Escalante v. LifePoint Hospital Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raquel Escalante
Defendant: LifePoint Hospital Inc., Dodge City Medical Center, Chartered, Family Practice Associates of Western Kansas LLC, Tanya Williams and Samir Shaath
Case Number: 2:2017cv02035
Filed: January 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Ford
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 131 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in Part II.A, supra. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File their Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 141 is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J. Dreiling 119 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in Part II.B, supra. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendant's Experts from Testifying that B.E.'s Permanent Brachial Plexus Injury Was Caused by "In Utero" or "Maternal Forces" of Labor 133 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 07/01/2019. (ses)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 129 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/19/19. (df)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 81 Defendants' Motion for Determination of Place of Trial. The Court designates WICHITA as the location of trial. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 09/11/2018. (ses)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 39 Motion for Order for Medical Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/9/17. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escalante v. LifePoint Hospital Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Escalante
Represented By: Stanley R. Ausemus
Represented By: Mark P. Schloegel
Represented By: William Dirk Vandever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint Hospital Inc.
Represented By: John H. Gibson
Represented By: Michelle M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge City Medical Center, Chartered
Represented By: Christopher S. Cole
Represented By: Steven C. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Practice Associates of Western Kansas LLC
Represented By: David S. Wooding
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Williams
Represented By: David S. Wooding
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samir Shaath
Represented By: Brian C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?