Kincaid Coach Lines, Inc. v. TransArtic of North Carolina, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kincaid Coach Lines, Inc.
Defendant: TransArtic of North Carolina, Inc. and Spheros, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02388
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 51 defendant Spal USA's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 55 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 06/28/2018. (mig)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Defendant SPAL USA, Inc. shall file its amended answer within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 2/14/2018. (wh)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 12/6/2017. (wh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kincaid Coach Lines, Inc. v. TransArtic of North Carolina, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kincaid Coach Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Peter E. Goss
Represented By: Lauren E. Nuffort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransArtic of North Carolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spheros, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?