Middleton-Thomas et al v. Piat, Inc.
Plaintiff: Middleton-Thomas, LaShone Middleton-Thomas and Guinans Carol Cleveland
Defendant: Piat, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02023
Filed: January 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 163 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Piat, Inc.(Baggott, Anne)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 9/28/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 8/7/2018. (ydm)
August 6, 2018 Filing 161 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by Stacy A. Lake (Lake, Stacy)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 TRIAL ORDER: SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINE INFORMATION. Estimated trial time 5 days; Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Motions to exclude experts due 09/07/2018, responses due 09/21/2018 and replies due 09/28/2018. Motions in limine due 10/05/2018, responses due 10/11/2018, and In Limine Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Exhibit Deadline set for 8/22/2018. Witness List Deadline set for 8/22/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/17/2018. (ses)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's motion for summary judgment #137 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is denied as to plaintiff Thomas's claim that defendant denied her a pay increase based on race; is denied as to plaintiff Cleveland's discriminatory discharge and retaliation claims; and is otherwise granted. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/03/2018. (ses)
June 1, 2018 Filing 158 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Piat, Inc. re: #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Cory Bates)(Baggott, Anne)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment and the Reply is extended to deadline 6/1/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/31/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 30, 2018 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #152 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Piat, Inc. (Baggott, Anne)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER -- In its order of May 15, 2018, the Court intended to grant defendant a one-day extension to file its reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment, but defendant's deadline was already May 29, 2018, because of the Memorial Day holiday. Accordingly, defendant is granted until May 30, 2018 to file its reply brief. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
May 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding 151 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Modified text entry to correct the reply deadline date of 5/29/2019. Text entry was changed to 5/29/2018. Notice is being generated for notification purposes. (ydm)
May 15, 2018 Filing 154 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 32, #24 Exhibit 33, #25 Exhibit 34, #26 Exhibit 35, #27 Exhibit 36, #28 Exhibit 37, #29 Exhibit 38, #30 Exhibit 41, #31 Exhibit 44, #32 Exhibit 45, #33 Exhibit 46, #34 Exhibit 47, #35 Exhibit 52)(Lake, Stacy)
May 15, 2018 Filing 153 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31, #10 Exhibit 39, #11 Exhibit 40, #12 Exhibit 42, #13 Exhibit 43, #14 Exhibit 48, #15 Exhibit 49, #16 Exhibit 50, #17 Exhibit 51)(Lake, Stacy)
May 15, 2018 Filing 152 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Lake, Stacy)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #149 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Refile Response to Summary Judgment Motion and the Exhibit List Out of Time. It is further ordered that defendant's reply deadline is extended to 5/29/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/15/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses) Modified on 5/16/2018 to correct date of defendant's deadline. (ydm)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #148 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. In the event the Court refers to any of these sealed exhibits in the ruling on the motion, it will unseal that exhibit or exhibits absent a more particularized showing. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/15/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 15, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION for Leave to Refile the Response to Summary Judgment and Exhibit List Out of Time by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas. (Lake, Stacy).
May 15, 2018 Filing 148 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas. (Lake, Stacy)
May 15, 2018 Filing 147 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Lake, Stacy)
May 15, 2018 Filing 146 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Lake, Stacy)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment and the Response deadline is extended to 5/14/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/11/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 10, 2018 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #138 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas. (Lake, Stacy)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment and the Response deadline is extended to 5/10/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/04/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
May 3, 2018 Filing 142 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #138 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas. (Lake, Stacy)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #140 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment and the Response deadline is extended to 5/3/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/24/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
April 23, 2018 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas. (Lake, Stacy)
April 2, 2018 Filing 139 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Defendant Piat, Inc. re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit)(Baggott, Anne)
April 2, 2018 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Piat, Inc.(Baggott, Anne)
April 2, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Piat, Inc. (Baggott, Anne)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED - Dispositive Motion deadline 4/2/2018. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2018 at 9:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Estimated trial time 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/23/18. (ss)
March 20, 2018 Filing 135 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/20/2018. (FTR: 9:09.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
March 19, 2018 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Rule 26 Disclosures by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas. (Lake, Stacy) Modified on 3/20/2018 correct docket entry. (ydm)
February 23, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE of Cancellation of Depositions by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #130 Notice to Take Deposition, #129 Notice to Take Deposition (Lake, Stacy)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #87 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/13/2018. (ses)
February 7, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding Notice to Take Deposition #129 . Modified docket entry to correct deposition date. (ydm)
February 2, 2018 Filing 131 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Piat, Inc. re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Baggott, Anne)
February 2, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Roy Coleman on 2/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Fannie Stokes on 2/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy) Modified to change the deposition date on 2/7/2018 (ydm).
February 2, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Thomas Robinson on 2/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Mary Hill on 2/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Vernon Butcher on 2/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Veneta Smith on 2/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Josefina Ortiz on 2/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Mike Hogan on 2/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Cory Bates on 2/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
February 2, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Piat Inc. on 2/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
February 1, 2018 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.(ydm)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER denying #111 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/31/2018. (amh)
January 31, 2018 Filing 119 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/31/2018. Stacy Lake appeared for plaintiff. Anne Baggott appears for defendant. (FTR: 10:42.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: as ordered on the record at today's status conference, defense counsel must inform the court by 3:00 p.m., via an email to the undersigned's chambers, whether time records (also known as "job activity reports") were produced to plaintiffs as defendant keeps them in the ordinary course of business. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/31/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
January 30, 2018 Filing 117 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re: #111 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Lake, Stacy)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #111 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order: Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2018 at 10:30 AM in KC Room 219 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. In addition, plaintiffs' reply in support of the motion is further EXPEDITED to 2:00 p.m. on 1/30/2018, given the early submission of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/29/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
January 29, 2018 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers to "Amended Opening Interrogatories" by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
January 26, 2018 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Piat, Inc. re #111 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memo in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Amend Scheduling Order)(Baggott, Anne)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding #111 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Any response is due January 29, 2018. Any reply is due January 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/26/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 25, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of to Withdraw Deposition by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #100 Notice to Take Deposition, #96 Notice to Take Deposition, #103 Notice to Take Deposition, #105 Notice to Take Deposition, #95 Notice to Take Deposition, #97 Notice to Take Deposition, #99 Notice to Take Deposition, #94 Notice to Take Deposition, #102 Notice to Take Deposition, #110 Notice to Take Deposition, #98 Notice to Take Deposition, #101 Notice to Take Deposition (Lake, Stacy)
January 25, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Lake, Stacy)
January 22, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Mary Hill on 02/01/2018 (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
January 22, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of to Withdraw Deposition by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #99 Notice to Take Deposition (Lake, Stacy)
January 22, 2018 Filing 108 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/22/2018. Stacy Lake appears for plaintiff. Anne Baggott appears for defendant. (AT&T Conference Line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
January 22, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Status Conference set for 1/22/2018 at 2:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All participants must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference.(ss)
January 22, 2018 Filing 106 AMENDED RESPONSE by Plaintiff LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Lake, Stacy) (Document to Amend Doc # 104). Modified on 1/22/2018 (ydm).
January 22, 2018 Filing 105 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Piat, Inc. on 1/26/18 (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
January 19, 2018 Filing 104 RESPONSE by Plaintiff LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Ex, #2 Ex, #3 Ex, #4 Ex, #5 Ex, #6 Ex, #7 Ex, #8 Ex, #9 Ex, #10 Ex, #11 Ex)(Lake, Stacy) M
January 18, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Roy Coleman on 2/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Fannie Stokes on 2/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Thomas Robinson on 2/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Vernon Butcher on 2/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Chris Spaethe on 2/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Josefina Ortiz on 1/31/18 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Veneta Smith on 1/31/18 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Mike Hogan on 1/30/18 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Cory Bates on 1/29/18 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Subpoena)(Lake, Stacy)
January 16, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas of taking deposition of Piat, Inc. on 1/29/18 (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Attachment A)(Lake, Stacy)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED ORDER - The Court amends the 92 ORDER granting 89 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 87 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and orders that the extension of the response deadline is extended to 1/19/2018 rather than 01/10/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/10/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #89 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #87 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and the Response deadline is extended to 1/10/2018. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/10/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
January 9, 2018 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 2nd Amended Discovery Responses by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
January 9, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lake, Stacy)
January 9, 2018 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #88 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff LaShone Middleton-Thomas (Lake, Stacy)
January 9, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #88 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
December 20, 2017 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Piat, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Baggott, Anne)
December 20, 2017 Filing 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Piat, Inc. (Baggott, Anne)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #81 motion to amend scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/20/2017. (amh)
December 20, 2017 Filing 85 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re: #81 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R1)(Lake, Stacy)
December 20, 2017 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Piat, Inc. re #81 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Baggott, Anne)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding #81 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Any response is due by noon on December 20, 2017, and limited to five, double-spaced pages. Any reply is due by 4:00 p.m. on December 20, 2017, and limited to two, double-spaced pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/19/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
December 18, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE of Inspection by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (Lake, Stacy)
December 18, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit 1)(Lake, Stacy)
December 14, 2017 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Discovery Responses by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
December 11, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE by Defendant Piat, Inc. of taking deposition of Fannie Stokes on 12/19/17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Baggott, Anne)
December 11, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Piat, Inc. with Notice of Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Take Deposition, #2 Exhibit Subpoena)(Baggott, Anne)
December 11, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Piat, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Baggott, Anne)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 unopposed motion for extension of time until December 18, 2017, for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel discovery. Although the court obviously prefers counsel to resolve discovery disputes themselves, the record indicates this is the fourth extension and that counsel have been dealing with the same discovery issues for nearly 75 days with no apparent progress. Enough is enough. Therefore, no further motions for extensions (even if unopposed) will be granted with regard to the subject discovery absent a detailed and strong showing of good cause. And, with regard to the oblique statements in paragraph 7 of the instant motion, mindful that all discovery is scheduled to close on 12/20/17, neither plaintiffs nor defendant should presume the court will favorably entertain any later motion to modify the amended scheduling now in effect (see ECF No. 67). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/5/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
December 4, 2017 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 unopposed motion for extension of time until December 4, 2017, for plaintiffs to file a motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/21/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
November 20, 2017 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
November 17, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Piat, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baggott, Anne)
November 17, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Piat, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baggott, Anne)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 unopposed motion for extension of time until November 20, 2017, for plaintiffs to bring a motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/7/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
November 6, 2017 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
November 1, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE by Defendant Piat, Inc. of taking deposition of LaShone Middleton-Thomas on November 16, 2017 (Baggott, Anne)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting #66 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery deadline 12/20/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 3/1/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2018. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/30/2017. (srj)
October 27, 2017 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant Piat, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Baggott, Anne)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 unopposed motion for extension of time until November 6, 2017, for plaintiff to bring a motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/24/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
October 23, 2017 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #58 unopposed motion to shorten time for plaintiffs to respond to discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/02/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
October 2, 2017 Filing 62 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #58 MOTION for Order to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Discovery (Lake, Stacy)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER expediting briefing deadlines re MOTION for Order to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Discovery #58 . Any response shall be filed by noon on October 2, 2017. Any reply shall be filed by 4:00 p.m. on October 2, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/29/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(srj)
September 29, 2017 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
September 29, 2017 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #58 MOTION for Order to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Discovery by Defendant Piat, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index with Attached Exhibits)(Baggott, Anne)
September 29, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION for Order to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Discovery by Defendant Piat, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Baggott, Anne)
September 27, 2017 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Privilege Log by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
September 27, 2017 Filing 56 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/27/2017. Stacy Lake appears for plaintiff. Anne Baggott appears for defendant. (AT&T Conference Line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
September 26, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 9/26/2017 at 4:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference.(ss)
September 22, 2017 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
September 22, 2017 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
September 20, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE by Defendant Piat, Inc. of taking deposition of LaShone Middleton-Thomas on 10/11/2017 (Baggott, Anne)
September 20, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE by Defendant Piat, Inc. of taking deposition of Guinans Carol Cleveland on 10/20/2017 (Baggott, Anne)
September 19, 2017 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's 3d Set of Interrogatories by LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #40 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
September 13, 2017 Filing 49 Defendant's ANSWER to #48 Amended Complaint Second Amended by Piat, Inc..(Baggott, Anne)
August 30, 2017 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Piat, Inc., filed by LaShone Middleton-Thomas, Guinans Carol Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lake, Stacy)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint Out of Time and plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint forthwith. In light of the granting of that motion, the #37 defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Age Claim is moot. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/29/2017. (ses)
August 29, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #46 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint, . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 28, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Ex. A, #5 Ex. B, #6 Ex. C, #7 Ex. D)(Lake, Stacy)
August 28, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #38 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Plaintiffs' Age Claims , #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Plaintiffs' Age Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lake, Stacy)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Plaintiffs' Age Claims and the Response deadline is extended to 8/28/2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/28/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 28, 2017 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #38 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Plaintiffs' Age Claims . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 25, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #38 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Plaintiffs' Age Claims by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (Lake, Stacy)
August 22, 2017 Filing 42 ADR REPORT by Piat, Inc.. ADR session held on: 08/02/2017 and conducted by Michelle Minor. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Baggott, Anne)
August 21, 2017 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Second Request for Production of Documents and Second Set of Interrogatories by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #26 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
August 18, 2017 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Third Interrogatories to Plaintiff Middleton-Thomas by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the protective order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/16/2017. (amh)
August 11, 2017 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Plaintiffs' Age Claims by Defendant Piat, Inc.(Baggott, Anne)
August 11, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Plaintiffs' Age Claims by Defendant Piat, Inc. (Baggott, Anne)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER finding as moot #28 motion to strike expert witnesses for incomplete disclosures. After the motion was filed, plaintiffs filed supplemental expert-witness disclosures (ECF Nos. 33 and 34). Plaintiffs' response to the motion (ECF No. 35) asserts the motion is moot in light of the supplemental disclosures. Defendant did not file a timely reply, so presumably it agrees with plaintiffs' assertions. This order is without prejudice to defendant filing a new motion challenging the supplemental designations, but only after counsel meet and confer in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/3/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 28, 2017 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #28 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses (Lake, Stacy)
July 28, 2017 Filing 34 Supplemental EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION by LaShone Middleton-Thomas.(Lake, Stacy)
July 28, 2017 Filing 33 Supplemental EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION by Guinans Carol Cleveland.(Lake, Stacy)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 motion for extension of time until July 28, 2017, for plaintiffs to respond to the motion to strike experts (ECF No. #28 ). The reply deadline shall now be August 2, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/27/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 26, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 30 Order on Motion to Strike, by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER regarding #28 Motion to Strike. The deadline for plaintiffs to respond to this motion is expedited to 7/26/17, and the deadline for filing any reply is expedited to 7/31/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/20/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
July 19, 2017 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #28 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses by Defendant Piat, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baggott, Anne)
July 19, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses by Defendant Piat, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Baggott, Anne)
July 12, 2017 Filing 27 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held 08/02/2017 by Piat, Inc. (Baggott, Anne)
July 12, 2017 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 2nd Interrogatories and 2nd Requests for Production by Piat, Inc.. (Baggott, Anne)
July 5, 2017 Filing 25 EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION by LaShone Middleton-Thomas.(Lake, Stacy)
July 5, 2017 Filing 24 EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION by Guinans Carol Cleveland.(Lake, Stacy)
June 29, 2017 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers to First Request for Production of Documents and Answers to Opening Interrogatories to Plaintiffs by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas re #18 Certificate of Service (Lake, Stacy)
June 28, 2017 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anne E. Baggott on behalf of Piat, Inc.. (kao)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 unopposed motion for extension of time until June 29, 2017, for plaintiff to file a motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/23/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
June 22, 2017 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Lake, Stacy)
May 26, 2017 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint Amended by Piat, Inc..(Ketchum, Amanda)
May 23, 2017 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Lashone Middleton-Thomas and Guinans Carol Cleveland by Piat, Inc.. (Ketchum, Amanda)
May 12, 2017 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by LaShone Middleton-Thomas, Guinans Carol Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B, #3 Exhibit - Redacted C, #4 Exhibit - Redacted D)(Lake, Stacy)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 unopposed motion to amend complaint. Plaintiffs are directed to file forthwith their amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/12/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
May 12, 2017 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Redacted A, #3 Exhibit - Redacted B, #4 Exhibit - Redacted C, #5 Exhibit - Redacted D)(Lake, Stacy)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 7/17/2017. Mediation deadline 8/31/2017. Discovery deadline 11/1/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 1/5/2018. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2018 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Estimated trial time 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/9/17. (ss)
May 9, 2017 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2017. Stacy Lake appears for plaintiff. Amanda Ketchum appears for defendant. (FTR: 9:01.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
May 2, 2017 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas (Lake, Stacy)
May 2, 2017 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT PIAT, INC.S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26 by Piat, Inc.. (McMonigle, Patrick)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/2/2017. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/24/17. (ss)
March 23, 2017 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Piat, Inc. identifying PIAT, Inc. as corporate parent . (Ketchum, Amanda)
March 23, 2017 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patrick K. McMonigle on behalf of Piat, Inc. (McMonigle, Patrick)
March 23, 2017 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Piat, Inc..(Ketchum, Amanda)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 unopposed motion for extension of time until March 23, 2017, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/10/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
March 9, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Piat, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Ketchum, Amanda)
February 24, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by LaShone Middleton-Thomas, Guinans Carol Cleveland upon Piat, Inc. served on 2/16/2017, answer due 3/9/2017 (Lake, Stacy)
January 27, 2017 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Piat, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (cv)
January 14, 2017 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv)
January 14, 2017 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Lake, Stacy)
January 14, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Guinans Carol Cleveland, LaShone Middleton-Thomas. (Lake, Stacy)
January 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4064479.), filed by LaShone Middleton-Thomas, Guinans Carol Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lake, Stacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton-Thomas et al v. Piat, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middleton-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShone Middleton-Thomas
Represented By: Stacy A. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guinans Carol Cleveland
Represented By: Stacy A. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piat, Inc.
Represented By: Anne E. Baggott
Represented By: Patrick Kevin McMonigle
Represented By: Amanda Pennington Ketchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?