Tacey v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: David J. Tacey
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Case Number: 2:2015cv09094
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining in part 23 Motion for Attorney Fees. Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), plaintiff's attorney, Sharon J. Meyers, is entitled to fees in the amount of $13,616.93. The Commissioner shall pay those fees from the amount which she is holding from plaintiff's past due benefits. The Commissioner shall pay to plaintiff any remainder of withheld benefits. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/8/2018. (hl)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 18 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/22/2017. (ydm)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that judgment shall be entered pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) REVERSING the Commissioner's decision and REMANDING for further proceedings in accordance with this memorandum and order. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/10/2017. (ydm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacey v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Tacey
Represented By: Sharon J. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?