Brizendine v. Randall
Plaintiff: Danny Brizendine
Defendant: Jennifer Randall
Case Number: 2:2016cv02782
Filed: November 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Reno
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/17/18. (hw)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 7/23/2018. (ydm)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 08/30/2017. (cv)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 11 Defendant's Motion to Stay Case. The case will be stayed for an initial period of 90 days. Plaintiff shall file a status report with the Court on or before June 30, 2017. A status conference is scheduled for July 7, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. via telephone conference call to be initiated by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/5/17. (sj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brizendine v. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Brizendine
Represented By: Myndee M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Randall
Represented By: Patrick A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?