McHenry v. City of Ottawa et al
Plaintiff: Chris McHenry
Defendant: City of Ottawa, Kansas, Board of Commissioners of Franklin County, Kansas, Abe Schmidt, Jesse Vega, Ricky Wilson, Justin Bulcock, Casey Gilmore, Doug Waterman, Bryce Hart, Derek Butters, Hunter Dryden and Dwayne Woods
Case Number: 2:2016cv02736
Filed: October 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 64 Motion for Entry of Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT judgment be entered in favor of defendants Doug Waterman, Bryce Hart, Hunter Dryden, Dwayne Woods, and Derek Butters on all claims asserted against them. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/15/17. (kao)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 47 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; granting 53 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The court certifies its previous Memorandum and Order (Doc. 46) for interlocutory appeal to determine the following c ontrolling question of law: Whether plaintiff has pleaded a violation of Title II of the ADA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT that the case is stayed until either the time for defendants to file an interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) expires or until the Tenth Circuit finally disposes of such an appeal, whichever is later. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/20/17. (kao)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Judgment. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 09/26/2017. (mig)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/27/2017. (srj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHenry v. City of Ottawa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McHenry
Represented By: Robert J. Bjerg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ottawa, Kansas
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of Franklin County, Kansas
Represented By: Wendell F. Cowan, Jr.
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Represented By: Eric V. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abe Schmidt
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Vega
Represented By: Wendell F. Cowan, Jr.
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Represented By: Eric V. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Wilson
Represented By: Wendell F. Cowan, Jr.
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Represented By: Eric V. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bulcock
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Gilmore
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Waterman
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Hart
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Butters
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Dryden
Represented By: Wendell F. Cowan, Jr.
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Represented By: Eric V. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Woods
Represented By: Wendell F. Cowan, Jr.
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Represented By: Eric V. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?