Mann v. Con-Way Freight, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mann, Dana Moye, Katina McGee and Anthony Craig Mann
Defendant: Con-Way Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. and Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02196
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Cecilia J. Brown as to All Plaintiffs (Brown, Cecilia)
May 28, 2019 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #240 Bill of Costs by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
May 28, 2019 Filing 240 BILL OF COSTS by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4)(Wallace, Jack)
May 7, 2019 Filing 239 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #235 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Appeal No. 19-3085). (tvn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required filed by Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re #235 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Lake, Stacy)
April 25, 2019 Filing 237 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 04/24/2019 and assigned Appeal No. 19-3085 re #235 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Katina McGee, Dana Moye, Anthony Craig Mann. (tvn)
April 24, 2019 Filing 236 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #235 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(ydm)
April 24, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #232 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Sanctions, #233 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #234 Judgment by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4787674. (Lake, Stacy)
March 29, 2019 Filing 234 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 03/29/2019. (tvn)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #202 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is closed. The clerk of the court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 03/29/2019. (tvn)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #221 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Exhibit #34 Out of Time; denying #223 plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 03/20/2019. (tvn)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER: JURY TRIAL, scheduled to commence 1/7/2019, is hereby CANCELLED. Counsel are directed to contact Court to reschedule trial after it issues its rulings as to pending dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 11/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
September 26, 2018 Filing 230 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re: #223 MOTION for Sanctions (Lake, Stacy)
September 12, 2018 Filing 229 RESPONSE by Defendants Con-Way Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #223 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Wallace, Jack)
September 8, 2018 Filing 228 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re: #221 MOTION for Leave to file Exhibit #34 Out of Time (Lake, Stacy)
September 7, 2018 Filing 227 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re: #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wallace, Jack)
August 30, 2018 Filing 226 RESPONSE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #221 MOTION for Leave to file Exhibit #34 Out of Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wallace, Jack)
August 29, 2018 Filing 225 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re #223 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Def. Responses to Plaintiffs Amended Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2- Def. Responses to Plaintiffs 1st Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit 3- Def. Responses to Plaintiffs Second Request for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 4- Golden Rule Letters to Defendant, #5 Exhibit 5- Telephone Conference Email, #6 Exhibit 6- Request for Conference with Judge, #7 Exhibit 7- Plaintiffs First Motion for Sanctions, #8 Exhibit 8- Aldis Tuck Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 9- Marlon Brown Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 10- Court's Order on First Motion for Sanctions, #11 Exhibit 11- Defendant's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff Anthony Mann's Amended Opening Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit 12- Defendant's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff Dana Moye's Amended Opening Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit 13- October 12, 2017 Golden Rule Letter, #14 Exhibit 14- October 12, 2017 Noose Discovery Email, #15 Exhibit 15- October 13, 2017 Defendant Response to Golden Rule Letter, #16 Exhibit 16- Second Motion for Sanctions, #17 Exhibit 17- October 23, 2017 Defendant Email to Plaintiffs, #18 Exhibit 18- Defendant Privilege Log, #19 Exhibit 19- Court Order on Second Motion for Sanctions, #20 Exhibit 20- Defendant Responses to Dana Moye Third Request for Production of Documents, #21 Exhibit 21- Defendant Responses to Anthony Mann Third Request for Production of Documents, #22 Exhibit 22- Defendant Responses to Katina McGee Third Request for Production of Documents, #23 Exhibit 23- August 1 2018 Golden Rule Letter to Defendant, #24 Exhibit 24- August 3 2018 Defendant Response to Golden Rule Letter)(Lake, Stacy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 224 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #223 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye(Lake, Stacy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 223 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed #220 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's #212 Response to Defendant's #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reply deadline is extended to 9/7/2018. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/17/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 16, 2018 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to file Exhibit #34 Out of Time by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit #34)(Lake, Stacy)
August 15, 2018 Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #203 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Wallace, Jack)
August 15, 2018 Filing 219 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #212 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52 - Recommendation for Termination Anthony Mann #1, #2 Exhibit 53 - Dana Moye LOI Email 1-15-2016, #3 Exhibit Dana Moye 1-18-2016 Paul Sanford Letter, #4 Exhibit 55 - Dana Moye 1-18-2016 Mike Lewis, #5 Exhibit 56 - Dana Moye 1-19-2016 Bryan Bonifas, #6 Exhibit 57 - Dana Moye Out of Service Message Report, #7 Exhibit 58 - XPO Policy 541 - Employee Conduct, #8 Exhibit 59 - XPO Stipulation of Facts, #9 Exhibit 60 - Plaintiff Moye Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 61 - Recommendation for Termination Katina McGee, #11 Exhibit 62 - McGee Fax Log Report, #12 Exhibit 63 - 2014 Annual Review of Driver's Record, #13 Exhibit 64 - Trowbridge Policy Violation 541, #14 Exhibit 65 - Jason Davis Comparator, #15 Exhibit 66 - Abel Policy Violation 541, #16 Exhibit 67 - Brown Policy Violation 541, #17 Exhibit 68 - Katina McGee Job Abandonment Email 4-20-2016, #18 Exhibit 69 - EthicsPoint Incident Report; Katina McGee, #19 Exhibit 70 - Katina McGee Emergency Explanation Email 4-20-2016)(tvn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 218 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #212 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35 - Summary of Race Discrimination Investigation, #2 Exhibit 36 - Defendant's EEOC Response - Plaintiff Mann, #3 Exhibit 37 - Gabe Nunez Letter of Instruction Sexual Harassment Gender Discrimination, #4 Exhibit 38 - Conway Policy 542, #5 Exhibit 39 - Caucasian Approval for Leave, #6 Exhibit 40 - Anthony Mann 2012 of Unfair Treatment Regarding Vacation, #7 Exhibit 41 - 2008 Noose Investigation file, #8 Exhibit 42 - 2001 Noose Letter of Communication, #9 Exhibit 43 - Anthony Mann Request for PTO Forms Email, #10 Exhibit 44 - Anthony Mann 6-1-15 Complaint of Discrimination, #11 Exhibit 45 - Anthony Mann ETRB, #12 Exhibit 46 - Recommendation for Termination Mann #2, #13 Exhibit 47 - 2015 Annual Review of Driver's Record, #14 Exhibit 48 - Dana Moye 1-07-2016 FOM Letter, #15 Exhibit 49 - Recommendation for Termination Dana Moye, #16 Exhibit 50 - Dana Moye Written Response)(tvn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 217 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #212 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 - Anthony Mann May, 2015 Complaint of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 18 - Bruce Moss "Entrapment" email, #3 Exhibit 19 - Anthony Mann Interview Summary with Cedric Ellis, #4 Exhibit 20 - Cedric Ellis Interview Summary Plaintiff Mann, #5 Exhibit 21 - Johnny Antone Email, #6 Exhibit 22 - Investigation of Complaint Against Anthony Mann, #7 Exhibit 23 - Bruce Moss Email 6-8-2015, #8 Exhibit 24 - Dana Moye 1-14-2016 Letter of Instruction and Protest, #9 Exhibit 25 - CCX 811 Policy, #10 Exhibit 26 - XPO Policy 131; Equal Employment Opportunity-XPO Policy 132: No Harassment or Discrimination in the Workplace, #11 Exhibit 27 - Dana Moye ETRB Packet, #12 Exhibit 28 - Dana Moye 2016 Annual Review of Driver Record, #13 Exhibit 29 - Dana Moye Written Report 4-5-2016, #14 Exhibit 30 - Katina McGee Out of Service Message Report, #15 Exhibit 32 - Plaintiff McGee Deposition)(tvn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 216 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #212 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dana Moye Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Marlon Brown Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Anita Sloan Deposition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Corporate Representative Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Paul Frayer Deposition, #6 Exhibit 6 - Maureen Mahr Deposition, #7 Exhibit 7 - DSR Description, #8 Exhibit 8 - Anthony Mann Deposition, #9 Exhibit 9 - Terry Morris Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 10 - Londell Guess Affidavit, #11 Exhibit 11 - Willis McQueen Affidavit, #12 Exhibit 12 - Aldis Tuck Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 13 - Katina McGee Affidavit, #14 Exhibit 14 - Katina McGee Diary, #15 Exhibit 15 - Katina McGee Charge of Discrimination)(tvn)
August 14, 2018 Filing 215 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) re #213 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , 214 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #212 Response to Motion (Lake, Stacy)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #213 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 14, 2018 Filing 213 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31)(Lake, Stacy)
August 10, 2018 Filing 212 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lake, Stacy)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #210 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #202 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response deadline is extended to 8/10/2018. Court will not grant Plaintiff any further extensions to file Response. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 3, 2018 Filing 210 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 209 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #208 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment and the Response deadline is exended to 8/3/2018. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 07/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 20, 2018 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #205 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response deadline is extended to 7/20/2018. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/2/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
July 2, 2018 Filing 206 RESPONSE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #205 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wallace, Jack)
June 29, 2018 Filing 205 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
June 29, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Spring E. Taylor as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Taylor, Spring)
June 8, 2018 Filing 203 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.(Wallace, Jack)
June 8, 2018 Filing 202 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Defendant's List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Maureen Mahr, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Mike Lewis, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Huner, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Anita Sloan, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Cramer, #7 Exhibit 6 - Deposition Excerpts of Dana Moye, #8 Exhibit 7 - Deposition Excerpts of Anthony Mann, #9 Exhibit 8 - Deposition Excerpts of Katina McGee, #10 Exhibit 9 - Deposition Excerpts Bruce Moss, #11 Exhibit 10 - Charge of Discrimination - Dana Moye)(Wallace, Jack)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #200 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Dispositive motion deadline extended 6/8/2018. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/1/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
May 29, 2018 Filing 200 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time (Motion for Seven Day Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion) by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Wallace, Jack)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED Dispositive motion deadline 6/1/2018. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Estimated trial time 3-5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/21/18. (ss)
May 17, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE of Certificate of Service for Rule 26 Supplemental/Initial Disclosures by Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Brown, Cecilia)
May 14, 2018 Filing 197 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/14/2018.(FTR: 1:28.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 unopposed motion for extension of time until May 4, 2018, for submission of the proposed pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/1/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
May 1, 2018 Filing 195 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to submit Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #193 joint motion to extend the deadline for submission of the proposed pretrial order to May 1, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
March 27, 2018 Filing 193 JOINT MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Brown, Cecilia)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SCHEDULING ORDER: With the pretrial conference having been postponed until 5/14/18, the dispositive motion deadline is hereby reset at 6/1/18. The case remains on the court's 1/7/19 trial docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/23/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(O'Hara, James)
March 22, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2018 at 1:30 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The proposed pretrial order will remain due on April 9, 2018.(ss)
March 1, 2018 Filing 190 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Bruce Moss on 03/07/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
February 28, 2018 Filing 189 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Corporate Representative on 03/09/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
February 26, 2018 Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing and Scheduling conference held February 20, 2018 before Judge James P. O'Hara, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Jack R. Wallace. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018. (kg)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SIXTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #181 motion for a protective order, and denying #184 motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/20/2018. (amh)
February 20, 2018 Filing 186 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: MOTION HEARING held on 2/20/2018 re #181 MOTION for Protective Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., #184 MOTION to Compel Attendance at Deposition and Sanctions filed by Katina McGee, Dana Moye, Anthony Craig Mann. Cecilia Brown and Stacy Lake appear for plaintiffs. Jack Wallace, Kim Seten and Spring Taylor appear for defendant. (FTR: 10:31.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
February 16, 2018 Filing 185 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re: #181 MOTION for Protective Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Wallace, Jack)
February 14, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION to Compel Attendance at Deposition and Sanctions by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lake, Stacy)
February 14, 2018 Filing 183 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re #181 MOTION for Protective Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Brown, Cecilia)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Setting Hearing on #181 Motion for Protective Order AND expediting briefing deadlines related to the same. Any response to the motion is due by 4:30 p.m. on 2/15/2018 and shall be limited to ten double-spaced pages. Any reply is due by noon on 2/16/2018 and shall be limited to three double-spaced pages. A hearing on this motion is set for 2/20/2018 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
February 13, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION for Protective Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Wallace, Jack)
February 13, 2018 Filing 180 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly F. Seten on behalf of XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Seten, Kimberly)
February 6, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION of Michael Lewis by Anthony Craig Mann re #175 Notice to Take Deposition. (Brown, Cecilia)
February 2, 2018 Filing 178 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Corporate Representative on February 12, 13, 2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
January 23, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Paul Frayer on 02/23/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
January 18, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Corporate Representative on 1/26/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
January 10, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Michael Lewis on 02/09/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
January 10, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Maureen Mahr on 02/05/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
January 10, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Anita Sloan on 2/08/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
January 10, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Corporate Representative on 1/26/2018. (Brown, Cecilia)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #170 unopposed motion for extension of time until January 22, 2018, for plaintiff to file a motion to compel related to defendant's document production. Because multiple extensions of this type already have been sought and granted in this case, and because the discovery deadline is fast approaching, no further extensions to bring motions to compel (even if unopposed) will be granted absent a showing of truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/9/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 8, 2018 Filing 170 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 FIFTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting #168 joint motion to amend deadlines. Discovery deadline 2/23/2018. Dispositive motion deadline 4/2/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/5/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2018 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/8/2018. (amh)
January 8, 2018 Filing 168 JOINT MOTION for extension of time (Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines) by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
December 29, 2017 Filing 167 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Michael Lewis on January 14, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachement A)(Brown, Cecilia)
December 29, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Paul Frayer on January 12, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Brown, Cecilia)
December 29, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Anita Sloan on January 19, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Brown, Cecilia)
December 29, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Maureen Mahr on January 13, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachement A)(Brown, Cecilia)
December 29, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye of taking deposition of Authorized Representative/Corporate Representative on January 9, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Brown, Cecilia)
December 8, 2017 Filing 162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying #153 Motion for Sanctions; granting #154 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (discovery deadline 1/22/2018, dispositive motion deadline 2/20/2018, proposed pretrial order due by 1/30/2018, Jury Trial set for 11/5/2018 at 09:00 AM, final pretrial conference set for 2/7/2018 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/2/2017. (amh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Inability to Submit Pretrial Order by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Wallace, Jack)
October 25, 2017 Filing 159 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re: #153 MOTION for Sanctions AND SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT, #154 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Brown, Cecilia)
October 24, 2017 Filing 158 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT of #157 Response to Motion, (Supplemental Exhibit 7 to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions) by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Wallace, Jack)
October 23, 2017 Filing 157 RESPONSE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (In Opposition) re #153 MOTION for Sanctions AND SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT, re #154 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Wallace, Jack)
October 21, 2017 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Third Request for Production of Documents by Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding both #153 Motion for Sanctions and #154 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Any response is due by 10/23/2017 and any reply is due by 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/16/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
October 13, 2017 Filing 154 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lake, Stacy)
October 13, 2017 Filing 153 MOTION for Sanctions AND SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Brown, Cecilia)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #149 motion for extension of time until October 13, 2017, for plaintiffs to bring a motion to compel regarding defendant's supplemental discovery responses. Defendant has indicated the motion is unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/2/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
September 29, 2017 Filing 151 RESPONSE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #149 MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion to Compel (Wallace, Jack)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding #149 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. Any response is due by 2:00 p.m. on October 2, 2017. Any reply is due by 2:00 p.m. on October 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/29/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
September 29, 2017 Filing 149 MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Brown, Cecilia)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #145 motion for an extension of time until September 29, 2017, for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel discovery should plaintiffs deem one necessary after reviewing, as described by defendant, the "large volume of documents" recently produced. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/19/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
September 18, 2017 Filing 147 RESPONSE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #145 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wallace, Jack)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding #145 Motion for Extension of Time. Any response is due by 5:00 p.m. on 9/18/2017. Any reply is due by noon on 9/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/15/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
September 14, 2017 Filing 145 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER and ORDER granting #143 unopposed Motion to Amend protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/5/2017. (amh)
September 1, 2017 Filing 143 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct #37 Protective Order by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
August 18, 2017 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
August 1, 2017 Filing 141 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann re #137 Order on Motion to Compel. (Lake, Stacy)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting #139 joint motion to amend scheduling order. Discovery deadline 10/23/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 11/27/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/31/2017. (amh)
July 28, 2017 Filing 139 JOINT MOTION for extension of time to Extend Certain Case Management Deadlines by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
July 21, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoenas and Cancellation of Depositions by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Wallace, Jack)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #98 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #107 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/19/2017. (amh)
July 14, 2017 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katina McGee re 124 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. (Brown, Cecilia)
July 6, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Mike Lewis on August 1, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Maureen Mahr on July 28, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 133 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Justin Borders on July 26, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 132 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Aldis Tuck on July 26, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Dr. Francis Totta on July 26, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Marcus Rodgers on July 25, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Marlon Brown on July 25, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Leslie Mann on July 25, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 6, 2017 Filing 127 SURREPLY by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re: #107 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wallace, Jack)
July 5, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Katina McGee (2nd Amended) on July 10, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #117 defendant's motion for leave to file a sur-reply. Plaintiffs do not oppose the motion for sur-reply, but state they would like an "opportunity to reply to the sur-reply" (ECF No. 121 at 1). At this point, without seeing the sur-reply, neither plaintiffs nor the court can determine whether a sur-sur-reply will be necessary, so that premature request is denied. Defendant is directed to file his sur-reply, limited to three pages as indicated in the court's June 28, 2017 order (ECF No. 119), by July 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/5/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #122 unopposed motion for fees and costs related to the June 27, 2017 deposition of Katina McGee. Ms. McGee is directed to pay defendant the total amount of $1,448.80, which represents the attorneys' fees and court reporter appearance fee associated with the deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/5/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
June 30, 2017 Filing 123 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re: #117 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Plaintiffs' #107 MOTION to Compel. (Wallace, Jack)
June 30, 2017 Filing 122 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Regarding June 27, 2017 Deposition of Plaintiff McGee by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wallace, Jack)
June 29, 2017 Filing 121 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re #117 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Lake, Stacy)
June 28, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE of Intent to Issue Subpoena by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Spring)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING re #117 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Any response shall be filed by June 29, 2017, and any reply shall be filed by June 30, 2017. The court notes that if defendant is ultimately granted leave to file a sur-reply, the sur-reply shall be limited to three, double-spaced pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/28/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(srj)
June 28, 2017 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Discovery by Katina McGee re #49 Certificate of Service, #46 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
June 28, 2017 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Plaintiffs' #107 Motion to Compel by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
June 26, 2017 Filing 116 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re: #107 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted L, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit - Redacted N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Q)(Lake, Stacy)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs' reply brief with regard to their motion to compel is due today (6/26/17). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/26/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
June 23, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #107 MOTION to Compel , #110 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
June 22, 2017 Filing 113 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Katina McGee on June 27, 2017. (Wallace, Jack)
June 22, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE of Intent to Issue Subpoena by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Spring)
June 19, 2017 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs' Amended Opening Interrogatories by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
June 9, 2017 Filing 110 RESPONSE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #107 MOTION to Compel (Wallace, Jack)
June 6, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re: MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Mann and Moye to Respond to Discovery Requests with Memorandum in Support #98 filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Spring)
June 5, 2017 Filing 108 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re: #98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Mann and Moye to Respond to Discovery Requests with Memorandum in Support (Taylor, Spring)
May 26, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Lake, Stacy)
May 22, 2017 Filing 106 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Dana Moye re #98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Mann and Moye to Respond to Discovery Requests with Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lake, Stacy)
May 22, 2017 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 3rd Supplemental Discovery by Anthony Craig Mann re #98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Mann and Moye to Respond to Discovery Requests with Memorandum in Support, #83 Certificate of Service. (Lake, Stacy)
May 18, 2017 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Discovery by Dana Moye re #98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Mann and Moye to Respond to Discovery Requests with Memorandum in Support, #69 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #99 motion for extension of time to file a motion to compel. Plaintiffs have demonstrated good cause for a short extension, but have not shown cause for their lengthy 21-day request. The court will grant plaintiffs until May 26, 2017, to file a motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/17/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
May 16, 2017 Filing 102 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re: #99 MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel (Brown, Cecilia)
May 15, 2017 Filing 101 RESPONSE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #99 MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel (Defendant's Response in Opposition). (Taylor, Spring)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING DEADLINES regarding #99 motion for extension of time for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel. Any response to this motion is due by 5:00PM on May 15, 2017. Any reply is due by noon on May 16, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/12/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
May 12, 2017 Filing 99 MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
May 8, 2017 Filing 98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Mann and Moye to Respond to Discovery Requests with Memorandum in Support by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Taylor, Spring)
April 28, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Katina McGee (Videotaped) on June 22, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
April 28, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Dana Moye (Videotaped) on June 21, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
April 28, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. of taking deposition of Anthony Mann (Videotaped) on June 20, 2017 (Wallace, Jack)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 unopposed motion for extension of time until May 12, 2017, for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel regarding their document requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/20/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
April 20, 2017 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Brown, Cecilia)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 motion for extension of time until May 8, 2017, for defendant to file a motion to compel regarding its document requests. Counsel has informed the court that plaintiffs do not oppose the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/17/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
April 17, 2017 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of McGee's First Supplemental Discovery to Defendants Second Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Katina McGee by Katina McGee re #72 Certificate of Service, #69 Certificate of Service. (Lake, Stacy)
April 14, 2017 Filing 90 MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Taylor, Spring)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting #88 joint motion to amend scheduling order. Discovery deadline 8/1/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 9/7/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2017 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/11/2017. (amh)
April 11, 2017 Filing 88 JOINT MOTION for extension of time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
March 31, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE of Intent to Issue Subpoena by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Spring)
March 31, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Intent to Issue Subpoena by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Spring)
March 31, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Intent to Issue Subpoena by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Spring)
March 24, 2017 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
March 17, 2017 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers to Defendant's Second Request for Production of Documents to Dana Moye, Answers to Defendant's Second Request for Production of Documents to Anthony Mann, Answers to Defendant's Second Request for Production of Documents to Katina McGee, Answers to Defendant's Second Interrogatories to Dana Moye, Answers to Defendant's Second Interrogatories to Anthony Mann, and Answers to Defendant's Second Interrogatories to Katina McGee. by Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re #69 Certificate of Service. (Lake, Stacy)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #74 motion for extension of time until March 24, 2017, for defendant to respond to discovery. Defendant has shown good cause for the requested extension, namely, the significant volume of the discovery propounded. Because the discovery period does not end until May 15, 2017, the court can see no prejudice befalling plaintiffs by the court granting the requested extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/8/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
March 7, 2017 Filing 81 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re: #74 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests (Wallace, Jack)
March 7, 2017 Filing 80 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye re #74 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests (Brown, Cecilia)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING DEADLINES: any response to #74 defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to discovery is due on March 7, 2017. Any reply is due on March 8, 2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
March 3, 2017 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT to #52 Expert Witness Designation by Plaintiff Katina McGee. (Lake, Stacy)
March 3, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Opposition Pursuant to Local Rule 37.1 by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. re #74 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests (Wallace, Jack)
March 3, 2017 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosure by Katina McGee (Nuby, Cecilia)
March 3, 2017 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosure by Dana Moye (Nuby, Cecilia)
March 3, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
February 28, 2017 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Request for Productions by Anthony Craig Mann (Lake, Stacy)
February 17, 2017 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Request for Productions by Katina McGee (Lake, Stacy)
February 17, 2017 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Request for Productions by Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
February 17, 2017 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Request for Productions by Katina McGee. (Lake, Stacy) Modified filer name on 2/21/2017. (kao)
February 15, 2017 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Interrogatories and Second Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Mann, Moye, and McGee by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
February 15, 2017 Filing 68 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Spring E. Taylor on behalf of XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Taylor, Spring)
February 13, 2017 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Opening Interrogatories by Dana Moye re #61 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
February 13, 2017 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended First Request for Admissions by Dana Moye re #58 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
February 13, 2017 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Opening Interrogatories by Katina McGee re #60 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
February 13, 2017 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended First Request for Admissions by Katina McGee re #57 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
February 13, 2017 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Opening Interrogatories by Anthony Craig Mann re #59 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
February 13, 2017 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended First Request for Admissions by Anthony Craig Mann re #56 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Moye's Opening Interrogatories by Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of McGee's Opening Interrogatories by Katina McGee (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mann's Opening Interrogatories by Anthony Craig Mann (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Moye's 1st Request for Admissions by Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of McGee's 1st Request for Admissions by Katina McGee (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mann's 1st Request for Admissions by Anthony Craig Mann (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Moye's 1st Request for Production by Dana Moye (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of McGee's 1st Request for Production by Katina McGee (Lake, Stacy)
February 4, 2017 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Mann's 1st Request for Production by Anthony Craig Mann (Lake, Stacy)
February 3, 2017 Filing 52 EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION by Anthony Craig Mann, Katina McGee, Dana Moye.(Lake, Stacy)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEDIATION MINUTE ORDER - The undersigned magistrate judge has reviewed the confidential settlement reports submitted by counsel in accordance with the amended scheduling order. No mediation is ordered at this time, as it's clear from the parties' stated settlement positions that any form of ADR at this juncture would be a complete waste of time and money. Although the court intends to revisit the subject of ADR at the pretrial conference after discovery has been completed, right now it appears ADR should not be ordered unless and until plaintiffs' claims survive defendant's anticipated summary judgment motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/1/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(O'Hara, James)
January 14, 2017 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Defendant's Opening Interrogatories by Katina McGee re #46 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
January 14, 2017 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents by Katina McGee re #46 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
January 14, 2017 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents by Dana Moye re #46 Certificate of Service. (Lake, Stacy)
January 14, 2017 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Defendant's Opening Interrogatories by Dana Moye re #46 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
December 16, 2016 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Dana Moye and Katina McGee by Con-Way Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
December 10, 2016 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 2nd Supplemental Discovery by Anthony Craig Mann re #33 Certificate of Service, (Lake, Stacy)
December 9, 2016 Filing 44 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Damages by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc..(Wallace, Jack)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 motion for extension of time until 12/9/16 to file answer to amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/18/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
November 18, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #41 Amended Complaint by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wallace, Jack)
November 4, 2016 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Con-Way Freight, Inc., filed by Anthony Craig Mann, Dana Moye, Katina McGee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lake, Stacy)
November 3, 2016 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Discovery by Anthony Craig Mann re #15 Certificate of Service, #33 Certificate of Service, (Lake, Stacy)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 5/15/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 6/15/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/22/2017. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/2/2016. (ah)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #26 motion for leave to amend complaint, and #27 motion to join additional parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/2/2016. (ah)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/24/2016. (ah)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/24/2016. (ah) Modified on 10/24/2016 WO (lak).
September 27, 2016 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Con-Way Freight, Inc. re: #22 MOTION for Protective Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law Defendant's Reply Regarding Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Wallace, Jack)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: On September 7, 2016, the court entered an order suspending the deadline for the disclosure of plaintiff's experts (ECF doc. 25), noting that the court would re-set the deadline following the court's ruling on plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint (ECF doc. 26). The order should have more clearly stated that the related deadlines for defendant's expert disclosures and the rebuttal expert disclosures are also suspended. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/22/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
September 21, 2016 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF and ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF by Anthony Craig Mann re #15 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
September 19, 2016 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann re: #26 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint , #27 MOTION for Joinder (Lake, Stacy)
September 16, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Defendant Con-Way Freight, Inc. re #26 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint , #27 MOTION for Joinder Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Join Additional Parties and Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Wallace, Jack)
September 13, 2016 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann re #22 MOTION for Protective Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law IN OPPOSITION (Lake, Stacy)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING re MOTION for Joinder #27 . Response deadline: 9/16/2016. Reply deadline: 9/20/2016. These deadlines are expedited to correspond to the briefing schedule on the related motion for leave to amend complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/13/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
September 13, 2016 Filing 28 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #26 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann TRUE PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT (Lake, Stacy)
September 12, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION for Joinder by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
September 12, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Lake, Stacy) (Redacted versions of Exhibits A,C,D,E added on 9/13/2016 due to violation of privacy policy.: #8 Exhibit A - Redacted, #9 Exhibit C - Redacted, #10 Exhibit D - Redacted, #11 Exhibit E - Redacted) (kao).
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #20 motion for extension of the scheduling-order deadline for filing a motion to amend the complaint. The court concludes that newly retained counsel for plaintiff have demonstrated good cause for an extension, namely, the need to perform a thorough investigation of the underlying facts. The court is reluctant, however, to extend the deadline by the requested 30 days, given the effect that such a lengthy extension would have on other scheduled deadlines and the absence of any reason given for an extension of that particular length. Therefore, the new deadline for plaintiff to file a motion for leave to amend his complaint is September 12, 2016; defendant shall have until September 16, 2016, to respond, and plaintiff shall have until September 20, 2016, to reply. The September 30, 2016 deadlines for Rule 35 examinations and for the disclosure of experts by plaintiff are suspended; the court will re-set these deadlines upon its ruling on the motion for leave to amend the complaint. The parties should NOT expect the February 28, 2017 discovery deadline to change and should proceed accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/7/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
September 6, 2016 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann re: #20 MOTION for extension of time Opposed by Defendant (Lake, Stacy)
September 2, 2016 Filing 23 RESPONSE by Defendant Con-Way Freight, Inc. re #20 MOTION for extension of time Opposed by Defendant Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for First Amended Complaint (Wallace, Jack)
August 30, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION for Protective Order with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendant Con-Way Freight, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wallace, Jack)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING DEADLINES regarding #20 motion for extension of the scheduling-order deadline for filing a motion for leave to amend the complaint. Any response shall be filed by September 2, 2016. Any reply shall be filed by September 6, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/30/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
August 30, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time (Opposed by Defendant) by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 and #18 identical motions for extension of the scheduling-order deadline for filing a motion for leave to amend the complaint. The motion is denied because it suggests no "good cause" for amending the scheduling order, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4), nor does it indicate that plaintiff consulted defendant prior to filing the motion, as required by D. Kan. Rule 6.1(a)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/29/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
August 28, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File file motion to amend as to #10 Scheduling Order,, by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
August 28, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Amend as to #10 Scheduling Order,, by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEDIATION MINUTE ORDER - The undersigned magistrate judge has reviewed the confidential settlement reports submitted by counsel in accordance with the scheduling order (ECF doc. 10). Mindful there's usually considerable bluff and bluster during negotiations, in this instance the parties' radically different stated positions don't allow the court to infer that mediation (or any other form of ADR) would be productive at this juncture. Of course, should both parties agree, they may proceed with mediation at any time. In any event, counsel must e-mail updated reports to the undersigned by 1/31/17; by then, presumably both sides will have more information to allow them to make more reasonable settlement proposals. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/26/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kg)
August 23, 2016 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production to Plaintiff by Con-Way Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 unopposed motion to extend the deadline to July 25, 2016, for plaintiff to submit a settlement proposal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/11/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ac)
July 11, 2016 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to extend deadline to file PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
July 8, 2016 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stacy A. Lake and Cecilia Nuby on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lake, Stacy) Added attorney name on 7/8/2016. (kao)
June 27, 2016 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/27/2016. Plaintiff, who is pro se, appeared by telephone. Defendant appeared through counsel, Jack R. Wallace, in person. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 2/28/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 4/3/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/1/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2017 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2017 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 before District Judge Carlos Murguia; estimated trial time 3-4 days. SEE ORDER FOR ANY ADDITIONAL SCHEDULED DEADLINES AND HEARINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/27/2016.Mailed to pro se party Anthony Craig Mann by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3460 0000 8262 7402(kg)
June 14, 2016 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re 8 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, addressed to Anthony Craig Mann (kg)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: at the parties' request, the scheduling conference currently set for June 22, 2016, is rescheduled for June 27, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/2/2016. Mailed to pro se party by regular and certified mail.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ah)
May 31, 2016 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #6 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, addressed to Anthony Craig Mann (kg)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/15/2016. Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Deadline set for 6/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/11/2016.Mailed to pro se party Anthony Craig Mann by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3460 0000 8262 0984(kg)
May 2, 2016 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Con-Way Freight, Inc. identifying XPO Logistics CNW, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc. as corporate parent. (Wallace, Jack)
May 2, 2016 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Con-Way Freight, Inc.. (Wallace, Jack)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/28/2016.Mailed to pro se party Anthony Craig Mann by regular mail (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
March 25, 2016 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Con-Way Freight, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ydm)
March 25, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Craig Mann. (ydm)
March 25, 2016 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number k4631051475 (ydm)
March 25, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Anthony Craig Mann.(ydm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Con-Way Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Moye
Represented By: Stacy A. Lake
Represented By: Cecilia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katina McGee
Represented By: Stacy A. Lake
Represented By: Cecilia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Craig Mann
Represented By: Stacy A. Lake
Represented By: Cecilia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Con-Way Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Rigolizzo Wallace
Represented By: Kimberly F. Seten
Represented By: Spring E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Rigolizzo Wallace
Represented By: Kimberly F. Seten
Represented By: Spring E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Rigolizzo Wallace
Represented By: Kimberly F. Seten
Represented By: Spring E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?