Digital Ally, Inc. v. Enforcement Video, LLC d/b/a WatchGuard Video
Plaintiff: Digital Ally, Inc.
Defendant: Enforcement Video, LLC
Counter_claimant: Enforcement Video, LLC
Counter_defendant: Digital Ally, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02349
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 71 motion to maintain the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/8/2018. (amh)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 62 unopposed motion to stay litigation pending inter partes review. On or before January 5, 2018, the parties shall submit a joint status report to the undersigned's chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/1/2017. (amh)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 41 motion for leave to file amended answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/20/2017. (srj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Ally, Inc. v. Enforcement Video, LLC d/b/a WatchGuard Video
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Ally, Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Represented By: Paul R. Hart
Represented By: Jason R. Mudd
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enforcement Video, LLC
Represented By: Nathan F. Garrett
Represented By: Joseph Michael McGroder
Represented By: Adam C. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Enforcement Video, LLC
Represented By: Nathan F. Garrett
Represented By: Joseph Michael McGroder
Represented By: Adam C. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Digital Ally, Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Represented By: Jason R. Mudd
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?