
Defendant: Shawnee County District Attorney's Office, Chadwick J. Taylor, Shawnee County, Kansas, Shawnee County Board of Commissioners, Ted Ensley, Mary M. Thomas and Shelly Buhler
Case Number: 2:2012cv02641
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 152 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 06/29/2017. (cv)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 154 Motion for Leave to File Response Out of Time. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 04/10/2017. (cv)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling defendant Chadwick J. Taylor's 25 Motion to Reconsider. The parties are reminded to contact the Magistrate Judge through Courtroom Deputy Angela Whittle to reschedule the Scheduling Conference. See 22 Order Staying Discovery. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/17/2014. (mg)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part 11 Motion to Dismiss and sustaining in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. The following claims remain in the case: Against Chadwick J. Taylor in his official capacity, claims under Title VII (Counts I-III). Agai nst Chadwick J. Taylor in his personal capacity, claims under Title VII (Counts I-III) and denial of overtime wages under the FLSA (Count VI). Against Shawnee County, Kansas, Ted Ensley, Mary M. Thomas and Shelly Buhler in their official and individ ual capacities, denial of overtime wages under the FLSA (Count VI). On or before October 15, 2013, plaintiffs shall show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the Title VII claims against Taylor in his individual capacity. See order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/30/2013. (ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boxum-Debolt et al v. Shawnee County District Attorney's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal L. Boxum-Debolt
Represented By: Athena M. Dickson
Represented By: Kathleen E. Mannion
Represented By: Rik N. Siro
Represented By: Eric W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Anne Moore
Represented By: Athena M. Dickson
Represented By: Kathleen E. Mannion
Represented By: Rik N. Siro
Represented By: Eric W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Steve R. Fabert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadwick J. Taylor
Represented By: Steve R. Fabert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee County, Kansas
Represented By: James M. Crowl
Represented By: Richard V. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: James M. Crowl
Represented By: Richard V. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Ensley
Represented By: James M. Crowl
Represented By: Richard V. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary M. Thomas
Represented By: James M. Crowl
Represented By: Richard V. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Buhler
Represented By: James M. Crowl
Represented By: Richard V. Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?