Riscoe et al v. United States of America Food and Drug Administration
Plaintiff: Gerald Michael Riscoe and Lila Ann Riscoe
Defendant: United States of America Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 2:2016cv02653
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 37 Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the appeal filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/21/2017. Mailed to pro se plaintiff Gerald Riscoe by regular mail on 6/21/2017. (byk)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/20/2017. (ydm)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. All pending Rule 26 obligations of the parties, pretrial proceedings, and discovery are hereby stayed until the District Judge rules on the pending 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/24/2017. (Copy of Order mailed to pro se plaintiffs by regular mail.) (byk)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/22/2016. (Order sent to pro se plaintiff Gerald Riscoe by regular mail on 12/22/2016.)(byk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riscoe et al v. United States of America Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Michael Riscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lila Ann Riscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?