Crumpley v. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacob A. Crumpley
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers and Clarence M. Kelley and Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02298
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 175 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 179 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 181 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 04/24/2018. (mig)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 122 Motion to Compel and denying 155 Motion to Compel. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/27/17. (hw)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and for Sanctions 141 is granted in part, denied in part, and deferred in part. It is granted as to amend the scheduling order; denie d as to the special master; and deferred as to request for sanctions. Discovery deadline 9/29/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 10/29/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/3/2017. Jury Trial set for 7/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtr oom (Unknown) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 01:15 PM in Telephone GLR - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 8533057 before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 8/24/2017. (hl)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 4/28/17. (kao)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT AWG's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (Doc. 59) is denied, but AWG's Motion for Summary Judgment is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT plain tiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Defer Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply (Doc. 69) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's motion under Rule 56(d) is granted, but his m otion for leave to file a surreply is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, if AWG chooses to renew its motion for summary judgment, it must do so within the time frame established by the Scheduling Order (Doc. 47). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/13/17. (hw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crumpley v. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob A. Crumpley
Represented By: Alexander L. Edelman
Represented By: Katherine E. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers
Represented By: Karen R. Glickstein
Represented By: Katharine K. Sangha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence M. Kelley and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Kaitlin M. Marsh Blake
Represented By: Sean M. Sturdivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?