Kigera v. Bethesda Lutheran Communities
Plaintiff: Carolyne Kigera
Defendant: Bethesda Lutheran Communities
Case Number: 2:2016cv02547
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall take nothing on the claims, and the action is hereby dismissed on the merits. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/26/2018. (sz)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 32 Defendant's Motion for Consideration of Evidence Under Rule 7.3 and for Leave to Correct the Record to Reflect Discovery Served on Defendant insofar as it is a motion to reconsider, and finding the motion moot insofar as it seeks permission to supplement the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/21/2017. (ts)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/5/2017. (ts)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 13 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's claims for age discrimination, harassment, and failure to accommodate a disability are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/3/2017. (mam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kigera v. Bethesda Lutheran Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda Lutheran Communities
Represented By: Gregory D. Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyne Kigera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?