Alexander et al v. BF Labs Inc.

Plaintiff: Kyle Alexander and Dylan Symington
Defendant: BF Labs Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02159
Filed: April 4, 2014
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 102 Motion to Compel. Please see order for important deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/21/2015. (mmg)
June 11, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 86 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/11/2015. (mmg)
October 22, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 motion to stay case for sixty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/22/2014. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. BF Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Alexander
Represented By: Aristotle N. Rodopoulos(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Noah K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Symington
Represented By: Aristotle N. Rodopoulos(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Noah K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF Labs Inc.
Represented By: James M. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?