United States of America v. Malik
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Afaq Ahmed Malik
Case Number: 2:2015cv09092
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 176 Motion in Limine; denying 177 Motion in Limine. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment shall be entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff on all counts. The case is closed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/9/2019. (ydm)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 160 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/17/2019. (ydm)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 175 Motion for Leave to File Depositions Notices. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/20/2018. (ydm)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 132 Defendant Malik's Motion to Enforce or Clarify the Court's Order Compelling Production of Documents and ESI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/29/2017. (byk)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Malik's 113 request for sanctions; and denying 116 Malik's Motion for Leave to Conduct Supplemental Discovery. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c)(1)(C) and 37(b)(2)(A)(ii), the Government is prohibited from presenting at trial the Interim Reports (undated and dated versions) and Final Report of the investigation, as well as information contained in those reports that is not independently available from other documents or evidence that the trial court de termines admissible at trial. This ruling is not intended to preclude Malik, if he chooses to do so, from presenting the Interim Report and Final Report, or the contents thereof, as evidence at trial to the extent they are otherwise admissible. It is further ordered that Malik shall have until 9/22/2017 to file an affidavit from his counsel requesting his reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred in filing his Motion to Compel Discovery Response under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(A), along with documentation supporting the requested amount of reasonable expenses. The Government shall have seven (7) days thereafter to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/15/2017. (byk)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 113 Defendant Malik's Motion to Compel Discovery Response; and taking under advisement Malik's request for sanctions and 116 Motion for Leave to Conduct Supplemental Discovery. Within seven (7) days of t he date of this Memorandum and Order, the Government shall serve its supplemental response to Malik's First Request No. 5, and produce to Malik unredacted copies of the five February 2016 emails listed on the Government's June 22, 2017 privilege log, and all documents and ESI responsive to Request No. 5, including those described in this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/7/2017. (byk)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 71 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions for Plaintiff's Willful Tampering with a Material Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/20/2017. (byk)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Plaintiff shall forthwith electronically file its Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's 71 Motion for Sanctions Against the United States and exhibits. The Court, however, will only consider the Surreply with respect the particular issues newly raised by Malik in his reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/17/2017. (byk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Dillon A. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afaq Ahmed Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?