Roudybush v. State of Kansas et al
Plaintiff: John Roudybush
Defendant: State of Kansas, Derek Schmidt, Kansas Department of Corrections, Sam Brownback, Joe Norwood and Saline County 28th District Court
Case Number: 2:2017cv02303
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff has failed to show good cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim and lack of jurisdiction. The court therefore dismisses the case. The case is closed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 11/13/2017.Mailed to pro se party John Roudybush by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70123460000082626498(ydm)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Review; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff has until November 1, 2017 to file a final response to Judge O'Hara's 11 Order to Show Cause. The court does not grant plaintiff any other relief requested in those motions and will determine whether to dismiss this case after the November 1 deadline passes. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/19/2017.Mailed to pro se party John Roudybush by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70123460000082626351 (ydm)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER and NOTICE TO SHOW CAUSE: granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion for Order; denying 8 Motion for Order; denying 9 Motion to Change Venue. Show Cause response due August 16, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/31/2017. Mailed to pro se party by regular and certified mail. (amh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roudybush v. State of Kansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roudybush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Brownback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County 28th District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?