Cavlovic v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ann Cavlovic
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02042
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 6/7/2018. (hl)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 48 Motion for Review. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 08/08/2017. (cv)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 31 Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/14/2017. (byk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavlovic v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Brooke Concannon
Represented By: Michael S. Hargens
Represented By: Christina M. Pyle
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Cavlovic
Represented By: Bryce B. Bell
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?