Smith v. Hillshire Brands
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Smith
Defendant: Hillshire Brands
Case Number: 2:2013cv02605
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/20/15. (kao)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER vacating trial setting and establishing new briefing deadlines related to 71 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/22/2014. (ah)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER regarding documents received from the KHRC. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/24/2014. (ah)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER to the Kansas Human Rights Commission re 56 MOTION for Order filed by Anthony M. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/4/2014. (ah)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/20/2014. (ah)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Hillshire's Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 11) is denied with regard to plaintiff's Title VII retaliation claim and granted with regard to plaintiff's ADA claim. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/16/14. (kao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hillshire Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillshire Brands
Represented By: James R. Holland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?